Symphony Investment Partners, Inc. v. Keeco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Symphony Investment Partners, Inc.
Defendant: Keeco, LLC and Richard Platt
Case Number: 1:2020cv09892
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY re: #67 Rule 56.1 Statement and Counterstatement by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc.. Document filed by Richard Platt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Paul Milone Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit William Tauscher Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Richard Platt Deposition Excerpts).(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint. . Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AFFIRMATION of Stephen P. Brunner in Support re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims.. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims. filed by KEECO, LLC. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AFFIRMATION of Jamie M. Brickell in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims., #53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint.. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PX1, #2 PX2, #3 PX3, #4 PX4, #5 PX5, #6 PX6, #7 PX7, #8 PX8, #9 PX9, #10 PX10, #11 PX12, #12 PX13, #13 PX16, #14 PX17, #15 DX18, #16 PX20, #17 PX21, #18 PX22, #19 PX23, #20 PX24, #21 PX25, #22 PX26, #23 PX27, #24 PX28, #25 PX29, #26 PX30, #27 PX31, #28 PX32, #29 PX33, #30 PX34, #31 PX35, #32 PX36, #33 DX36, #34 PX39, #35 PX40, #36 PX42, #37 PX43, #38 PX44, #39 PX45, #40 PX46, #41 PX53, #42 PX55, #43 PX57, #44 PX58, #45 PX59, #46 PX60, #47 PX62, #48 PX63, #49 PX64, #50 PX65, #51 PX66, #52 PX67, #53 PX68, #54 PX69, #55 PX70, #56 PX71, #57 PX72, #58 PX74, #59 PX75, #60 PX77).(Brickell, Jamie)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #62 Letter filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2021) (ama)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER with respect to #53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant Platt' s request for an extension of time to file his Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment until November 2, 2021 is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2021) (tg)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/2/2021 (tg)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie M. Brickell dated October 22, 2021 re: Re Redactions to Plaintiff's Filings. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio dated October 22, 2021 re: Request for One Week Extension to file Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AFFIRMATION of Jamie M. Brickell in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims., #53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint.. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PX1, #2 PX2, #3 PX3, #4 PX4, #5 PX5, #6 PX6, #7 PX7, #8 PX8, #9 PX9, #10 PX10, #11 PX12, #12 PX13, #13 PX16, #14 PX17, #15 DX18, #16 PX20, #17 PX21, #18 PX22, #19 PX23, #20 PX24, #21 PX25, #22 PX26, #23 PX27, #24 PX28, #25 PX29, #26 PX30, #27 PX31, #28 PX32, #29 PX33, #30 PX34, #31 PX35, #32 PX36, #33 DX36, #34 PX39, #35 PX40, #36 PX42, #37 PX43, #38 PX44, #39 PX45, #40 PX46, #41 PX53, #42 PX55, #43 PX57, #44 PX58, #45 PX59, #46 PX60, #47 PX62, #48 PX63, #49 PX64, #50 PX65, #51 PX66, #52 PX67, #53 PX68, #54 PX69, #55 PX70, #56 PX71, #57 PX72, #58 PX74, #59 PX75, #60 PX77).(Brickell, Jamie)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims., #53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint. . Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The final pretrial conference scheduled for October 19, 2021 is cancelled. Oral argument on Defendant Richard Platt's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 41), and Defendant Keeco, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 42), is set for November 16, 2021 at 10:30am. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 11/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/13/2021) (jca)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Richard Platt. (Attachments: #1 7/21/21 Paul Milone Deposition Excerpts, #2 7/27/21 Rick Platt Deposition Excerpts, #3 Symphony Bate Stamp 20-23, #4 Defendant's Exhibit 47, #5 Defendant's Exhibit 50, #6 Symphony BS 14, #7 Defendant's Exhibit 38, #8 Plaintiff's Exhibit 39, #9 Defendant's Exhibit 41, #10 Defendant's Exhibit 35, #11 Defendant's Exhibit 32, #12 Defendant's Exhibit 31, #13 Defendant's Exhibit 29, #14 Defendant's Exhibit 28, #15 Defendant's Exhibit 43, #16 Defendant's Exhibit 42, #17 Defendant's Exhibit 27, #18 Plaintiff's Exhibit 14, #19 Defendant's Exhibit 44, #20 Plaintiff's Exhibit 57, #21 8/11/21 William Tauscher Deposition Excerpts).(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint. . Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of Christopher Grassi in Support re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims.. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Malinguaggio to RE-FILE Document #41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Rule 56.1 Statement is found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Stephen P Brunner to RE-FILE Document #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration Of Christopher Grassi In Support Of Keeco, LLC's Motion. Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: granting #48 Letter Motion for Conference re: #48 LETTER MOTION for Conference. addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen P. Brunner dated 09/22/21., #50 LETTER MOTION for Conference on September 28, 2021; request to appear remotely. addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio and Michael E Satti dated September 23, 2021.; granting #50 Letter Motion for Conference re: #48 LETTER MOTION for Conference. addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen P. Brunner dated 09/22/21., #50 LETTER MOTION for Conference on September 28, 2021; request to appear remotely. addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio and Michael E Satti dated September 23, 2021. The status conference scheduled to occur on September 28, 2021 is cancelled. The Court will hear oral argument on Defendant Richard Platt's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 41), and Defendant Keeco, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 42), on November 16, 2021 at 10:30am. Plaintiff's request for an extension until October 19, 2021 to file its opposition to Defendants' motions is GRANTED. Defendants' replies are due October 26, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the letter motions at ECF Nos. 48 and 50. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 11/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/23/2021) (ama)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER MOTION for Conference on September 28, 2021; request to appear remotely addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio and Michael E Satti dated September 23, 2021. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/19/2021 Replies due by 10/26/2021. (ama)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie M. Brickell dated September 22, 2021 re: Request to Attend Conference Remotely and For an Extension of Time to Oppose Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen P. Brunner dated 09/22/21. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 BRIEF Addenda In Support Of Keeco, LLC's Motion For Summary Judgment, Etc.. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims. Keeco, LLC's. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of William Y. Tauscher in Support re: #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims.. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration Of Christopher Grassi In Support Of Keeco, LLC's Motion. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen) Modified on 9/28/2021 (ldi).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff or In the Alternative for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Claims. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action in the Complaint. Document filed by Richard Platt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Platt Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 7/21/21 Paul Milone Deposition Excerpts, #4 7/27/21 Richard Platt Deposition Excerpts, #5 Symphony Bate Stamp 20-23, #6 Defendant's Exhibit 47, #7 Defendant's Exhibit 50, #8 Symphony BS 14, #9 Defendant's Exhibit 38, #10 Plaintiff's Exhibit 39, #11 Defendant's Exhibit 41, #12 Defendant's Exhibit 35, #13 Defendant's Exhibit 32, #14 Defendant's Exhibit 31, #15 Defendant's Exhibit 29, #16 Defendant's Exhibit 28, #17 Defendant's Exhibit 43, #18 Defendant's Exhibit 42, #19 Defendant's Exhibit 27, #20 Plaintiff's Exhibit 14, #21 Defendant's Exhibit 44, #22 Plaintiff's Exhibit 57, #23 8/11/21 William Tauscher Deposition Excerpts).(Malinguaggio, Rebecca) Modified on 9/28/2021 (ldi).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/7/2021) (ate)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio dated September 3, 2021. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: granting #37 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status Conference is adjourned from August 31, 2021 to September 28, 2021 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/30/2021) (ama)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled August 31, 2021 addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie M. Brickell dated August 27, 2021. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint letter request).(Brickell, Jamie)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: granting #35 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The status conference is adjourned from July 20, 2021 to August 31, 2021 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/19/2021) (ama)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie M. Brickell dated July 16, 2021. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Letter Motion for Conference re: #31 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #3 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, Request By Counsel For Defendant Keeco, LLC To Appear By Phone At June 8, 2021 Status Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen P. Brunner date, #32 LETTER MOTION for Conference on 6/8/21 and permission requested for all counsel to appear remotely addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio dated May 26, 2021. ; granting in part and denying in part #32 Letter Motion for Conference re: #31 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #3 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, Request By Counsel For Defendant Keeco, LLC To Appear By Phone At June 8, 2021 Status Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen P. Brunner date, #32 LETTER MOTION for Conference on 6/8/21 and permission requested for all counsel to appear remotely addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio dated May 26, 2021. The status conference scheduled to occur on June 8, 2021 is adjourned to July 20, 2021 at 9:45 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the letter motions at ECF Nos. 31 and 32. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/1/2021) (kv)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie M. Brickell dated May 28, 2021 re: June 8 Conference. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER MOTION for Conference on 6/8/21 and permission requested for all counsel to appear remotely addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio dated May 26, 2021. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #3 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, Request By Counsel For Defendant Keeco, LLC To Appear By Phone At June 8, 2021 Status Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen P. Brunner dated May 24, 2021. Document filed by Keeco, LLC. Return Date set for 6/8/2021 at 09:45 AM..(Brunner, Stephen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/12/2021) (mro)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie M. Brickell dated May 7, 2021 re: Proposed Protective Order. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #24 MOTION for Tammy Marzigliano to Withdraw as Attorney Letter Motion. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Tammy Theresa Marzigliano terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/3/2021) (jca)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULE: This is a non-jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 7/11/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/11/2021. Discovery due by 8/17/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Status Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2021. Ready for Trial by 11/9/2021. The estimated trial time is three days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/3/2021) (ks) Modified on 3/3/2021 (ks).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled to occur on March 9, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby cancelled. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/3/2021) (ks)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Tammy Marzigliano to Withdraw as Attorney Letter Motion. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Marzigliano, Tammy)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for 3/9/2021 addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie Brickell dated 3/2/2021. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Michael E. Satti dated 2/25/21 re: Adjournment of 3/9/21 Initial Pretrial Conf and Request for Virtual Conference. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Satti, Michael)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Keeco Holdings, LLC for Keeco, LLC. Document filed by Keeco, LLC..(Brunner, Stephen)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Stephen P. Brunner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/4/2021) (ks)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leena M. Charlton on behalf of Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Charlton, Leena)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Mark Brickell on behalf of Symphony Investment Partners, Inc...(Brickell, Jamie)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 THIRD MOTION for Stephen Paul Brunner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate Of The Clerk Of The Supreme Court Of The State Of California, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Brunner, Stephen)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 THIRD MOTION for Stephen Paul Brunner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Stephen P. Brunner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Stephen P. Brunner In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice (Notarized), #2 Exhibit Certificate Of Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Brunner, Stephen) Modified on 2/2/2021 (wb).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stephen P. Brunner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23792663. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Brunner, Stephen) Modified on 2/2/2021 (wb).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Satti, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Stephen P. Brunner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23792663. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 AMENDED MOTION for Stephen P. Brunner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Michael Eric Satti to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Michael E. Satti, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/26/21) (yv)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Michael Eric Satti to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Platt. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23671960. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Richard Platt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (CT), #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Satti, Michael)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by Richard Platt. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Richard Platt answer due 2/8/2021.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/25/2021) (jwh)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Michael Eric Satti to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Platt. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23671960. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Rebecca S. Malinguaggio dated January 22, 2021 re: Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Rebecca S. Malinguaggio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (tro)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Rebecca S. Malinguaggio to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Platt. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23509690. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Richard Platt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (CT), #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Malinguaggio, Rebecca)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Rebecca S. Malinguaggio to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Platt. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23509690. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Letter Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. filed by Richard Platt. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., (Richard Platt answer due 1/25/2021.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/13/21) (yv)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Tammy Marzigliano dated January 13, 2021 re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Richard Platt..(Marzigliano, Tammy)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/30/2020) (jwh)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marzigliano, Tammy)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 655570-2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22730081).Document filed by Richard Platt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint).(Marzigliano, Tammy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symphony Investment Partners, Inc. v. Keeco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symphony Investment Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Mark Brickell
Represented By: Leena M. Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeco, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Platt
Represented By: Tammy Theresa Marzigliano
Represented By: Rebecca Malinguaggio
Represented By: Michael E Satti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?