Commercial Tenant Services, Inc. v. Penske Business Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Commercial Tenant Services, Inc.
Defendant: Penske Business Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09756
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The last day to amend the pleadings is April 12, 2021; 2. The last day for completion of fact discovery is May 28, 2021; 3. The last day for expert witness disclosures on any issue for which party has the burden of proof is June 18, 2021; 4. The last day for expert rebuttal disclosure is July 16, 2021; 5. Any motions shall be filed on or before September 3, 2021; 6. Responses to any motions shall be filed on or before September 24, 2021; 7. Replies to any motions are due by October 8, 2021; 8. There will be a pretrial conference on May 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m.; and 9. Any discovery disputes shall be brought to the Court's attention, in writing, far enough in advance of May 28, 2021, in order for the dispute to be adjudicated and any necessary discovery taken before the close of discovery. So ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2021. Motions due by 9/3/2021. Responses due by 9/24/2021. Replies due by 10/8/2021. Fact Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/13/2021) (rjm)
January 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Status Conference held on 1/13/2021. Counsel for all parties participated. (lab)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth L Kutner on behalf of Commercial Tenant Services, Inc...(Kutner, Kenneth)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Penske Business Media, LLC..(Delgado, William)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. Counsel for all parties are required to register promptly as filing users in accordance with the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. An initial pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is scheduled via teleconference for January 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. At that teleconference, counsel for all parties must be prepared to discuss the progress of the case and the scheduling of discovery proceedings, any dispositive motions, the feasibility of settlement or alternative dispute resolution, the dates for future conferences, and the submission of a joint pretrial order, and as further set forth in this Order. The parties shall dial 888-273-3658 and use access code 7004275 to join the teleconference. Attorneys are directed to consult the Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions and Judge Stein's Individual Rules with respect to procedures for matters assigned to him. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/22/2020) (rjm)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Penske Business Media, LLC..(Delgado, William)
November 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Commercial Tenant Services, Inc. on November 19, 2020. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by Penske Business Media, LLC..(Delgado, William)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Penske Media Corp. for Penske Business Media, LLC. Document filed by Penske Business Media, LLC..(Delgado, William)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Delgado, William)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 158920/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22664157).Document filed by Penske Business Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affirmation of Service, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Greene iso Notice of Removal).(Delgado, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commercial Tenant Services, Inc. v. Penske Business Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Business Media, LLC
Represented By: William A Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commercial Tenant Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth L Kutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?