Tatum-Rios v. Grace Loves Lace Inc
Plaintiff: Lynette Tatum-Rios and Lynnette Tatum-Rios
Defendant: Grace Loves Lace Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv10132
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint until and including February 19, 2021, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher L. Donati dated January 19, 2021. Document filed by Grace Loves Lace Inc. So ordered. Grace Loves Lace Inc answer due 2/19/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/21/2021) (rjm)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint until and including February 19, 2021, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher L. Donati dated January 19, 2021. Document filed by Grace Loves Lace Inc..(Donati, Christopher)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Grace Loves Lace Inc served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Lynnette Tatum-Rios..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, February 19, 2021 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/16/2020) (nb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grace Loves Lace Inc..(dnh)
December 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
December 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Howard Lowe. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lynette Tatum-Rios. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (dnh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Grace Loves Lace Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lynette Tatum-Rios..(Lowe, Christopher)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lowe, Christopher)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grace Loves Lace Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22851682)Document filed by Lynette Tatum-Rios..(Lowe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatum-Rios v. Grace Loves Lace Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Loves Lace Inc
Represented By: Christopher Louis Donati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Tatum-Rios
Represented By: Christopher Howard Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Tatum-Rios
Represented By: Christopher Howard Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?