American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. APS Contractors Inc.
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: APS Contractors Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10703
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to APS Contractors Inc.(km)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIRMATION of Maureen E. O'Connor re: #7 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, . Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. APS Contractors Inc. served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, authorized agent in the Office of New York Secretary of State. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to APS Contractors Inc...(pc)
December 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group for American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Maureen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to APS Contractors Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APS Contractors Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23102624)Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. APS Contractors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APS Contractors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?