Hamilton et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Estate of Marie Munhall, Raynard D Hamilton, Jr, Brenda B Hamilton, Patricia M McAdams, Raynard Hamilton, Raymond M Hamilton, Kathleen Abidin, Brenda Hamilton, Raymond Hamilton and Patricia McAdams
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2020cv10366
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/3/21) (yv)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran..(jgo)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amanda Fox Perry. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brenda B Hamilton; Raymond M Hamilton; Patricia M McAdams; Estate of Marie Munhall. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was removed. (jgo)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Amanda Fox Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22956593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raynard Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 MD Cert of Good Standing, #3 DC Cert of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Perry, Amanda)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Kathleen Abidin, Brenda B Hamilton, Raymond M Hamilton, Raynard Hamilton, Raynard D Hamilton, Jr, Patricia M McAdams, Marie Munhall..(Perry, Amanda)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kathleen Abidin, Brenda B Hamilton, Raymond M Hamilton, Raynard Hamilton, Raynard D Hamilton, Jr, Patricia M McAdams, Marie Munhall..(Perry, Amanda)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perry, Amanda)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22956252)Document filed by Patricia M McAdams, Raynard Hamilton, Raymond M Hamilton, Raynard D Hamilton, Jr, Marie Munhall, Brenda B Hamilton, Kathleen Abidin. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiffs).(Perry, Amanda)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Amanda Fox Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22956593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/B. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Marie Munhall
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynard D Hamilton, Jr
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda B Hamilton
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M McAdams
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynard Hamilton
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond M Hamilton
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Abidin
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hamilton
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Hamilton
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McAdams
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?