CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Rite Aid Corporation
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC, Hetero USA Inc., Allergan, Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Actavis, Inc., Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Torrent Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Hetero Labs Ltd., Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., AbbVie Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Hetero Drugs LTD., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (CT), Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Allergan USA, Inc. and ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv10087
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021; Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. Service was accepted by [see individual affidavits]. Document filed by Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(McHugh, Caitlin)
January 15, 2021 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd...(pc)
January 14, 2021 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
January 13, 2021 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY)..(gp)
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd...(gp)
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(gp)
January 11, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander) Modified on 1/12/2021 (gp). Modified on 1/13/2021 (gp).
January 11, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander) Modified on 1/12/2021 (gp). Modified on 1/13/2021 (gp).
January 11, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander) Modified on 1/12/2021 (gp). Modified on 1/13/2021 (gp).
December 23, 2020 Filing 20 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (CT), Hetero Drugs LTD., Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Actavis, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd., Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., Allergan, Inc., ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (CT), Hetero Drugs LTD., Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Actavis, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd., Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., Allergan, Inc., ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 159 .(Egervary, Alexander)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE SCHEDULE AND OTHER PROCEDURES: NOW THEREFORE, in order to promote efficiency in managing and litigating these actions and to coordinate the deadlines and procedures in these actions with those in the related case, In re Bystolic Antitrust Litigation, No. 1:20-cv-05735-LJL, the Parties stipulate and agree as follows: (As further set forth herein.) 7. Amended Complaints and Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by December 23, 2020. Defendants shall move in response to the amended complaints by February 8, 2021; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition(s) no later than 35 days after Defendants file any motion(s) in response to the complaints; Defendants shall file their replies in support of their motion(s), if any, no later than 28 days after Plaintiffs file any opposition(s); and oral argument, if any, on the motions to dismiss shall be on a date set by the Court. Plaintiffs may amend their complaints no later than 35 days following the filing of Defendants' motion(s) to dismiss pursuant to the Court's Individual Practice 3.B. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2020. Motions due by 2/8/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/22/2020) (va)
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Perwin, Scott)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Other Affiliate Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., for Rite Aid Corporation. Document filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Alexander John Egervary to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(jgo)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 7, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 7, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd...(jgo)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(jgo)
December 3, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20-cv-5538. (jgo)
December 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-09793 (LJL). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-08756 (LJL). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-08754 (LJL). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-07110 (LJL). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05735 (LJL). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05538 (LJL). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rite Aid Corporation..(Egervary, Alexander) Modified on 12/11/2020 (ldi).
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc...(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Egervary, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AbbVie Inc., Actavis, Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Hetero Drugs LTD., Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (CT), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22843830)Document filed by Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,..(Egervary, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascend Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Generics Inc., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Drugs LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (CT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Generics Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?