Evans v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Evans
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Marget Egan, Patsy Yang and Cynthania Brann
Case Number: 1:2020cv10124
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account statements for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which he is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if his address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if he fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/29/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by James Evans.(sc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by James Evans.(sc)
December 4, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to James Evans, NYSID: 02661513L, B&C No. 2412001523 at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck St., Bronx, NY 10474. (Attachments: # 1 IFP application, # 2 Prisoner Authorization) (dsh)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 1/4/2021. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/4/2021. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 1/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on December 4, 2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP application, #2 Prisoner Authorization) (jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 4, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
December 3, 2020 Mailed a copy of #1 Order, to James Evans, # 2412001523 at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck St., Bronx, NY 10474. (dsh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from James Evans re: Please add me to the Michael J. Lee Class action Lawsuit. Document filed by James Evans..(rdz)
December 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cynthania Brann, Department of Corrections, Marget Egan, Patsy Yang. Document filed by James Evans..(rdz)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to open separate civil actions with new docket numbers for the following plaintiffs: Allen Nimmons #3492002662; James Evans #2412001523; Luis Charles #1412002870; Joe Brewton #3492002387; Mario Espinal #3492002562; George Macedon #3492002165; Flores Jose #3492002283; Jonathan Morales #1412002971; Cabral Victor #1412001723; Parris V. Colon #1412002813; Dayquan Johnson #1412002936; Pham Lam #8951901162; and Juan Ortiz #3492002305. A copy of the Amended Complaint (ECF No. 14) and this Order should be docketed in each new case. In addition, a copy of the Amended Complaint should be filed in each of the previously severed cases (see ECF No. 7) and the letters filed by Dayquan Johnson (ECF No. 15), James Evans (ECF No. 16) and Parris V. Colon (ECF No. 17) should be filed in their respective individual cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and each of the 13 new plaintiffs listed herein at the following address: Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, Bronx, New York, 10474, and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/1/20) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2020) (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marget Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthania Brann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?