Lee v. Canada Goose US, Inc.
Plaintiff: George Lee
Defendant: Canada Goose US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09809
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Nicole M. O'Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/9/2020) (rro)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Canada Goose US, Inc. waiver sent on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. Document filed by George Lee..(Richman, Kim)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Nicole M. ODonnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22934798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Canada Goose US, Inc...(O'Donnell, Nicole)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Chong Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22934289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Canada Goose US, Inc...(Park, Chong)
December 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Chong Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22934289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Nicole M. ODonnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22934798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Canada Goose US, Inc...(dnh)
November 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kim Eleazer Richman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: George Lee. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
November 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kim Eleazer Richman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
November 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CANADA GOOSE US, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by George Lee..(Richman, Kim)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Richman, Kim)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Canada Goose US, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22685587)Document filed by George Lee..(Richman, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Canada Goose US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lee
Represented By: Kim Eleazer Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canada Goose US, Inc.
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Nicole Marie O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?