Super Duper, Inc. v. PresenceLearning, Inc.
Plaintiff: Super Duper, Inc.
Defendant: PresenceLearning, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10783
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katharine H Parker
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #29 Letter filed by Super Duper, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for this update. The parties shall provide the Court with an other status letter on the status of discovery and any disputes that might require judicial intervention by no later than August 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/12/2021) (vfr)
July 9, 2021 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from James D. Weinberger dated July 9, 2021 re: Status (submitted jointly). Document filed by Super Duper, Inc...(Weinberger, James)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/22/2021) (vfr)
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint status letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from James Rosenfeld dated June 22, 2021. Document filed by PresenceLearning, Inc...(Rosenfeld, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Letter due by 6/28/2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
May 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: telephonic Case Management Conference / Discovery Hearing / Status Conference : See transcript for details.AT&T Conference Line. (ca)
May 26, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the Case Management conference scheduled for Thursday, May 27, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. Please dial (866) 434-5269 Code: 4858267 re: #22 Order.(ca)
May 20, 2021 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from James D. Weinberger dated May 20, 2021. Document filed by Super Duper, Inc...(Weinberger, James)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material..., Motions terminated: #23 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery , Joint Letter Motion Seeking Entry of Modified Version of Model Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from James Rosenfeld dated 5/14/2021. filed by PresenceLearning, Inc. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/17/2021) (rro)
May 14, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery , Joint Letter Motion Seeking Entry of Modified Version of Model Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from James Rosenfeld dated 5/14/2021. Document filed by PresenceLearning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Protective Order - Blackline Version, #2 (Proposed) Protective Order - Clean Version).(Rosenfeld, James)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A telephonic Case Management conference in this matter is hereby scheduled for Thursday, May 27, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel is directed to call into the court conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269 Code: 4858267. ( Telephone Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/27/2021) (mro)
April 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: telephonic Case Management Conference /Status Conference held on 4/27/2021. AT&T Conference Line. (ca)
April 26, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the Case Management Conference scheduled for 4/27/2021 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Please Dial 866-434-5269 code 4858267 re: 18 Scheduling Order.(ca)
April 16, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Mary Lieberman on behalf of Super Duper, Inc...(Lieberman, Nicole)
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter filed by Super Duper, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. Attorney Jessica Vosgerchian terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/22/2021) (mml)
March 22, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jessica Vosgerchian dated 3/22/2021 re: request to withdraw as counsel. Document filed by Super Duper, Inc...(Vosgerchian, Jessica)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/9/2021. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Written discovery must be served by 3/23/21 and any subsequent requests must be served no later than 10/21/2021. RFAs and Contention interrogatories cannot be served more than 30 days prior to end of fact discovery. Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Dial 866-434-5269 code 4858267. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
March 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/9/2021. See transcript for details. AT&T Conference Line. (ca)
March 8, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of Initial Conference scheduled for 3/9/2021 at 11:00 AM. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267 re: #13 Order.(ca)
January 27, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by PresenceLearning, Inc...(Rosenfeld, James)
January 27, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PresenceLearning, Inc...(Rosenfeld, James)
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse Feitel on behalf of PresenceLearning, Inc...(Feitel, Jesse)
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Eric Rosenfeld on behalf of PresenceLearning, Inc...(Rosenfeld, James)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Counsel is directed to call the court's telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/20/2021) (mro)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/19/2021) (ama)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The requested extension is granted. DE# 10 resolved. SO ORDERED. (PresenceLearning, Inc. answer due 1/27/2021.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/8/2021) (rro)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James Rosenfeld dated 1/8/2021. Document filed by PresenceLearning, Inc...(Rosenfeld, James)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. PresenceLearning, Inc. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Document filed by Super Duper, Inc...(Weinberger, James)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PresenceLearning, Inc...(jgo)
December 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James David Weinberger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
December 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Vosgerchian on behalf of Super Duper, Inc...(Vosgerchian, Jessica)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Weinberger, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PresenceLearning, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Super Duper, Inc...(Weinberger, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Super Duper, Inc...(Weinberger, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinberger, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PresenceLearning, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23134775)Document filed by Super Duper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PL Marketing Materials, #2 Exhibit B - emails).(Weinberger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Super Duper, Inc. v. PresenceLearning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PresenceLearning, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse Feitel
Represented By: James Eric Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super Duper, Inc.
Represented By: James David Weinberger
Represented By: Jessica Vosgerchian
Represented By: Nicole Mary Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?