Barger v. Malkin et al
Petitioner: Danielle P. Barger
Respondent: Melvyn H. Halper, Thomas N. keltner, Jr., Empire State Liquidity Fund LLC, Virginia Shasha, Shirley Adler, Mary Jane Fales, Myrna Joy Edelman, Laurence Adler, Anthony E. Malkin, Peter L. Malkin, Wendy S. Tamis, Vivienne Pero, Judith Jacobson, Phyllis J. Halper and Malkin Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09991
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion under Rule 21 to drop parties addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John W. Griggs dated December 23, 2020. filed by Virginia Shasha, Vivienne Pero, Melvyn H. Halper, Wendy S. Tamis, Shirley Adler, Empire State Liquidity Fund LLC, Mary Jane Fales, Myrna Joy Edelman, Laurence Adler, Phyllis J. Halper. ENDORSEMENT: By January 26, 2021, Petitioner shall file a response to this letter, stating its position concerning whether to drop the additional respondents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. (Responses due by 1/26/2021) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/19/2021) (cf)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jose Anibal Baez dated 01/05/21 re: Motion to Remand. Document filed by Danielle P. Barger..(Baez, Jose)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David S. Pegno on behalf of Anthony E. Malkin, Peter L. Malkin, Malkin Holdings LLC, Thomas N. keltner, Jr..(Pegno, David)
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jenifer L Salzberg on behalf of Anthony E. Malkin, Peter L. Malkin, Malkin Holdings LLC, Thomas N. keltner, Jr..(Salzberg, Jenifer)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion under Rule 21 to drop parties addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John W. Griggs dated December 23, 2020. Document filed by Laurence Adler, Shirley Adler, Myrna Joy Edelman, Empire State Liquidity Fund LLC, Mary Jane Fales, Melvyn H. Halper, Phyllis J. Halper, Vivienne Pero, Virginia Shasha, Wendy S. Tamis..(Griggs, John)
December 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/30/2020. Responses due by 1/22/2021 Replies due by 2/12/2021. (kv)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' requests for extensions of time to file and oppose a motion to remand is GRANTED. By December 30, 2020, Petitioner shall file a motion to remand. By January 22, 2021, Respondents shall file their opposition. By February 12, 2021, Petitioner shall file a reply, if any. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 5. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/15/2020) (kv)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Anibal Baez on behalf of Danielle P. Barger..(Baez, Jose)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Thomas E.L. Dewey dated December 7, 2020. Document filed by Anthony E. Malkin, Peter L. Malkin, Malkin Holdings LLC, Thomas N. keltner, Jr..(Dewey, Thomas)
December 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 2, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-09874-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 30, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 1:20-cv-09874-AT. (dnh)
November 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ESRT Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Empire State Realty OP, L.P. for Malkin Holdings LLC. Document filed by Anthony E. Malkin, Peter L. Malkin, Malkin Holdings LLC, Thomas N. keltner, Jr..(Dewey, Thomas)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-09874. Document filed by Anthony E. Malkin, Peter L. Malkin, Malkin Holdings LLC, Thomas N. keltner, Jr..(Dewey, Thomas)
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dewey, Thomas)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 656296/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22784319).Document filed by Peter L. Malkin, Anthony E. Malkin, Thomas N. keltner, Jr, Malkin Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Barger Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Barger Petition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Baez Aff, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Baez Ex. A Final Arb Award, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Baez Ex. B Participating Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Arb Statement of Claim and Amendment, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Arb Answer and Counterclaims).(Dewey, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barger v. Malkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melvyn H. Halper
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas N. keltner, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas E.L. Dewey
Represented By: David S. Pegno
Represented By: Jenifer L Salzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Empire State Liquidity Fund LLC
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia Shasha
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shirley Adler
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary Jane Fales
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Myrna Joy Edelman
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Laurence Adler
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony E. Malkin
Represented By: Thomas E.L. Dewey
Represented By: David S. Pegno
Represented By: Jenifer L Salzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter L. Malkin
Represented By: Thomas E.L. Dewey
Represented By: David S. Pegno
Represented By: Jenifer L Salzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendy S. Tamis
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vivienne Pero
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Judith Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phyllis J. Halper
Represented By: John Wyeth Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Malkin Holdings LLC
Represented By: Thomas E.L. Dewey
Represented By: David S. Pegno
Represented By: Jenifer L Salzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danielle P. Barger
Represented By: Jose Anibal Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?