Wood v. De Blasio et al
Plaintiff: Charles Henry Wood
Defendant: NYPD MOS John/Jane Doe, Chief of Department Terence Monahan, CITY OF NEW YORK, Police Officer Ismael Hernandez Carpio, Mayor Bill De Blasio, Commissioner Dermot Shea, John and Jane Does #1-10, Terence Monahan and Ismael Hernandez Carpio
Case Number: 1:2020cv10541
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER terminating (31) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:20-cv-08924-CM; terminating (32) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:20-cv-10541-CM. All proceedings in all cases are stayed until we hold our conference. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/4/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM. (mml)
February 4, 2021 Case Stayed. (mml)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/4/2021) (mml)
February 3, 2021 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Respectfully Request that the Court Sine Die Extend Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaints in These Related Cases Until After the In Person Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brachah Goykadosh dated February 3, 2021. Document filed by City of New York, Bill De Blasio.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM.(Goykadosh, Brachah)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Please docket this notice from Chief Judge McMahon in cases: Payne v. DiBlasio, 20 Civ. 8924; Wood v. City of New York, 20 Civ. 10541; People v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 322; Sow v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 533. Counsel: I now have four matters on my docket relating to the conduct of the NYPD in connection with various demonstrations that occurred in New York City during 2020, that are connected to the Black Lives Matter (BLM) movement and the deaths of George Floyd and other individuals at the hands of law enforcement officials in other jurisdictions. They are Payne v. DiBlasio, 20 Civ. 8924, Wood v. City of New York, 20 Civ. 10541, People v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 322, Sow v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 533. I preliminarily consolidated these cases for pre-trial purposes. The defendants have moved to deconsolidate Payne and Wood, and the plaintiffs in Payne object to consolidation of their action with the Attorney General's suit, though they do not object to coordinated discovery and joint motion practice on the common issues of law and fact regarding policies and practices of the NYPD that undergird all four of these lawsuits. I note that Wood, People and Sow were all filed as "related cases" to Payne - and so they are, whether they end up being tried together or not - so I anticipate that most pre-trial matters, and certainly discovery, will be consolidated. I want to conference all four cases initially, so I can get my head around how to manage these cases and start them moving. I want that conference to take place in person - "in person" meaning that no more than two attorneys for each plaintiff and no more than four attorneys for the defendants may be present in my courtroom, masked and socially distanced, at an on-the-record conference. We cannot possibly accommodate all the members of the public who would want to be present at this conference, even with an overflow courtroom; we will provide a call in number for maximum public access. At present, as you know, we are not holding in person proceedings in the federal courthouses, so the February 5 date that is currently on your calendars will not work. I would like to schedule this proceeding for the week of February 16-17-18-19. As to the exact date, I would prefer to suit the convenience of counsel, so please confer and be in touch with my deputy clerk, Mariela de Jesus, Mariela_DeJesus@nysd.uscourts.gov with suggested dates and times during that week. You should be prepared to discuss anticipated motions, coordinated discovery and the reasons why these cases should or should not be consolidated. If each plaintiff and the defendants would file a letter of no more than three pages summarizing your positions at last five days prior to the conference; you can flesh them out fully at the conference. There really is no need to make a lot of formal procedural motions; I would rather hear you outline your positions and rule from the bench. Magistrate Judge Gorenstein is the assigned MJ on these cases. I will be inviting him to participate at this conference as well. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/25/2021) (mml) Modified on 2/5/2021 (mml).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for a: Telephone conference on Friday, February 5, 2021 at 11:30 A.M. before the Honorable Colleen McMahon, United States District Judge. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing and faxed to Chambers at (212) 805-6326. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/19/2021) (mml)
January 15, 2021 Filing 29 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Dara L. Weiss dated January 14, 2021 re: (26 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM) LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases in Response to Defendants' Letter Motion to De-Consolidate addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Plaintiffs dated January 14, 2021. . Document filed by City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM.(Weiss, Dara)
January 13, 2021 Filing 28 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases Respectfully Requesting that the Court De-Consolidate Jarrett Payne, et al. v. Mayor Bill de Blasio, et al., 20 Civ. 8924 (CM) and Charles Henry Wood v. City of New York, et al., 20 Civ. 10541 (CM) addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brachah Goykadosh dated January 13, 2021. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Goykadosh, Brachah)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court sua sponte consolidates Payne et al. v. De Blasio et al. (20-cv-08924) and Wood v. De Blasio et al. (20-cv-10541) for all purposes, and exempts Wood from the Mediation Plan (Local Civil Rule 83.10) (Signed by Chief Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/11/2021) (mml)
January 11, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-08924-CM. (mml)
January 5, 2021 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brachah Goykadosh dated January 5, 2021 re: Respectfully Requesting that the Court Designate This Case for Participation in the Local Civil Rule 83.10 Plan. Document filed by City of New York..(Goykadosh, Brachah)
January 5, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brachah Goykadosh on behalf of City of New York..(Goykadosh, Brachah)
December 21, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. City of New York served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 17, 2020 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ismael Hernandez Carpio..(dnh)
December 17, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Terence Monahan..(dnh)
December 17, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dermot Shea..(dnh)
December 17, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill De Blasio..(dnh)
December 17, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(dnh)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer Ismael Hernandez Carpio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief of Department Terence Monahan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayor Bill de Blasio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Douglas Edward Lieb to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; name on docket entry as to whom summons is for and name on pdf do not match; Plaintiff's attorney information omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Douglas Edward Lieb to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's attorney information omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer Ismael Hernandez Carpio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/16/2020 (sj).
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief of Department Terence Monahan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/16/2020 (sj).
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/16/2020 (sj).
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayor Bill de Blasio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/16/2020 (sj).
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/16/2020 (sj).
December 15, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas Edward Lieb. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York, Terence Monahan, Ismael Hernandez Carpio, John and Jane Does # 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
December 15, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 15, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:20cv8924. (sj)
December 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Douglas Edward Lieb to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; caption must match exactly as pleading. If all parties do not fit, list leading defendant followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 15, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-08924-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer Ismael Hernandez Carpio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/15/2020 (sj).
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief of Department Terence Monahan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/15/2020 (sj).
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/15/2020 (sj).
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayor Bill de Blasio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/15/2020 (sj).
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 12/15/2020 (sj).
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-8924. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieb, Douglas)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Bill De Blasio, John/Jane Doe, Ismael Hernandez Carpio, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23020435)Document filed by Charles Henry Wood..(Lieb, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. De Blasio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD MOS John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Department Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Brachah Goykadosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Ismael Hernandez Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill De Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Hernandez Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Henry Wood
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?