Asaro et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Paulette Hasson, Lee Gargano, Barbara Duffy, Dolores Audiffred, Irene Sword, Nancy Kelly, Jane Gollan, Maria Rich, Clarissa Kirschenbaum, Joseph John Hasson, IV, Farah Frenkel, Minerva Rosario, Josefina Gonzalez, Kathleen Wojslaw, Robert Weingard, Peter Asaro, Samantha Allen, David Sword, Shirley Innella, Thomas Gary, Marc Weingard, Jose Gonzalez, Robert Davenport, Margaret Randazzo-Maloy, Lillian Zambrana, Jeanne Osterndorf, Luz Vale, Wesley Graf, Yolanda Cerda, Edward Arjune, Susan O'Connor, Victoria Zanotto, Alex Stone, Maria Gonzalez, David Schlegel, Paul Asaro, Douglas Evans, Nelida Gonzalez, Rosalie Marti, Mary Hasson, Mario Truglio, Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez, Denise White, Meryl Friedman Price, Christopher Hasson, John Joseph Curtin, Diana Mena, Jasmine DeJesus, Marykay Kemper, Joseph John Hasson, Jr., Graeme Sword, Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr., Toolsiedai Seepersaud, Richard Schlegel, James Friedman, Christina Savas, Leandra Hart, John Duffy, Elvin Schlegel, Allan Sword, Christopher Charles Clarke, Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez, Lisa Iraci, Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr., Iris J. Friedman, Sandra O'Connor Carey, Joshua Stone, Nixia Mena-Alexis, Christina Leonard, Jamal Green, Esterlina Rivera, Michael Magee, Eneida Ramos, Neil Peraza, Stacey Stone, Perry Sikorsky, James Devlin, Amy Vazquez and Ruby Awan
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2020cv10460
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/3/2021) (cf)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint deemed filed on December 10, 2020, Summons, Statement of relatedness, Notice of Suit prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1220, 1391(f), 1441(d) and 1602-1611, Affidavit of Translator(along with translations of the above documents in Farsi). mailed to Mohammad Javad Zarif at the following address: Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 01/20/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 816111844458, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (JKR)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on December 10, 2020, Civil Cover Sheet, Statement of Relatedness, Notice of suit, Affidavit of Translator mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javal Zarif at the following address: Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 12/14/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002607853US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (JKR)
December 11, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 11, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 11, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samantha Allen, Edward Arjune, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, Dolores Audiffred, Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr, Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr., Yolanda Cerda(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Leonard), Yolanda Cerda(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Leonard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Matthew Leonard), Christopher Charles Clarke, John Joseph Curtin, Robert Davenport, Jasmine DeJesus, James Devlin, Barbara Duffy(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Duffy), Barbara Duffy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Duffy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Duffy), John Duffy, Douglas Evans, Farah Frenkel, Iris J. Friedman, James Friedman, Meryl Friedman Price, Lee Gargano, Thomas Gary, Jane Gollan, Jose Gonzalez, Josefina Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nelida Gonzalez, Wesley Graf, Jamal Green, Leandra Hart, Christopher Hasson, Joseph John Hasson, Jr, Joseph John Hasson, IV, Mary Hasson(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph John Hasson, III), Mary Hasson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph John Hasson, III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph John Hasson, III), Paulette Hasson, Shirley Innella, Lisa Iraci, Nancy Kelly(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sylvia Kelly, deceased, the late parent of Thomas Michael Kelly), Nancy Kelly(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Michael Kelly), Marykay Kemper, Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Adolph Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fanni Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Christina Leonard, Michael Magee, Rosalie Marti, Diana Mena, Nixia Mena-Alexis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Aurelio Mena, deceased, the late parent of Diarelia Mena), Nixia Mena-Alexis(individually, as surviving sibling of Diarelia Mena), Susan O'Connor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis O'Connor, deceased, the late parent of Keith O'Connor), Susan O'Connor(individually, as surviving parent of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Keith O'Connor, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(individually, as surviving spouse of Keith O'Connor), Jeanne Osterndorf, Neil Peraza(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. Peraza, deceased, the late parent of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Peraza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert Peraza), Eneida Ramos, Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez, Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez, Margaret Randazzo-Maloy, Maria Rich, Esterlina Rivera, Minerva Rosario(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodolfo Rosario, deceased, the late sibling of Aida Rosario), Minerva Rosario(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Aida Rosario, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Aida Rosario), Christina Savas, David Schlegel, Elvin Schlegel, Richard Schlegel, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (individually, as surviving parent of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (individually, as surviving parent of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of George K. Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luzia Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Alex Stone, Joshua Stone, Stacey Stone(individually, as surviving spouse of Lonny Jay Stone), Stacey Stone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lonny Stone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lonny Jay Stone), Allan Sword, David Sword, Graeme Sword, Irene Sword, Mario Truglio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Marti, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Marti), Mario Truglio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodger Marti, deceased, the late parent of Michael Marti), Luz Vale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivan Vale, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ivan Vale), Luz Vale(individually, as surviving spouse of Ivan Vale), Amy Vazquez, Marc Weingard(individually, as surviving sibling of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bonnie Feldman, deceased, the late parent of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Weingard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Scott Weingard), Robert Weingard, Denise White, Kathleen Wojslaw, Lillian Zambrana, Victoria Zanotto..(dnh)
December 11, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (dnh)
December 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
December 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand omitted. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (dnh)
December 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated December 10, 2020 re: In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, No. 03-MDL-1570 (GBD) (SN); Paul Asaro et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, No. 20-cv-10460. Document filed by Samantha Allen, Edward Arjune, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, Dolores Audiffred, Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr, Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr, Yolanda Cerda(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Leonard), Yolanda Cerda(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Leonard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Matthew Leonard), Christopher Charles Clarke, John Joseph Curtin, Robert Davenport, Jasmine DeJesus, James Devlin, Barbara Duffy(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Duffy), Barbara Duffy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Duffy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Duffy), John Duffy, Douglas Evans, Farah Frenkel, Iris J. Friedman, James Friedman, Meryl Friedman Price, Lee Gargano, Thomas Gary, Jane Gollan, Jose Gonzalez, Josefina Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nelida Gonzalez, Wesley Graf, Jamal Green, Leandra Hart, Christopher Hasson, Joseph John Hasson, Jr, Joseph John Hasson, IV, Mary Hasson(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph John Hasson, III), Mary Hasson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph John Hasson, III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph John Hasson, III), Paulette Hasson, Shirley Innella, Lisa Iraci, Nancy Kelly(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sylvia Kelly, deceased, the late parent of Thomas Michael Kelly), Nancy Kelly(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Michael Kelly), Marykay Kemper, Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Adolph Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fanni Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Christina Leonard, Michael Magee, Rosalie Marti, Diana Mena, Nixia Mena-Alexis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Aurelio Mena, deceased, the late parent of Diarelia Mena), Nixia Mena-Alexis(individually, as surviving sibling of Diarelia Mena), Susan O'Connor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis O'Connor, deceased, the late parent of Keith O'Connor), Susan O'Connor(individually, as surviving parent of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Keith O'Connor, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(individually, as surviving spouse of Keith O'Connor), Jeanne Osterndorf, Neil Peraza(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. Peraza, deceased, the late parent of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Peraza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert Peraza), Eneida Ramos, Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez, Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez, Margaret Randazzo-Maloy, Maria Rich, Esterlina Rivera, Minerva Rosario(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodolfo Rosario, deceased, the late sibling of Aida Rosario), Minerva Rosario(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Aida Rosario, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Aida Rosario), Christina Savas, David Schlegel, Elvin Schlegel, Richard Schlegel, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (individually, as surviving parent of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (individually, as surviving parent of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of George K. Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luzia Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Alex Stone, Joshua Stone, Stacey Stone(individually, as surviving spouse of Lonny Jay Stone), Stacey Stone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lonny Stone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lonny Jay Stone), Allan Sword, David Sword, Graeme Sword, Irene Sword, Mario Truglio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Marti, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Marti), Mario Truglio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodger Marti, deceased, the late parent of Michael Marti), Luz Vale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivan Vale, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ivan Vale), Luz Vale(individually, as surviving spouse of Ivan Vale), Amy Vazquez, Marc Weingard(individually, as surviving sibling of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bonnie Feldman, deceased, the late parent of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Weingard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Scott Weingard), Robert Weingard, Denise White, Kathleen Wojslaw, Lillian Zambrana, Victoria Zanotto..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Toolsiedai Seepersaud,Toolsiedai Seepersaud,Toolsiedai Seepersaud,Toolsiedai Seepersaud,Toolsiedai Seepersaud,Toolsiedai Seepersaud. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Samantha Allen, Edward Arjune, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, Dolores Audiffred, Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr, Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr, Yolanda Cerda(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Leonard), Yolanda Cerda(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Leonard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Matthew Leonard), Christopher Charles Clarke, John Joseph Curtin, Robert Davenport, Jasmine DeJesus, James Devlin, Barbara Duffy(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Duffy), Barbara Duffy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Duffy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Duffy), John Duffy, Douglas Evans, Farah Frenkel, Iris J. Friedman, James Friedman, Meryl Friedman Price, Lee Gargano, Thomas Gary, Jane Gollan, Jose Gonzalez, Josefina Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nelida Gonzalez, Wesley Graf, Jamal Green, Leandra Hart, Christopher Hasson, Joseph John Hasson, Jr, Joseph John Hasson, IV, Mary Hasson(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph John Hasson, III), Mary Hasson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph John Hasson, III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph John Hasson, III), Paulette Hasson, Shirley Innella, Lisa Iraci, Nancy Kelly(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sylvia Kelly, deceased, the late parent of Thomas Michael Kelly), Nancy Kelly(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Michael Kelly), Marykay Kemper, Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Adolph Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fanni Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Christina Leonard, Michael Magee, Rosalie Marti, Diana Mena, Nixia Mena-Alexis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Aurelio Mena, deceased, the late parent of Diarelia Mena), Nixia Mena-Alexis(individually, as surviving sibling of Diarelia Mena), Susan O'Connor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis O'Connor, deceased, the late parent of Keith O'Connor), Susan O'Connor(individually, as surviving parent of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Keith O'Connor, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(individually, as surviving spouse of Keith O'Connor), Jeanne Osterndorf, Neil Peraza(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. Peraza, deceased, the late parent of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Peraza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert Peraza), Eneida Ramos, Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez, Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez, Margaret Randazzo-Maloy, Maria Rich, Esterlina Rivera, Minerva Rosario(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodolfo Rosario, deceased, the late sibling of Aida Rosario), Minerva Rosario(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Aida Rosario, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Aida Rosario), Christina Savas, David Schlegel, Elvin Schlegel, Richard Schlegel, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of George K. Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luzia Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Alex Stone, Joshua Stone, Stacey Stone(individually, as surviving spouse of Lonny Jay Stone), Stacey Stone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lonny Stone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lonny Jay Stone), Allan Sword, David Sword, Graeme Sword, Irene Sword, Mario Truglio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Marti, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Marti), Mario Truglio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodger Marti, deceased, the late parent of Michael Marti), Luz Vale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivan Vale, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ivan Vale), Luz Vale(individually, as surviving spouse of Ivan Vale), Amy Vazquez, Marc Weingard(individually, as surviving sibling of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bonnie Feldman, deceased, the late parent of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Weingard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Scott Weingard), Robert Weingard, Denise White, Kathleen Wojslaw, Lillian Zambrana, Victoria Zanotto..(Strong, Bruce)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Samantha Allen, Edward Arjune, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, Dolores Audiffred, Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr, Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr, Yolanda Cerda(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Leonard), Yolanda Cerda(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Leonard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Matthew Leonard), Christopher Charles Clarke, John Joseph Curtin, Robert Davenport, Jasmine DeJesus, James Devlin, Barbara Duffy(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Duffy), Barbara Duffy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Duffy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Duffy), John Duffy, Douglas Evans, Farah Frenkel, Iris J. Friedman, James Friedman, Meryl Friedman Price, Lee Gargano, Thomas Gary, Jane Gollan, Jose Gonzalez, Josefina Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nelida Gonzalez, Wesley Graf, Jamal Green, Leandra Hart, Christopher Hasson, Joseph John Hasson, Jr, Joseph John Hasson, IV, Mary Hasson(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph John Hasson, III), Mary Hasson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph John Hasson, III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph John Hasson, III), Paulette Hasson, Shirley Innella, Lisa Iraci, Nancy Kelly(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sylvia Kelly, deceased, the late parent of Thomas Michael Kelly), Nancy Kelly(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Michael Kelly), Marykay Kemper, Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Adolph Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fanni Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Christina Leonard, Michael Magee, Rosalie Marti, Diana Mena, Nixia Mena-Alexis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Aurelio Mena, deceased, the late parent of Diarelia Mena), Nixia Mena-Alexis(individually, as surviving sibling of Diarelia Mena), Susan O'Connor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis O'Connor, deceased, the late parent of Keith O'Connor), Susan O'Connor(individually, as surviving parent of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Keith O'Connor, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(individually, as surviving spouse of Keith O'Connor), Jeanne Osterndorf, Neil Peraza(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. Peraza, deceased, the late parent of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Peraza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert Peraza), Eneida Ramos, Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez, Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez, Margaret Randazzo-Maloy, Maria Rich, Esterlina Rivera, Minerva Rosario(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodolfo Rosario, deceased, the late sibling of Aida Rosario), Minerva Rosario(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Aida Rosario, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Aida Rosario), Christina Savas, David Schlegel, Elvin Schlegel, Richard Schlegel, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of George K. Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luzia Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Alex Stone, Joshua Stone, Stacey Stone(individually, as surviving spouse of Lonny Jay Stone), Stacey Stone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lonny Stone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lonny Jay Stone), Allan Sword, David Sword, Graeme Sword, Irene Sword, Mario Truglio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Marti, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Marti), Mario Truglio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodger Marti, deceased, the late parent of Michael Marti), Luz Vale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivan Vale, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ivan Vale), Luz Vale(individually, as surviving spouse of Ivan Vale), Amy Vazquez, Marc Weingard(individually, as surviving sibling of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bonnie Feldman, deceased, the late parent of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Weingard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Scott Weingard), Robert Weingard, Denise White, Kathleen Wojslaw, Lillian Zambrana, Victoria Zanotto..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Samantha Allen, Edward Arjune, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, Dolores Audiffred, Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr, Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr, Yolanda Cerda(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Leonard), Yolanda Cerda(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Leonard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Matthew Leonard), Christopher Charles Clarke, John Joseph Curtin, Robert Davenport, Jasmine DeJesus, James Devlin, Barbara Duffy(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Duffy), Barbara Duffy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Duffy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Duffy), John Duffy, Douglas Evans, Farah Frenkel, Iris J. Friedman, James Friedman, Meryl Friedman Price, Lee Gargano, Thomas Gary, Jane Gollan, Jose Gonzalez, Josefina Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nelida Gonzalez, Wesley Graf, Jamal Green, Leandra Hart, Christopher Hasson, Joseph John Hasson, Jr, Joseph John Hasson, IV, Mary Hasson(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph John Hasson, III), Mary Hasson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph John Hasson, III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph John Hasson, III), Paulette Hasson, Shirley Innella, Lisa Iraci, Nancy Kelly(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sylvia Kelly, deceased, the late parent of Thomas Michael Kelly), Nancy Kelly(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Michael Kelly), Marykay Kemper, Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Adolph Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fanni Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Christina Leonard, Michael Magee, Rosalie Marti, Diana Mena, Nixia Mena-Alexis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Aurelio Mena, deceased, the late parent of Diarelia Mena), Nixia Mena-Alexis(individually, as surviving sibling of Diarelia Mena), Susan O'Connor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis O'Connor, deceased, the late parent of Keith O'Connor), Susan O'Connor(individually, as surviving parent of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Keith O'Connor, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Keith O'Connor), Sandra O'Connor Carey(individually, as surviving spouse of Keith O'Connor), Jeanne Osterndorf, Neil Peraza(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. Peraza, deceased, the late parent of Robert Peraza), Neil Peraza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Peraza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert Peraza), Eneida Ramos, Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez, Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez, Margaret Randazzo-Maloy, Maria Rich, Esterlina Rivera, Minerva Rosario(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodolfo Rosario, deceased, the late sibling of Aida Rosario), Minerva Rosario(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Aida Rosario, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Aida Rosario), Christina Savas, David Schlegel, Elvin Schlegel, Richard Schlegel, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Khamladai Khami Singh), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of George K. Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luzia Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Alex Stone, Joshua Stone, Stacey Stone(individually, as surviving spouse of Lonny Jay Stone), Stacey Stone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lonny Stone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lonny Jay Stone), Allan Sword, David Sword, Graeme Sword, Irene Sword, Mario Truglio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Marti, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Marti), Mario Truglio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodger Marti, deceased, the late parent of Michael Marti), Luz Vale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivan Vale, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ivan Vale), Luz Vale(individually, as surviving spouse of Ivan Vale), Amy Vazquez, Marc Weingard(individually, as surviving sibling of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bonnie Feldman, deceased, the late parent of Scott Weingard), Marc Weingard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Weingard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Scott Weingard), Robert Weingard, Denise White, Kathleen Wojslaw, Lillian Zambrana, Victoria Zanotto..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22980195)Document filed by Joseph John Hasson, IV, Joseph John Hasson, Jr, David Sword, Minerva Rosario(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodolfo Rosario, deceased, the late sibling of Aida Rosario), Josefina Gonzalez, Robert Davenport, John Joseph Curtin, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Maria Gonzalez, Denise White, Meryl Friedman Price, Christopher Charles Clarke, Douglas Evans, Christina Leonard, Sandra O'Connor Carey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Keith O'Connor, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Keith O'Connor), Stacey Stone(individually, as surviving spouse of Lonny Jay Stone), Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of George K. Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Nelida Gonzalez, Robert Weingard, Susan O'Connor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis O'Connor, deceased, the late parent of Keith O'Connor), Lee Gargano, Thomas Gary, Luz Vale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivan Vale, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ivan Vale), Irene Sword, James Devlin, Mary Hasson(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph John Hasson, III), Victoria Zanotto, John Duffy, Luz Vale(individually, as surviving spouse of Ivan Vale), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roshan Ramesh Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Khamladai Khami Singh), Rosalie Marti, Graeme Sword, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Khamladai Khami Singh), Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Adolph Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Jasmine DeJesus, Wesley Graf, Mario Truglio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Marti, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Marti), Lisa Iraci, Amy Vazquez, Marc Weingard(individually, as surviving sibling of Scott Weingard), Neil Peraza(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert Peraza), Nancy Kelly(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sylvia Kelly, deceased, the late parent of Thomas Michael Kelly), Barbara Duffy(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Duffy), Jane Gollan, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Khamladai Khami Singh, deceased, the late sibling of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Diana Mena, Neil Peraza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. Peraza, deceased, the late parent of Robert Peraza), Susan O'Connor(individually, as surviving parent of Keith O'Connor), Samantha Allen, Farah Frenkel, Jamal Green, Joshua Stone, Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Khamladai Khami Singh), James Friedman, Minerva Rosario(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Aida Rosario, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Aida Rosario), Sandra O'Connor Carey(individually, as surviving spouse of Keith O'Connor), Christina Savas, Elvin Schlegel, David Schlegel, Peter Asaro, Iris J. Friedman, Paul Asaro, Allan Sword, Mary Hasson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph John Hasson, III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph John Hasson, III), Lillian Zambrana, Leandra Hart, Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez, Jose Gonzalez, Alex Stone, Perry Sikorsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luzia Sikorsky, deceased, the late parent of Gregory Sikorsky), Nancy Kelly(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Michael Kelly), Marykay Kemper, Richard Schlegel, Neil Peraza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Peraza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert Peraza), Mario Truglio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodger Marti, deceased, the late parent of Michael Marti), Esterlina Rivera, Nixia Mena-Alexis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Aurelio Mena, deceased, the late parent of Diarelia Mena), Toolsiedai Seepersaud (a/k/a Ruby Awan, individually, as surviving parent of Roshan Ramesh Singh), Yolanda Cerda(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Leonard), Eneida Ramos, Michael Magee, Barbara Duffy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Duffy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Duffy), Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez, Marc Weingard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bonnie Feldman, deceased, the late parent of Scott Weingard), Edward Arjune, Stacey Stone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lonny Stone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lonny Jay Stone), Christopher Hasson, Dolores Audiffred, Clarissa Kirschenbaum(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fanni Wald, deceased, the late parent of Victor Wald), Nixia Mena-Alexis(individually, as surviving sibling of Diarelia Mena), Jeanne Osterndorf, Margaret Randazzo-Maloy, Kathleen Wojslaw, Shirley Innella, Marc Weingard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Weingard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Scott Weingard), Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr, Paulette Hasson, Maria Rich, Yolanda Cerda(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Leonard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Matthew Leonard), Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr..(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asaro et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Hasson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Gargano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Duffy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Audiffred
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Sword
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Kelly
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gollan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rich
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph John Hasson, IV
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farah Frenkel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Rosario
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Gonzalez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wojslaw
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Weingard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Asaro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Allen
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sword
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Innella
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Weingard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davenport
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Randazzo-Maloy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Zambrana
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Osterndorf
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Vale
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Graf
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Cerda
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Arjune
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan O'Connor
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Zanotto
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Stone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gonzalez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schlegel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Asaro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Evans
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelida Gonzalez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Marti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hasson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Truglio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia E. Ramos-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise White
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meryl Friedman Price
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hasson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Curtin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Mena
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine DeJesus
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marykay Kemper
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph John Hasson, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graeme Sword
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Barrett, Sr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toolsiedai Seepersaud
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schlegel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Friedman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Savas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leandra Hart
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Duffy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Schlegel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Sword
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Charles Clarke
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinaldo Ramos-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Iraci
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrett Anthony Barrett, Sr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris J. Friedman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra O'Connor Carey
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Stone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nixia Mena-Alexis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Leonard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esterlina Rivera
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Magee
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eneida Ramos
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Peraza
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Stone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Sikorsky
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Devlin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Vazquez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Awan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?