Dejesus Cedeno v. Argent Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Dejesus Cedeno
Defendant: Twist Financials, Duke Enterprises, Ian Behar, Strategic Financial Solutions, L.L.C., Ryan Sasson, Argent Trust Company, Daniel Blumkin, Blaise Investments, Blaise Investments LLC, Duke Enterprises LLC, Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC and Twist Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09987
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Antonia Moran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/18/2021) (ks)
January 15, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Antonia Mia Moran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23529786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 15, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Antonia Mia Moran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23529786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ian Behar, Blaise Investments LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Duke Enterprises LLC, Ryan Sasson, Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC, Twist Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Good Standing Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Moran, Antonia)
December 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #37 MOTION for Patrick O. Muench to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Affidavit or Declaration;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
December 30, 2020 Filing 37 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Patrick O. Muench to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patrick Muench Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Jenny, Ryan) Modified on 12/30/2020 (vba).
December 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #36 MOTION for Patrick O. Muench to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23271844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Attorney Affidavit/Declaration per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
December 30, 2020 Filing 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Patrick O. Muench to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23271844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Jenny, Ryan) Modified on 12/30/2020 (bcu).
December 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 2/15/2021. (jca)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/29/2020) (jca)
December 28, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jeremy P. Blumenfeld dated December 28, 2020. Document filed by Ian Behar, Blaise Investments LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Duke Enterprises LLC, Ryan Sasson, Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC, Twist Financial LLC..(Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld on behalf of Ian Behar, Blaise Investments LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Duke Enterprises LLC, Ryan Sasson, Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC, Twist Financial LLC..(Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
December 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Argent Trust Company answer due 2/15/2021. (ks)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/21/2020) (ks)
December 18, 2020 Filing 31 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael J. Prame dated December 18, 2020. Document filed by Argent Trust Company..(Prame, Michael)
December 18, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Prame on behalf of Argent Trust Company..(Prame, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Babiak on behalf of Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Babiak, Laura)
December 17, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,. Daniel Blumkin served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. Service was accepted by Cynthia Byrne, Co-Resident. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #26 Motion for Laura E. Babiak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/17/2020) (ama)
December 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Laura E. Babiak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-23043307. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 15, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Laura E. Babiak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-23043307. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Jenny, Ryan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Y. Porter on behalf of Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Porter, Gregory)
December 14, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,. Twist Financial LLC served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Service was accepted by Heather Howle, Authorized Agent of Twist Financial LLC. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
December 14, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,. Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. Service was accepted by Heather Howle, Authorized Agent of Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
December 14, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,. Argent Trust Company served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. Service was accepted by Eric Still, Authorized Agent of Argent Trust. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
December 1, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC..(dnh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Argent Trust Company..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Strategic Financial Solutions LLC, re: #17 Complaint,. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Argent Trust Company, re: #17 Complaint,. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 COMPLAINT against Argent Trust Company, Ian Behar, Blaise Investments LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Duke Enterprises LLC, Ryan Sasson, Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC, Twist Financial LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22806906)Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blaise Investments LLC..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Twist Financial LLC..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Duke Enterprises LLC..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ryan T. Jenny. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Blaise Investments; Strategic Financial Solutions; Twist Financials ; Duke Enterprises. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ian Behar..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Blumkin..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Sasson..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ryan T. Jenny to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected; the names of each of the parties must be listed in the docket entry text. Select multiple parties by holding the 'Ctrl' buttin. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
November 27, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Blaise Investments LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Strategic Financial Solutions, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan) Modified on 11/30/2020 (dnh).
November 27, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Twist Financials LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Duke Enterprises LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ian Behar, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Blumkin, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Sasson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Argent Trust Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan) Modified on 11/30/2020 (dnh).
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jenny, Ryan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-22781296)Document filed by Ramon Dejesus Cedeno..(Jenny, Ryan) Modified on 11/30/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dejesus Cedeno v. Argent Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twist Financials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Behar
Represented By: Antonia Moran
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Financial Solutions, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Sasson
Represented By: Antonia Moran
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argent Trust Company
Represented By: Michael Joseph Prame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Blumkin
Represented By: Antonia Moran
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaise Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaise Investments LLC
Represented By: Antonia Moran
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Antonia Moran
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Antonia Moran
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twist Financial LLC
Represented By: Antonia Moran
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Dejesus Cedeno
Represented By: Ryan T. Jenny
Represented By: Gregory Y. Porter
Represented By: Laura Babiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?