Viahart, LLC v. Creative Kids Online, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Viahart, LLC
Defendant: CK Online, LLC, Creative Kids Enterprises, LLC, Creative Kids Far East, Inc., Creative Kids Online, LLC and Playlearn USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09943
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Playlearn USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/16/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Drangel, Jason)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Playlearn USA, Inc...(Berkowitz, Mark)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Adele Hudak on behalf of Playlearn USA, Inc...(Hudak, Sandra)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Berkowitz on behalf of Playlearn USA, Inc...(Berkowitz, Mark)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Wendy B. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Drangel, Jason)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/30/2020) (mro)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Wendy B. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22810286. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Viahart, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mills Declaration and Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Mills, Wendy)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Playlearn USA, Inc...(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Creative Kids Online, LLC..(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Creative Kids Far East, Inc...(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Creative Kids Enterprises, LLC..(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CK Online, LLC..(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Wendy B. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22810286. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brieanne Scully. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1114;. (jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashly Erin Sands on behalf of Viahart, LLC..(Sands, Ashly)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason M. Drangel on behalf of Viahart, LLC..(Drangel, Jason)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Playlearn USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Creative Kids Online, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Creative Kids Far East, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Creative Kids Enterprises, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CK Online, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Viahart, LLC..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scully, Brieanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CK Online, LLC, Creative Kids Enterprises, LLC, Creative Kids Far East, Inc., Creative Kids Online, LLC, Playlearn USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22750188)Document filed by Viahart, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20).(Scully, Brieanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viahart, LLC v. Creative Kids Online, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CK Online, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Kids Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Kids Far East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Kids Online, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playlearn USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra Adele Hudak
Represented By: Mark Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viahart, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Drangel
Represented By: Brieanne Scully
Represented By: Ashly Erin Sands
Represented By: Wendy B Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?