Pezzo et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carol A. Pezzo and Domenic Pezzo
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Gardner Denver, Inc., Alfa Laval, Inc., Graybar Electric Company Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Resillo Press Pad Co., Ford Motor Company, Kamco Supply Corp., Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation, Ametek, Inc., General Electric Company, John E. Potente & Sons, Inc., f, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Tingue Brown & Co., Mack Trucks, Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc., Hoffman-NewYorker Inc., Navistar, Inc., Standard Motor Products Inc., Qualitex Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, Paccar, Inc., FMC Corporation, Glas Mesh Company, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Champlain Cable Corporation, G.A. Braun, Inc. and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10433
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446as
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria)
February 2, 2021 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval, Inc.. Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria)
February 1, 2021 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Frank Jordan in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Ametek, Inc...(Jordan, Frank)
January 29, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Carol A. Pezzo, Domenic Pezzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Falda, Nathaniel)
January 27, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David P. Schaffer on behalf of Qualitex Company..(Schaffer, David)
January 27, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria)
January 27, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria)
January 22, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Ametek, Inc...(Jordan, Frank)
January 22, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Frank Jordan in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Ametek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Fact Sheet and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - NYSCEF System User Manual, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Chart A, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 - Maune Rachel Amended Standard Asbestos Complaint No. 2, #6 Exhibit 6 - Discovery Response Excerpt from Brown v. Amchen Products, #7 Exhibit 7 - Discovery Response Excerpt from Maguire v. A.C. & S, #8 Exhibit 8 - Discovery Response Excerpt from Levy v. A.O. Smith).(Jordan, Frank)
January 13, 2021 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. for Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. Document filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc...(O'Rourke, Philip)
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Justin O'Rourke on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc...(O'Rourke, Philip)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Patrick Hannan on behalf of FMC Corporation..(Hannan, Christopher)
January 11, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Patrick Hannan on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc...(Hannan, Christopher)
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand . Document filed by Carol A. Pezzo, Domenic Pezzo. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Remand, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 C).(Falda, Nathaniel)
January 5, 2021 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AmpcoPittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John)
January 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John Samuel Howarth to RE-FILE Document #19 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
December 23, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John)
December 23, 2020 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John) Modified on 1/5/2021 (ldi).
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Samuel Howarth on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Graybar Electric Company Inc...(Corbin, Steven)
December 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Thomas Corbin on behalf of Graybar Electric Company Inc...(Corbin, Steven)
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. (Owner of Ten Percent Plus Stock) for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Document filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company..(Lee, Lawrence)
December 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Gable Lee on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company..(Lee, Lawrence)
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Navistar International Corporation for Navistar, Inc.. Document filed by Navistar, Inc...(Weill, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Melody Kozin on behalf of Crane Co...(Kozin, Nicole)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crane Co...(Pehush, Tara)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Lynne Pehush on behalf of Crane Co...(Pehush, Tara)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC. Document filed by Warren Pumps LLC..(Goodearl, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC..(Goodearl, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc.. Document filed by IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
December 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Anne Weill on behalf of Navistar, Inc...(Weill, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on All Parties on December 10, 2020. Document filed by Ametek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed on State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court Annexed as Exhibit A to State Court Filing, #3 Exhibit Confirmation Notice from NYSCEF confirming transmission of papers to All Counsel of Record via E-mail, #4 Exhibit E-mail to Counsel for All Parties Attaching Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court and Exhibit A thereto - Notice of Removal to Federal Court).(Jordan, Frank)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ametek, Inc...(Jordan, Frank)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jordan, Frank)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190223-2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22978033).Document filed by Ametek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Answers to NYCAL Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' First Amended Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Ametek's Filed Answer with Cross-Claims, #6 Exhibit F - Vol. 1 to Plaintiff Domenic Pezzo's Deposition, #7 Exhibit G - Vol. 2 to Plaintiff Domenic Pezzo's Deposition, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Thomas Deeney, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of RADM David P. Sargent, Jr. USN (Ret.), #10 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sargent Declaration - Bureau of Ships Manual, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B to Sargent Declaration - Journal of Industrial Hygiene and Toxicology, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C to Sargent Declaration - Chapter 39, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D to Sargent Declaration - Gen Specs, #14 Exhibit Exhibit E to Sargent Declaration - Military Standards, #15 Exhibit Exhibit F1 to Sargent Declaration - Fletcher Class Schedules Pt. 1, #16 Exhibit Exhibit F2 to Sargent Declaration - Fletcher Class Schedules Pt. 2, #17 Exhibit Exhibit G to Sargent Declaration - Sumner Gearing Schedules, #18 Exhibit Exhibit H to Sargent Declaration - Essex Class Insulation and Standards, #19 Exhibit Exhibit I to Sargent Declaration - 1979 Letter, #20 Exhibit Exhibit J1 to Sargent Declaration - 1942 Manual Correspondence, #21 Exhibit Exhibit J2 to Sargent Declaration - 1959 Manual Correspondence, #22 Exhibit Exhibit J3 to Sargent Declaration - 1966 Manual Correspondence, #23 Exhibit Exhibit K to Sargent Declaration - MIL-I-15024, #24 Exhibit Exhibit L to Sargent Declaration - MIL-P-15024B, #25 Exhibit Exhibit M to Sargent Declaration - Gen Spec for Mach S-1, #26 Exhibit Exhibit N to Sargent Declaration - MIL-B-15071, #27 Exhibit Exhibit O to Sargent Declaration - MIL-B-15071A, #28 Exhibit Exhibit P to Sargent Declaration - MIL-M-15071C, #29 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Sargent Declaration - MIL-T-15071B, #30 Exhibit Exhibit R to Sargent Declaration - MIL-M-15071D).(Jordan, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pezzo et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Maria C. Carlucci
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graybar Electric Company Inc.
Represented By: Steven Thomas Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John Samuel Howarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resillo Press Pad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamco Supply Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Justin O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potente & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Lawrence Gable Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tingue Brown & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman-NewYorker Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Weill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitex Company
Represented By: David P. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Maria C. Carlucci
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glas Mesh Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Cable Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.A. Braun, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Pezzo
Represented By: Nathaniel Naftali Falda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenic Pezzo
Represented By: Nathaniel Naftali Falda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?