Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ripple Labs Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen and Ripple Labs Inc
Petitioner: Investor A, MoneyGram International, Inc., Third-Party A, The Chamber of Digital Commerce, Third-Party B, Third-Party C, Investment Banker Declarant and Cryptocurrency Exchange Declarant
Amicus Curiae: Chamber of Digital Commerce, I-REMIT, INC., Debra L Fein, Investor Choice Advocates Network, Phillip Goldstein, SpendTheBits, Inc., Blockchain Association, Coinbase, Inc., Crypto Council for Innovation, Valhil Capital, LLC, Cryptillian Payment Systems, LLC, Veri DAO, Reaper Financial, LLC, New Sports Economy Institute and Paradigm Operations LP
Intervenor: Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner and PhD Roslyn Layton
Interested Party: Non-Party D
Case Number: 1:2020cv10832
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah Netburn
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ORDER The Court has reviewed the parties' letter dated November 9, 2023. Accordingly: 1. By February 12, 2024, the parties shall complete remedies-related discovery; 2. By March 13, 2024, Plaintiff shall file its brief with respect to remedies; 3. By April 12, 2024, Defendant shall file its opposition; and 4. By April 29, 2024, Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 3/13/2024., Replies due by 4/29/2024., Responses due by 4/12/2024) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/13/2023) (jca)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 923 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated November 9, 2023 re: Remedies Briefing. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 922 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #920 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. By November 9, 2023, the parties shall jointly propose a briefing schedule with regard to remedies, or, if the parties cannot agree, shall jointly request that the Court set a briefing schedule. The April 16, 2023 final pretrial conference and the April 23, 2024 trial are ADJOURNED sine die. The deadlines set forth in the Court's October 3, 2023 order, ECF No. 917, are VACATED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/24/2023) (ama)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 921 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS NOW STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, by and between undersigned counsel, that the claims alleged by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission against Defendants Bradley Garlinghouse and Christian A Larsen, for aiding and abetting Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s ("Ripple") violations of Section 5 of the Securities Act of 1933 with respect to Ripple's offers and sales of XRP in "Institutional Sales" (see ECF No. 874), are hereby dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/23/2023) (jca)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #919 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 920 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated October 19, 2023 re: Voluntary Dismissal of Aiding and Abetting Institutional Sales Claim. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 919 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jorge Tenreiro. RE-FILE Document No. #918 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the voluntary dismissal; the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink signatures) by all parties who have appeared. 1. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents. 2. Re-File the document the event type Letter founder under Other Documents. (nd)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 918 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal -- Partial, As To Aiding and Abetting Institutional Sales Claims Only).(Tenreiro, Jorge) Modified on 10/20/2023 (nd).
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER denying #892 Motion for Leave to Appeal. For the reasons stated above, the SEC's motion for certification of interlocutory appeal is DENIED, and the SEC's request for a stay is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 892. Trial in this matter is set to begin on April 23, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. The deadlines as set forth in the Courts Pretrial Scheduling Order remain in effect. Accordingly: 1. By December 4, 2023, the parties shall submit any motions in limine. Oppositions to any motions in limine shall be submitted by December 18, 2023. 2. By December 4, 2023, the parties shall submit all required pretrial filings, including their proposed joint pretrial order, requests to charge, verdict form, and voir dire questions in accordance with Paragraphs V.B, V.C, and V.D of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. The parties shall also email copies of these submissions to Torres_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov as Word Documents. 3. By December 4, 2023, the parties shall deliver to the Court one copy of each documentary exhibit sought to be admitted, pre-marked (i.e., labeled with exhibit stickers) and assembled sequentially in a loose-leaf binder or in separate manila folders labeled with the exhibit numbers and placed in a suitable container for ready reference in accordance with Paragraph V.C.v of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. 4. On April 16, 2024, at 2:00 p.m., counsel for all parties shall appear for a final pretrial conference in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. 5. Prior to the final pretrial conference, counsel for both parties, along with the parties themselves, shall meet in person for at least one hour to discuss settlement of this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/3/2023) (jca)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: (Motions due by 12/4/2023., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2023., Responses due by 12/18/2023), Set/Reset Hearings:( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres., Jury Trial set for 4/23/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres.) (jca)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 916 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rahul Mukhi on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse..(Mukhi, Rahul)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 915 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #892 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order under 28 U.S.C. s 1292(b). Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ripple Q2 2023 XRP Markets Report, #2 Exhibit July 13, 2023 Reuters article).(Moores, Peter)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 914 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #892 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen..(Solomon, Matthew)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 913 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #892 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 912 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #909 MOTION for Robert MacDonald Moye to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Robert Moye from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Robert Macdonald Moye terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/24/2023) (jca)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 911 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #909 MOTION for Robert MacDonald Moye to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Robert Moye from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Robert Macdonald Moye terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/24/2023) (jca)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 910 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Peter Moores dated August 23, 2023 re: Trial Availability. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Moores, Peter)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 909 MOTION for Robert MacDonald Moye to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Moye withdrawal).(Moye, Robert)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 908 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #900 MOTION for Richard Best to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Richard Best from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Richard R. Best terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2023) (jca)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 907 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 23, 2023 re: Trial Availability. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 906 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #900 MOTION for Richard Best to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Richard Best from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Richard R. Best terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2023) (jca)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 905 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #899 MOTION for Pascale Guerrier to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Pascale Guerrier from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Pascale Guerrier terminated (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2023) (jca)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #894 MOTION for Alyssa M. Hasbrouck to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Alyssa M. Hasbrouck from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Alyssa M. Hasbrouck terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2023) (jca)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER granting #897 Motion for Michael A. Schulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER granting #886 Motion for Marc J. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER granting #885 Motion for Peter Bryan Moores to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 900 MOTION for Richard Best to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Withdrawal of Richard Best).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 899 MOTION for Pascale Guerrier to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 898 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum and Matthew C. Solomon dated August 22, 2023 re: Trial Availability. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 897 MOTION for Michael A. Schulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28181934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration in Support), #2 Exhibit (Good Standing Certificate), #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Schulman, Michael)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 896 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caleb Robertson on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse..(Robertson, Caleb)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 895 DECLARATION of Alyssa M. Hasbrouck in Support re: #894 MOTION for Alyssa M. Hasbrouck to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Investment Banker Declarant..(Hasbrouck, Alyssa)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 894 MOTION for Alyssa M. Hasbrouck to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Investment Banker Declarant..(Hasbrouck, Alyssa)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #897 MOTION for Michael A. Schulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28181934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 893 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #892 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 892 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER Accordingly: 1. The SEC's request to file a motion for leave to file an interlocutory appeal is GRANTED; 2. By August 18, 2023, the SEC shall file its motion; 3. By September 1, 2023, Defendants shall file their opposition papers; and 4. By September 8, 2023, the SEC shall file its reply, if any. The parties are directed to comply with the deadlines set forth in ECF No. 884 until farther order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 8/18/2023., Replies due by 9/8/2023., Responses due by 9/1/2023) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/17/2023) (jca)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 890 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew C. Solomon and Martin Flumenbaum dated August 16, 2023 re: in response to SEC's pre-motion letter seeking leave to file interlocutory appeal ( #887 ). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen..(Solomon, Matthew)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 889 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 16, 2023 re: Opposition to SEC Letter Regarding Interlocutory Appeal (Dkt. 887). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 888 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Kunsak on behalf of Investment Banker Declarant..(Kunsak, Andrew)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 887 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated August 9, 2023 re: Anticipated Motion for Interlocutory Appeal. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 886 MOTION for Marc J. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Marc J. Jones In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Jones, Marc)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 885 MOTION for Peter Bryan Moores to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peter Bryan Moores in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Moores, Peter)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 884 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Accordingly: 1. By August 23, 2023, the parties shall submit blackout dates for trial. 2. By December 4, 2023, the parties shall submit any motions in limine. Oppositions to any motions in limine shall be submitted by December 18, 2023. 3. By December 4, 2023, the parties shall submit all required pretrial filings, including their proposed joint pretrial order, requests to charge, verdict form, and voir dire questions in accordance with Paragraphs V.B, V.C, and V.D of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. The parties shall also email copies of these submissions to ToITes_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscomi s.gov as Word Documents. 4. By December 4, 2023, the parties shall deliver to the Court one copy of each documentary exhibit sought to be admitted, pre-marked (i.e., labeled with exhibit stickers) and assembled sequentially in a loose-leaf binder or in separate manila folders labeled with the exhibit numbers and placed in a suitable container for ready reference in accordance with Paragraph V.C.v of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. 5. The Court shall schedule a final pretrial conference date upon setting a date certain for trial. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 12/4/2023. Responses due by 12/18/2023 Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2023. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/9/2023) (jca)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #886 MOTION for Marc J. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #885 MOTION for Peter Bryan Moores to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 883 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Samuel Zolkind on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Zolkind, Douglas)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 882 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #880 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Lisa R. Zornberg from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Lisa R. Zornberg terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/28/2023) (kv)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 881 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #880 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Lisa R. Zornberg from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Lisa R. Zornberg terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/28/2023) (kv)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 880 MOTION for Lisa R. Zornberg to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Ripple Labs Inc.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER: In light of Judge Torres's recent decision on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment, ECF No. 874, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Rachel Slusher at Rachel_Slusher@nysd.uscourts.gov with three mutually convenient dates to schedule a settlement conference if they believe it would be productive at this time. Due to the Court's busy calendar, settlement conferences must generally be scheduled at least six to eight weeks in advance. The Court will likely be unable to accommodate last-minute requests for settlement conferences, and the parties should not anticipate that litigation deadlines will be adjourned in response to late requests for settlement conferences. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/17/2023) (ras)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 878 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/17/2023) (tg)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER granting #873 MOTION for Anna R. Gressel to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attorney Anna Gressel terminated.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER granting #872 MOTION for Clayton J. Masterman to Withdraw as Attorney. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 875 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #872 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Clayton J. Masterman from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Clayton Masterman terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/13/2023) (kv)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part #621 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, the SEC's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to the Institutional Sales, and otherwise DENIED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to the Programmatic Sales, the Other Distributions, and Larsen's and Garlinghouse's sales, and DENIED as to the Institutional Sales.The Court shall issue a separate order setting a trial date and related pre-trial deadlines in due course. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 621, 625, 639, 642, 807, 824, and 836. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/13/2023) (ama)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 873 MOTION for Anna R. Gressel to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Ripple Labs Inc.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Gressel, Anna)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 872 MOTION for Clayton J. Masterman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Clayton J. Masterman, #2 Text of Proposed Order ).(Masterman, Clayton)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 871 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 186, #2 Exhibit 187, #3 Exhibit 188, #4 Exhibit 189, #5 Exhibit 190, #6 Exhibit 191, #7 Exhibit 192, #8 Exhibit 193, #9 Exhibit 194, #10 Exhibit 195, #11 Exhibit 196, #12 Exhibit 197, #13 Exhibit 198, #14 Exhibit 199, #15 Exhibit 200).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 870 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 173, #2 Exhibit 174, #3 Exhibit 175, #4 Exhibit 176, #5 Exhibit 177 part 1, #6 Exhibit 177 part 2, #7 Exhibit 177 part 3, #8 Exhibit 177 part 4, #9 Exhibit 178, #10 Exhibit 179, #11 Exhibit 180, #12 Exhibit 181, #13 Exhibit 182, #14 Exhibit 183, #15 Exhibit 184, #16 Exhibit 185).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 869 DECLARATION of Ladan Stewart in Opposition re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 587, #2 Exhibit 588, #3 Exhibit 589, #4 Exhibit 590, #5 Exhibit 591, #6 Exhibit 592, #7 Exhibit 593, #8 Exhibit 594, #9 Exhibit 595, #10 Exhibit 596, #11 Exhibit 597, #12 Exhibit 598, #13 Exhibit 599, #14 Exhibit 600, #15 Exhibit 601, #16 Exhibit 602, #17 Exhibit 603, #18 Exhibit 604, #19 Exhibit 605, #20 Exhibit 606, #21 Exhibit 607, #22 Exhibit 608, #23 Exhibit 609, #24 Exhibit 610, #25 Exhibit 611, #26 Exhibit 612, #27 Exhibit 613, #28 Exhibit 614, #29 Exhibit 615, #30 Exhibit 616, #31 Exhibit 617, #32 Exhibit 618, #33 Exhibit 619, #34 Exhibit 620, #35 Exhibit 621, #36 Exhibit 623, #37 Exhibit 624, #38 Exhibit 625, #39 Exhibit 626, #40 Exhibit 629, #41 Exhibit 630, #42 Exhibit 631, #43 Exhibit 632, #44 Exhibit 633, #45 Exhibit 634, #46 Exhibit 635, #47 Exhibit 636, #48 Exhibit 637, #49 Exhibit 638, #50 Exhibit 639, #51 Exhibit 640, #52 Exhibit 641, #53 Exhibit 642, #54 Exhibit 643, #55 Exhibit 644).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 868 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 143, #2 Exhibit 144, #3 Exhibit 145, #4 Exhibit 146, #5 Exhibit 147, #6 Exhibit 148, #7 Exhibit 149, #8 Exhibit 150, #9 Exhibit 151, #10 Exhibit 152, #11 Exhibit 153, #12 Exhibit 154, #13 Exhibit 155, #14 Exhibit 156, #15 Exhibit 157, #16 Exhibit 158, #17 Exhibit 159, #18 Exhibit 160, #19 Exhibit 161, #20 Exhibit 162, #21 Exhibit 163, #22 Exhibit 164, #23 Exhibit 165, #24 Exhibit 166, #25 Exhibit 167, #26 Exhibit 168, #27 Exhibit 169, #28 Exhibit 170, #29 Exhibit 171, #30 Exhibit 172).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 867 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 112, #2 Exhibit 114, #3 Exhibit 115, #4 Exhibit 116, #5 Exhibit 117, #6 Exhibit 118, #7 Exhibit 119, #8 Exhibit 120, #9 Exhibit 121, #10 Exhibit 122, #11 Exhibit 123, #12 Exhibit 124, #13 Exhibit 125, #14 Exhibit 126, #15 Exhibit 127, #16 Exhibit 128, #17 Exhibit 129, #18 Exhibit 130, #19 Exhibit 131, #20 Exhibit 132, #21 Exhibit 133, #22 Exhibit 134, #23 Exhibit 135, #24 Exhibit 136, #25 Exhibit 137, #26 Exhibit 138, #27 Exhibit 139, #28 Exhibit 140, #29 Exhibit 141, #30 Exhibit 142).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 866 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 248, #2 Exhibit 403, #3 Exhibit 534, #4 Exhibit 553, #5 Exhibit 664, #6 Exhibit 671).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 865 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 739, #2 Exhibit 740, #3 Exhibit 741, #4 Exhibit 742, #5 Exhibit 743, #6 Exhibit 744, #7 Exhibit 745, #8 Exhibit 746, #9 Exhibit 747, #10 Exhibit 748, #11 Exhibit 749, #12 Exhibit 750, #13 Exhibit 751, #14 Exhibit 752, #15 Exhibit 753, #16 Exhibit 754, #17 Exhibit 755, #18 Exhibit 756, #19 Exhibit 757, #20 Exhibit 758, #21 Exhibit 759, #22 Exhibit 760, #23 Exhibit 761, #24 Exhibit 762, #25 Exhibit 763, #26 Exhibit 764, #27 Exhibit 765, #28 Exhibit 766, #29 Exhibit 767, #30 Exhibit 768, #31 Exhibit 769, #32 Exhibit 770, #33 Exhibit 771).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 864 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 69, #2 Exhibit 70, #3 Exhibit 71, #4 Exhibit 72, #5 Exhibit 73, #6 Exhibit 74, #7 Exhibit 75, #8 Exhibit 76, #9 Exhibit 77, #10 Exhibit 78, #11 Exhibit 79, #12 Exhibit 80, #13 Exhibit 81 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 81 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 81 Part 3, #16 Exhibit 81 Part 4, #17 Exhibit 82, #18 Exhibit 83, #19 Exhibit 84, #20 Exhibit 85, #21 Exhibit 86, #22 Exhibit 87, #23 Exhibit 88, #24 Exhibit 89, #25 Exhibit 90, #26 Exhibit 91, #27 Exhibit 92, #28 Exhibit 93 Part 1, #29 Exhibit 93 Part 2, #30 Exhibit 93 Part 3, #31 Exhibit 93 Part 4, #32 Exhibit 93 Part 5, #33 Exhibit 94, #34 Exhibit 95, #35 Exhibit 96, #36 Exhibit 97, #37 Exhibit 98, #38 Exhibit 99, #39 Exhibit 100, #40 Exhibit 101, #41 Exhibit 102, #42 Exhibit 103, #43 Exhibit 104, #44 Exhibit 105, #45 Exhibit 106, #46 Exhibit 107, #47 Exhibit 108, #48 Exhibit 109, #49 Exhibit 110, #50 Exhibit 111).(Stewart, Ladan)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 863 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 708, #2 Exhibit 709, #3 Exhibit 710, #4 Exhibit 711, #5 Exhibit 712, #6 Exhibit 713, #7 Exhibit 714, #8 Exhibit 715, #9 Exhibit 716, #10 Exhibit 717, #11 Exhibit 718, #12 Exhibit 719, #13 Exhibit 720, #14 Exhibit 721, #15 Exhibit 722, #16 Exhibit 724, #17 Exhibit 725, #18 Exhibit 726, #19 Exhibit 727, #20 Exhibit 728, #21 Exhibit 729, #22 Exhibit 730, #23 Exhibit 731, #24 Exhibit 732, #25 Exhibit 733, #26 Exhibit 734, #27 Exhibit 735, #28 Exhibit 736, #29 Exhibit 737, #30 Exhibit 738).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 862 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 687, #2 Exhibit 688, #3 Exhibit 689, #4 Exhibit 690, #5 Exhibit 691, #6 Exhibit 692, #7 Exhibit 693, #8 Exhibit 694, #9 Exhibit 695, #10 Exhibit 696, #11 Exhibit 697, #12 Exhibit 698, #13 Exhibit 699, #14 Exhibit 701, #15 Exhibit 702, #16 Exhibit 703, #17 Exhibit 704, #18 Exhibit 705, #19 Exhibit 706, #20 Exhibit 707).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 861 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29, #2 Exhibit 30, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 32, #5 Exhibit 33, #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 36 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 37, #11 Exhibit 38, #12 Exhibit 39, #13 Exhibit 40, #14 Exhibit 41, #15 Exhibit 42, #16 Exhibit 43, #17 Exhibit 44, #18 Exhibit 45, #19 Exhibit 46, #20 Exhibit 47, #21 Exhibit 48, #22 Exhibit 49, #23 Exhibit 50, #24 Exhibit 51, #25 Exhibit 52, #26 Exhibit 53, #27 Exhibit 54, #28 Exhibit 55, #29 Exhibit 56, #30 Exhibit 57, #31 Exhibit 58, #32 Exhibit 59, #33 Exhibit 60, #34 Exhibit 61, #35 Exhibit 62, #36 Exhibit 63, #37 Exhibit 64, #38 Exhibit 65, #39 Exhibit 66, #40 Exhibit 67, #41 Exhibit 68).(Stewart, Ladan)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 860 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 645, #2 Exhibit 646, #3 Exhibit 647, #4 Exhibit 648, #5 Exhibit 649, #6 Exhibit 650, #7 Exhibit 651, #8 Exhibit 652, #9 Exhibit 653, #10 Exhibit 654, #11 Exhibit 655, #12 Exhibit 656, #13 Exhibit 657, #14 Exhibit 658, #15 Exhibit 659, #16 Exhibit 660, #17 Exhibit 661, #18 Exhibit 662, #19 Exhibit 663, #20 Exhibit 665, #21 Exhibit 666, #22 Exhibit 667, #23 Exhibit 668, #24 Exhibit 669, #25 Exhibit 670, #26 Exhibit 672, #27 Exhibit 673, #28 Exhibit 674, #29 Exhibit 675, #30 Exhibit 676, #31 Exhibit 677, #32 Exhibit 678, #33 Exhibit 679, #34 Exhibit 680, #35 Exhibit 681, #36 Exhibit 682, #37 Exhibit 683, #38 Exhibit 684, #39 Exhibit 685, #40 Exhibit 686).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 859 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 21 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 21 Part 3, #4 Exhibit 21 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 22 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 22 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 22 Part 3, #8 Exhibit 23 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 23 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 23 Part 3, #11 Exhibit 24 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 24 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 25 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 25 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 25 Part 3, #16 Exhibit 26 Part 1, #17 Exhibit 26 Part 2, #18 Exhibit 26 Part 3, #19 Exhibit 27, #20 Exhibit 28).(Stewart, Ladan)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 858 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 17 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 17 Part 3, #4 Exhibit 17 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 18 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 18 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 18 Part 3, #8 Exhibit 19 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 19 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 20 Part 1, #11 Exhibit 20 Part 2, #12 Exhibit 20 Part 3, #13 Exhibit 20 Part 4, #14 Exhibit 20 Part 5, #15 Exhibit 20 Part 6, #16 Exhibit 20 Part 7).(Stewart, Ladan)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 857 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 387, #2 Exhibit 388, #3 Exhibit 389, #4 Exhibit 390, #5 Exhibit 391, #6 Exhibit 392, #7 Exhibit 393, #8 Exhibit 394, #9 Exhibit 395, #10 Exhibit 396, #11 Exhibit 397, #12 Exhibit 399, #13 Exhibit 400, #14 Exhibit 540, #15 Exhibit 545).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 856 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 14 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 14 Part 3, #7 Exhibit 15 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 15 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 15 Part 3, #10 Exhibit 15 Part 4, #11 Exhibit 15 Part 5, #12 Exhibit 15 Part 6, #13 Exhibit 15 Part 7, #14 Exhibit 16 Part 1, #15 Exhibit 16 Part 2, #16 Exhibit 16 Part 3, #17 Exhibit 16 Part 4, #18 Exhibit 16 Part 5, #19 Exhibit 16 Part 6).(Stewart, Ladan)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 855 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 6 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 6 Part 3, #6 Exhibit 7 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 7 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 7 Part 3, #9 Exhibit 7 Part 4, #10 Exhibit 7 Part 5, #11 Exhibit 7 Part 6, #12 Exhibit 7 Part 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10 Part 1, #16 Exhibit 10 Part 2, #17 Exhibit 10 Part 3, #18 Exhibit 10 Part 4, #19 Exhibit 10 Part 5, #20 Exhibit 10 Part 6, #21 Exhibit 10 Part 7, #22 Exhibit 10 Part 8, #23 Exhibit 10 Part 9).(Stewart, Ladan)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 854 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 359, #2 Exhibit 360, #3 Exhibit 361, #4 Exhibit 362, #5 Exhibit 363, #6 Exhibit 364, #7 Exhibit 365 part 1, #8 Exhibit 365 part 2, #9 Exhibit 366, #10 Exhibit 367, #11 Exhibit 368, #12 Exhibit 369, #13 Exhibit 370, #14 Exhibit 371, #15 Exhibit 372, #16 Exhibit 373, #17 Exhibit 374, #18 Exhibit 375, #19 Exhibit 376, #20 Exhibit 377 part 1, #21 Exhibit 377 part 2, #22 Exhibit 378, #23 Exhibit 379, #24 Exhibit 380, #25 Exhibit 381, #26 Exhibit 382, #27 Exhibit 383, #28 Exhibit 384, #29 Exhibit 385, #30 Exhibit 386).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 853 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 2 Part 4, #6 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 3 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 3 Part 3, #9 Exhibit 3 Part 4, #10 Exhibit 3 Part 5, #11 Exhibit 3 Part 6, #12 Exhibit 3 Part 7).(Stewart, Ladan)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 852 DECLARATION of Ladan Stewart in Opposition re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 113, #2 Exhibit 398, #3 Exhibit 409, #4 Exhibit 456, #5 Exhibit 457, #6 Exhibit 499, #7 Exhibit 500, #8 Exhibit 505, #9 Exhibit 525, #10 Exhibit 526, #11 Exhibit 528, #12 Exhibit 529, #13 Exhibit 530, #14 Exhibit 532, #15 Exhibit 533, #16 Exhibit 535, #17 Exhibit 537, #18 Exhibit 538, #19 Exhibit 539, #20 Exhibit 547, #21 Exhibit 548, #22 Exhibit 552, #23 Exhibit 555, #24 Exhibit 556, #25 Exhibit 557, #26 Exhibit 559, #27 Exhibit 560, #28 Exhibit 561, #29 Exhibit 562, #30 Exhibit 563, #31 Exhibit 564, #32 Exhibit 565, #33 Exhibit 566, #34 Exhibit 567, #35 Exhibit 568, #36 Exhibit 569, #37 Exhibit 570, #38 Exhibit 571, #39 Exhibit 573, #40 Exhibit 574, #41 Exhibit 575, #42 Exhibit 576, #43 Exhibit 577, #44 Exhibit 578, #45 Exhibit 579, #46 Exhibit 580, #47 Exhibit 581, #48 Exhibit 582, #49 Exhibit 583, #50 Exhibit 584, #51 Exhibit 585, #52 Exhibit 586).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 851 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 335, #2 Exhibit 336, #3 Exhibit 337, #4 Exhibit 338, #5 Exhibit 339, #6 Exhibit 340, #7 Exhibit 341 part 1, #8 Exhibit 341 part 2, #9 Exhibit 342, #10 Exhibit 343, #11 Exhibit 344, #12 Exhibit 345, #13 Exhibit 346, #14 Exhibit 347, #15 Exhibit 348, #16 Exhibit 349, #17 Exhibit 350, #18 Exhibit 351, #19 Exhibit 352, #20 Exhibit 353, #21 Exhibit 354, #22 Exhibit 355, #23 Exhibit 356, #24 Exhibit 357, #25 Exhibit 358).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 850 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 313 part 1, #2 Exhibit 313 part 2, #3 Exhibit 313 part 3, #4 Exhibit 314, #5 Exhibit 315 part 1, #6 Exhibit 315 part 2, #7 Exhibit 316, #8 Exhibit 317, #9 Exhibit 318, #10 Exhibit 319, #11 Exhibit 320, #12 Exhibit 321, #13 Exhibit 322, #14 Exhibit 323, #15 Exhibit 324, #16 Exhibit 325, #17 Exhibit 326, #18 Exhibit 327, #19 Exhibit 328, #20 Exhibit 329 part 1, #21 Exhibit 329 part 2, #22 Exhibit 330, #23 Exhibit 331, #24 Exhibit 332, #25 Exhibit 333, #26 Exhibit 334).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 849 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 288, #2 Exhibit 289, #3 Exhibit 290, #4 Exhibit 291, #5 Exhibit 292, #6 Exhibit 293, #7 Exhibit 294, #8 Exhibit 295, #9 Exhibit 296, #10 Exhibit 297, #11 Exhibit 298, #12 Exhibit 299, #13 Exhibit 300, #14 Exhibit 301, #15 Exhibit 302, #16 Exhibit 303, #17 Exhibit 304, #18 Exhibit 305, #19 Exhibit 306, #20 Exhibit 307, #21 Exhibit 308, #22 Exhibit 309, #23 Exhibit 310, #24 Exhibit 311, #25 Exhibit 312).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 848 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 260, #2 Exhibit 261, #3 Exhibit 262, #4 Exhibit 263, #5 Exhibit 264, #6 Exhibit 265 part 1, #7 Exhibit 265 part 2, #8 Exhibit 266 part 1, #9 Exhibit 266 part 2, #10 Exhibit 267, #11 Exhibit 268, #12 Exhibit 269, #13 Exhibit 270, #14 Exhibit 271, #15 Exhibit 272, #16 Exhibit 273, #17 Exhibit 274, #18 Exhibit 275, #19 Exhibit 276, #20 Exhibit 277, #21 Exhibit 278, #22 Exhibit 279, #23 Exhibit 280, #24 Exhibit 281, #25 Exhibit 282, #26 Exhibit 283, #27 Exhibit 284, #28 Exhibit 285, #29 Exhibit 286, #30 Exhibit 287).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 847 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 244, #2 Exhibit 245, #3 Exhibit 246, #4 Exhibit 247 part 1, #5 Exhibit 247 part 2, #6 Exhibit 247 part 3, #7 Exhibit 249, #8 Exhibit 250, #9 Exhibit 251, #10 Exhibit 252, #11 Exhibit 253, #12 Exhibit 254, #13 Exhibit 255, #14 Exhibit 256, #15 Exhibit 257, #16 Exhibit 258 part 1, #17 Exhibit 258 part 2, #18 Exhibit 258 part 3, #19 Exhibit 258 part 4, #20 Exhibit 258 part 5, #21 Exhibit 258 part 6, #22 Exhibit 258 part 7, #23 Exhibit 258 part 8, #24 Exhibit 258 part 9, #25 Exhibit 259).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 846 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 218, #2 Exhibit 219, #3 Exhibit 220, #4 Exhibit 221, #5 Exhibit 222, #6 Exhibit 223, #7 Exhibit 224, #8 Exhibit 225, #9 Exhibit 226, #10 Exhibit 227, #11 Exhibit 228, #12 Exhibit 229, #13 Exhibit 230, #14 Exhibit 231, #15 Exhibit 232, #16 Exhibit 233, #17 Exhibit 234, #18 Exhibit 235 part 1, #19 Exhibit 235 part 2, #20 Exhibit 236, #21 Exhibit 237, #22 Exhibit 238 part 1, #23 Exhibit 238 part 2, #24 Exhibit 238 part 3, #25 Exhibit 238 part 4, #26 Exhibit 239, #27 Exhibit 240, #28 Exhibit 241, #29 Exhibit 242, #30 Exhibit 243 part 1, #31 Exhibit 243 part 2).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 845 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 201, #2 Exhibit 202, #3 Exhibit 203, #4 Exhibit 204, #5 Exhibit 205, #6 Exhibit 206, #7 Exhibit 207, #8 Exhibit 208, #9 Exhibit 209, #10 Exhibit 210, #11 Exhibit 211, #12 Exhibit 212, #13 Exhibit 213, #14 Exhibit 214, #15 Exhibit 215 part 1, #16 Exhibit 215 part 2, #17 Exhibit 215 part 3, #18 Exhibit 215 part 4, #19 Exhibit 216, #20 Exhibit 217).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 844 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #826 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 843 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 842 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #826 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 841 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 840 DECLARATION of Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 401, #2 Exhibit 402, #3 Exhibit 404, #4 Exhibit 405, #5 Exhibit 406, #6 Exhibit 407, #7 Exhibit 408, #8 Exhibit 410, #9 Exhibit 411, #10 Exhibit 412, #11 Exhibit 413, #12 Exhibit 414, #13 Exhibit 415, #14 Exhibit 416, #15 Exhibit 417, #16 Exhibit 418, #17 Exhibit 419, #18 Exhibit 420, #19 Exhibit 421, #20 Exhibit 422, #21 Exhibit 423, #22 Exhibit 424, #23 Exhibit 425, #24 Exhibit 426, #25 Exhibit 427, #26 Exhibit 428, #27 Exhibit 429, #28 Exhibit 430, #29 Exhibit 431, #30 Exhibit 432, #31 Exhibit 433, #32 Exhibit 434, #33 Exhibit 435, #34 Exhibit 436, #35 Exhibit 437, #36 Exhibit 438, #37 Exhibit 439, #38 Exhibit 440, #39 Exhibit 441, #40 Exhibit 442, #41 Exhibit 443, #42 Exhibit 444, #43 Exhibit 445, #44 Exhibit 446, #45 Exhibit 447, #46 Exhibit 448, #47 Exhibit 449, #48 Exhibit 450, #49 Exhibit 451, #50 Exhibit 452, #51 Exhibit 453, #52 Exhibit 455, #53 Exhibit 458, #54 Exhibit 459, #55 Exhibit 460, #56 Exhibit 461, #57 Exhibit 462, #58 Exhibit 463, #59 Exhibit 464, #60 Exhibit 465, #61 Exhibit 466, #62 Exhibit 467, #63 Exhibit 468, #64 Exhibit 469, #65 Exhibit 470, #66 Exhibit 471, #67 Exhibit 472, #68 Exhibit 473, #69 Exhibit 474, #70 Exhibit 475, #71 Exhibit 476, #72 Exhibit 477, #73 Exhibit 478, #74 Exhibit 479, #75 Exhibit 480, #76 Exhibit 481, #77 Exhibit 482, #78 Exhibit 483, #79 Exhibit 484, #80 Exhibit 485, #81 Exhibit 486, #82 Exhibit 487, #83 Exhibit 488, #84 Exhibit 489, #85 Exhibit 490, #86 Exhibit 491, #87 Exhibit 492, #88 Exhibit 493, #89 Exhibit 494, #90 Exhibit 495, #91 Exhibit 496, #92 Exhibit 497, #93 Exhibit 498, #94 Exhibit 510, #95 Exhibit 511, #96 Exhibit 513, #97 Exhibit 514, #98 Exhibit 515, #99 Exhibit 516, #100 Exhibit 517, #101 Exhibit 518, #102 Exhibit 519, #103 Exhibit 520, #104 Exhibit 521, #105 Exhibit 522, #106 Exhibit 523, #107 Exhibit 541, #108 Exhibit 542, #109 Exhibit 543, #110 Exhibit 544).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 839 DECLARATION of Daphna A. Waxman in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 500, #2 Exhibit 500.01, #3 Exhibit 501, #4 Exhibit 501.01, #5 Exhibit 502, #6 Exhibit 502.01, #7 Exhibit 503, #8 Exhibit 503.01, #9 Exhibit 504, #10 Exhibit 504.01, #11 Exhibit 505, #12 Exhibit 506, #13 Exhibit 506.01, #14 Exhibit 507, #15 Exhibit 507.01, #16 Exhibit 508, #17 Exhibit 508.01, #18 Exhibit 509, #19 Exhibit 509.01).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 838 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 837 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 836 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Parties. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 835 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #629 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2, #2 Supplement Part 3, #3 Supplement Part 4).(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 834 DECLARATION of Erol Gulay in Support re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 280, #2 Exhibit # 281, #3 Exhibit # 282, #4 Exhibit # 283, #5 Exhibit # 284, #6 Exhibit # 285, #7 Exhibit # 286, #8 Exhibit # 287, #9 Exhibit # 288, #10 Exhibit # 289, #11 Exhibit # 290, #12 Exhibit # 291, #13 Exhibit # 292, #14 Exhibit # 293, #15 Exhibit # 294, #16 Exhibit # 295, #17 Exhibit # 296, #18 Exhibit # 297, #19 Exhibit # 298, #20 Exhibit # 299).(Gulay, Erol) Modified on 6/13/2023 (kj).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 833 RESPONSE re: #668 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 832 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 831 DECLARATION of Erol Glay in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 167.01, #2 Exhibit # 167.02, #3 Exhibit # 167.03, #4 Exhibit # 167.04, #5 Exhibit # 167.05, #6 Exhibit # 167.06, #7 Exhibit # 167.07, #8 Exhibit # 167.08, #9 Exhibit # 167.09, #10 Exhibit # 167.10, #11 Exhibit # 167.11, #12 Exhibit # 167.12, #13 Exhibit # 167.13, #14 Exhibit # 167.14, #15 Exhibit # 167.15, #16 Exhibit # 167.16, #17 Exhibit # 167.17, #18 Exhibit # 167.18, #19 Exhibit # 167.19, #20 Exhibit # 167.20, #21 Exhibit # 167.21, #22 Exhibit # 167.22, #23 Exhibit # 167.23, #24 Exhibit # 167.24, #25 Exhibit # 167.25, #26 Exhibit # 167.26, #27 Exhibit # 168, #28 Exhibit # 169, #29 Exhibit # 170, #30 Exhibit # 171, #31 Exhibit # 172, #32 Exhibit # 173, #33 Exhibit # 174, #34 Exhibit # 175, #35 Exhibit # 176, #36 Exhibit # 177, #37 Exhibit # 178, #38 Exhibit # 179, #39 Exhibit # 180, #40 Exhibit # 181, #41 Exhibit # 182, #42 Exhibit # 183, #43 Exhibit # 184, #44 Exhibit # 185, #45 Exhibit # 186, #46 Exhibit # 187, #47 Exhibit # 188, #48 Exhibit # 189, #49 Exhibit # 190, #50 Exhibit # 191, #51 Exhibit # 192, #52 Exhibit # 193, #53 Exhibit # 194, #54 Exhibit # 195, #55 Exhibit # 196, #56 Exhibit # 197, #57 Exhibit # 198, #58 Exhibit # 199, #59 Exhibit # 200, #60 Exhibit # 201, #61 Exhibit # 202, #62 Exhibit # 203, #63 Exhibit # 204, #64 Exhibit # 205, #65 Exhibit # 206, #66 Exhibit # 207, #67 Exhibit # 208, #68 Exhibit # 209, #69 Exhibit # 210, #70 Exhibit # 211, #71 Exhibit # 212, #72 Exhibit # 213, #73 Exhibit # 214, #74 Exhibit # 215, #75 Exhibit # 216, #76 Exhibit # 217, #77 Exhibit # 218, #78 Exhibit # 219, #79 Exhibit # 220, #80 Exhibit # 221, #81 Exhibit # 222, #82 Exhibit # 223, #83 Exhibit # 224, #84 Exhibit # 225, #85 Exhibit # 226, #86 Exhibit # 227, #87 Exhibit # 228, #88 Exhibit # 229, #89 Exhibit # 230, #90 Exhibit # 231, #91 Exhibit # 232, #92 Exhibit # 233, #93 Exhibit # 234, #94 Exhibit # 235, #95 Exhibit # 236, #96 Exhibit # 237, #97 Exhibit # 238, #98 Exhibit # 239, #99 Exhibit # 240, #100 Exhibit # 241, #101 Exhibit # 242, #102 Exhibit # 243, #103 Exhibit # 244, #104 Exhibit # 245, #105 Exhibit # 246, #106 Exhibit # 247, #107 Exhibit # 248, #108 Exhibit # 249, #109 Exhibit # 250, #110 Exhibit # 251, #111 Exhibit # 252, #112 Exhibit # 253, #113 Exhibit # 254, #114 Exhibit # 255, #115 Exhibit # 256, #116 Exhibit # 257, #117 Exhibit # 258, #118 Exhibit # 259, #119 Exhibit # 260, #120 Exhibit # 261, #121 Exhibit # 262, #122 Exhibit # 263, #123 Exhibit # 264, #124 Exhibit # 265, #125 Exhibit # 266, #126 Exhibit # 267, #127 Exhibit # 268, #128 Exhibit # 269, #129 Exhibit # 270, #130 Exhibit # 271, #131 Exhibit # 272, #132 Exhibit # 273, #133 Exhibit # 274, #134 Exhibit # 275, #135 Exhibit # 276, #136 Exhibit # 277, #137 Exhibit # 278, #138 Exhibit # 279).(Gulay, Erol) Modified on 6/13/2023 (kj).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 830 DECLARATION of Christopher S. Ford in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 107, #2 Exhibit # 108, #3 Exhibit # 109, #4 Exhibit # 110, #5 Exhibit # 111, #6 Exhibit # 112, #7 Exhibit # 113, #8 Exhibit # 114, #9 Exhibit # 115, #10 Exhibit # 116, #11 Exhibit # 117, #12 Exhibit # 118, #13 Exhibit # 119, #14 Exhibit # 120, #15 Exhibit # 121, #16 Exhibit # 122, #17 Exhibit # 123, #18 Exhibit # 124, #19 Exhibit # 125, #20 Exhibit # 126, #21 Exhibit # 127, #22 Exhibit # 128, #23 Exhibit # 129, #24 Exhibit # 130, #25 Exhibit # 131, #26 Exhibit # 132, #27 Exhibit # 133, #28 Exhibit # 134, #29 Exhibit # 135, #30 Exhibit # 136, #31 Exhibit # 137, #32 Exhibit # 138, #33 Exhibit # 139, #34 Exhibit # 140, #35 Exhibit # 141, #36 Exhibit # 142, #37 Exhibit # 143, #38 Exhibit # 144, #39 Exhibit # 145, #40 Exhibit # 146, #41 Exhibit # 147, #42 Exhibit # 148, #43 Exhibit # 149, #44 Exhibit # 150, #45 Exhibit # 151, #46 Exhibit # 152, #47 Exhibit # 153, #48 Exhibit # 154, #49 Exhibit # 155, #50 Exhibit # 156, #51 Exhibit # 157, #52 Exhibit # 158, #53 Exhibit # 159, #54 Exhibit # 160, #55 Exhibit # 161, #56 Exhibit # 162, #57 Exhibit # 163, #58 Exhibit # 164, #59 Exhibit # 165, #60 Exhibit # 166).(Ford, Christopher) Modified on 6/13/2023 (kj).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 829 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2, #2 Supplement Part 3, #3 Supplement Part 4).(Kellogg, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2023 (kj).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 828 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 827 DECLARATION of Michael K. Kellogg in Support re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106).(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 826 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 825 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #824 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 824 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Michael Kellogg to RE-FILE Document #829 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Use the event type Other Answers found under the event list Counter Statement to Rule 56.1. (kj)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER granting #822 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chiseul Kim terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 822 MOTION for Kylie Chiseul Kim to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kylie Chiseul Kim, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Kim, Chiseul)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER granting #820 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Cross Motions due by 6/13/2023. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/19/2023) (jca)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 820 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file redacted versions of the Parties' cross-motions for summary judgment and accompanying exhibits addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated May 19, 2023. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #635 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #637 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #638 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting in part and denying in part #671 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #744 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #745 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #751 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #754 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #756 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #758 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #759 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #762 Letter Motion to Seal; denying as moot #811 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; denying as moot #812 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. For the foregoing reasons, the SEC's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, Defendants' motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the non parties' motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically: 1. The SEC's motion to seal is DENIED as to the Hinman Speech Documents, and GRANTED as to the remainder of its requests. 2. Defendants' motion to seal is DENIED as to references linking Ripple's revenues with XRP sales, the amount of compensation that Ripple offered to trading platforms to list XRP, and the amount of Ripple's XRP sales targeted at investors through programmatic and institutional sales; and as to the names GSR, Bitstamp, Coil Technologies, Inc., the XRP Ledger Foundation, and the platforms that publicly make XRP available for trading; and GRANTED as to the remainder of their requests. 3. Third-Party A and Cryptocurrency Exchange's motions to redact their identities and the names of public cryptocurrency trading platforms are DENIED, Layton's motion to intervene is DENIED as moot, and the remainder of the third parties' motions are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 635, 637, 638, 671, 744, 745, 751, 754, 756, 758, 759, 762, 811, and 812. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/16/2023) (kv) (Main Document 819 replaced on 5/18/2023) (rro). Modified on 5/18/2023 (rro).
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 818 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated April 13, 2023 re: response to notice of supplemental authority. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 817 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Benjamin J. Hanauer dated April 11, 2023 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting the SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (SEC v. Commonwealth Opinion)).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 816 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated March 23, 2023 re: Defendants' March 2023 Letters. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 815 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 20, 2023 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Kellogg, Michael)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #532 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #535 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #537 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #540 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #543 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #546 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #768 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #770 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #773 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #786 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #789 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #791 Motion to Preclude. For the foregoing reasons, the parties' motions are GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Specifically, 1. Defendants' motion to preclude Expert No. 1 from testifying is GRANTED as to his first opinion about the perceptions of a reasonable XRP purchaser, and DENIED as to the remainder of his testimony. 2. Defendants' motion to preclude Expert No. 2 from testifying is GRANTED as to his fourth opinion about the materiality of Ripple's potential disclosures, and DENIED as to the remainder of his testimony. 3. Defendants' motion to preclude Expert No. 3 from testifying is DENIED. 4. Defendants' motion to preclude Expert No. 4 from testifying is GRANTED as to his third opinion about the risks to the XRP Ledger that might materialize if Ripple "walked away" or "disappeared", and DENIED as to the remainder of his testimony. 5. Defendants' motion to preclude Expert No. 5 from testifying is GRANTED as to his opinion on causation, and DENIED as to the remainder of his testimony. 6. The SEC's motion to preclude Schwartz from testifying is GRANTED as to his opinion on the Supreme Court's legal reasoning in Howey, and DENIED as to the remainder of his testimony. 7. The SEC's motion to preclude Adriaens from testifying is GRANTED as to his first and second narrative opinions, and DENIED as to the remainder of his testimony. 8. The SEC's motion to preclude Borden from testifying is DENIED. 9. The SEC's motion to preclude Easton from testifying is GRANTED as to his rebuttal report, and DENIED as to his opening report. 10. The SEC's motion to preclude Yadav from testifying is GRANTED as to her third opinion about where an offer or sale of XRP occurs, and DENIED as to the remainder of her testimony. 11. The SEC's motion to preclude Ferrell from testifying is GRANTED as to his legal opinions, including his second and fifth opinions in his opening report and portions of his rebuttal report, and DENIED as to the remainder of his testimony. 12. The SEC's motion to preclude Osler from testifying is DENIED. 13. The SEC's motion to preclude Fischel from testifying as to his first and fourth opinions is GRANTED. 14. The SEC's motion to preclude Marais from testifying is DENIED. 15. The SEC's motion to preclude Shampanier from testifying is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 532, 535, 537, 540, 543, 546, 768, 770, 773, 786, 789, and 791. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/6/2023) (kv)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 813 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 3, 2022 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kellogg, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 812 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Leave to File petition to intervene to oppose sealing of Hinman Speech Documents addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Rosyln Layton, PhD dated 2/21/2023. Document filed by Roslyn Layton. Return Date set for 3/1/2023 at 12:00 PM..(Cecere, Joseph)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #810 MOTION for J. Carl Cecere to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27350184. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit Not Notarized. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 811 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Petition to Intervene to oppose sealing of Hinman Speech Documents addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Rosyln Layton, PhD dated February 15, 2023. Document filed by Roslyn Layton. Return Date set for 3/1/2023 at 12:00 AM..(Cecere, Joseph)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 810 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for J. Carl Cecere to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27350184. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roslyn Layton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of motion for admission pro hac vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of good standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order).(Cecere, Joseph) Modified on 2/16/2023 (sgz).
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 809 DECLARATION of Kylie Chiseul Kim in Opposition re: #770 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 to ECF No. 796).(Kim, Chiseul)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 808 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alyssa M. Hasbrouck dated January 25, 2023 re: #751 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alyssa M. Hasbrouck dated January 4, 2023. . Document filed by Investment Banker Declarant..(Hasbrouck, Alyssa)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 807 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF ANOOP K. BUNGAY IN SUPPORT OF NEITHER PLAINTIFF ( SEC) NOR DEFENDANT(RLI). Document filed by non-party, Anoop Bungay. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Motion, #2 Main Document, #3 Main Document, #4 Main Document, #5 Main Document, #6 Main Document)(sc) Modified on 1/23/2023 (sc).
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 806 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated January 18, 2023 re: #762 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James Q. Walker dated January 4, 2023., #759 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions Of Parties Motions For Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael A. Hanin dated January 4, 2023. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 805 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated January 18, 2023 re: #751 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alyssa M. Hasbrouck dated January 4, 2023. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 804 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #791 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 803 DECLARATION of Kylie Chiseul Kim in Support re: #789 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H).(Kim, Chiseul)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 802 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #773 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 801 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #768 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 800 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #789 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Figel, Reid)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna R. Gressel dated January 13, 2023 re: enclosing Sealed Exhibits to Daubert Motions pursuant to the Court's Order dated December 19, 2022. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission, Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Andrew J. Ceresney in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3: Article by SEC Expert No. 3, #2 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Christopher S. Ford in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4: Expert 4 Publication)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #737 .(Gressel, Anna)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 798 DECLARATION of Bradley E. Opphenheimer in Support re: #786 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L).(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 797 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #786 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 796 DECLARATION of Kylie Chiseul Kim in Opposition re: #770 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38).(Kim, Chiseul)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 795 DECLARATION of Christopher S. Ford in Support re: #791 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Expert 4, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript of Expert 4, #3 Exhibit C - GAO Report, #4 Exhibit D - Neha Narula Tweet, #5 Exhibit E - Sai Article, #6 Exhibit F - Troncoso Article, #7 Exhibit H - SUERF Policy Note, #8 Exhibit I - XRP Chat Thread).(Ford, Christopher)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 794 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #770 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 793 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #791 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 792 DECLARATION of Kylie Chiseul Kim in Support re: #789 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Kim, Chiseul)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 791 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 790 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #789 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Figel, Reid)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 789 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Figel, Reid)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 788 DECLARATION of Bradley E. Oppenheimer in Support re: #786 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I).(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 787 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #786 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 786 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 785 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 784 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 783 DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #540 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #540 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 781 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #537 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 780 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #532 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 779 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Ceresney in Support re: #773 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of SEC Expert No. 3, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcript of SEC Expert No. 3, #3 Exhibit 4 - Ferrell Rebuttal Report).(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 778 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Opposition re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 777 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 776 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #770 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 775 DECLARATION of Pascale Guerrier in Support re: #770 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44 Part 1, #46 Exhibit 44 Part 2, #47 Exhibit 44 Part 3, #48 Exhibit 44 Part 4, #49 Exhibit 44 Part 5, #50 Exhibit 45).(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 774 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #773 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 773 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 772 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #770 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2).(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 771 DECLARATION of Anna R. Gressel in Support re: #768 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2.. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Expert No. 2, #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert No. 2 Deposition Transcript).(Gressel, Anna)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 770 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #768 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 768 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 767 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew J. Ceresney on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc.. New Address: Debevoise & Plimpton LLP, 66 Hudson Boulevard, New York, New York, 10001, 212-909-6000..(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 766 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated January 9, 2023 re: #744 LETTER MOTION to Seal or Redact Certain Summary Judgment Materials addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated December 22, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 765 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew Ceresney on behalf of Ripple Labs, Inc., Christian Larsen, and Bradley Garlinghouse dated January 9, 2023 re: #745 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated December 22, 2022. . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of Cryptocurrency Exchange Declarant in Support re: #762 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James Q. Walker dated January 4, 2023.. Document filed by Cryptocurrency Exchange Declarant. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #762 .(Walker, James)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 762 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James Q. Walker dated January 4, 2023. Document filed by Cryptocurrency Exchange Declarant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Redactions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Redactions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Redactions, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Redactions).(Walker, James)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael A. Hanin dated January 4, 2023 re: Seal Portions Of Parties Motions For Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kristiana Warner, Debra L Fein, Mya LaMonte, Veri DAO, Ripple Labs Inc., Valhil Capital, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission, Tyler LaMonte, Third-Party A, MoneyGram International, Inc., Phillip Goldstein, Non-Party D, Jordan Deaton, Third-Party C, Mitchell McKenna, Investment Banker Declarant, Investor Choice Advocates Network, SpendTheBits, Inc., Paradigm Operations LP, Cryptillian Payment Systems, LLC, Third-Party B, Crypto Council for Innovation, The Chamber of Digital Commerce, Christian A. Larsen, New Sports Economy Institute, Coinbase, Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Reaper Financial, LLC, Blockchain Association, Investor A, I-REMIT, INC., James LaMonte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit B: Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit C: Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit D: Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit E: Email, #6 Exhibit F: Email, #7 Exhibit G: Email, #8 Exhibit H: Email, #9 Exhibit I: Email, #10 Exhibit J: Email, #11 Exhibit K: Email, #12 Exhibit L: Email, #13 Exhibit M: Email, #14 Exhibit N: Email, #15 Exhibit O: Email, #16 Exhibit P: Email, #17 Exhibit Q: Email, #18 Exhibit R:Email, #19 Exhibit S: Email, #20 Exhibit T: Email, #21 Exhibit U: Contract, #22 Exhibit V: Email, #23 Exhibit W: Contract, #24 Exhibit X: Contract, #25 Exhibit Y: Email, #26 Exhibit Z: Email, #27 Exhibit AA: Email, #28 Exhibit BB: Email, #29 Exhibit CC: Email, #30 Exhibit DD:Email, #31 Exhibit EE: Email, #32 Exhibit FF: Email, #33 Exhibit GG: Email, #34 Exhibit HH: Email, #35 Exhibit II: Email, #36 Exhibit JJ: Email, #37 Exhibit KK: Email, #38 Exhibit LL: Contract)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #759 .(Hanin, Michael)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Q Walker on behalf of Cryptocurrency Exchange Declarant..(Walker, James)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 759 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions Of Parties Motions For Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael A. Hanin dated January 4, 2023. Document filed by Third-Party A..(Hanin, Michael)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 758 LETTER MOTION to Seal seven summary judgment exhibits addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Eva Ciko Carman dated January 4, 2023. Document filed by Investor A..(Carman, Eva)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ***EX-PARTE***Exhibit List . Document filed by MoneyGram International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #756 .(Masella, Jessica)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 756 LETTER MOTION to Seal certain portions of the parties' Summary Judgment Materials addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jessica Ann Masella dated January 4, 2023. Document filed by MoneyGram International, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ***EX-PARTE*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from E. Scott Schirick dated January 4, 2023 re: (Letter Motion to Seal). Document filed by Non-Party D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #754 .(Schirick, E.)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 754 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from E. Scott Schirick dated January 4, 2023. Document filed by Non-Party D..(Schirick, E.)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by E. Scott Schirick on behalf of Non-Party D..(Schirick, E.)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Investment Banker Declarant . Document filed by Investment Banker Declarant, Blockchain Association, Coinbase, Inc., Cryptillian Payment Systems, LLC, Crypto Council for Innovation, Jordan Deaton, Debra L Fein, Bradley Garlinghouse, Phillip Goldstein, I-REMIT, INC., Investor A, Investor Choice Advocates Network, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Christian A. Larsen, Mitchell McKenna, MoneyGram International, Inc., New Sports Economy Institute, Paradigm Operations LP, Reaper Financial, LLC, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission, SpendTheBits, Inc., The Chamber of Digital Commerce, Third-Party A, Third-Party B, Third-Party C, Valhil Capital, LLC, Veri DAO, Kristiana Warner. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #751 .(Hasbrouck, Alyssa)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 751 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alyssa M. Hasbrouck dated January 4, 2023. Document filed by Investment Banker Declarant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit / Proposed Redacted Declaration).(Hasbrouck, Alyssa)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alyssa M. Hasbrouck on behalf of Investment Banker Declarant..(Hasbrouck, Alyssa)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER granting #748 Motion for Michelle Kallen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 748 MOTION for Michelle Kallen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27143554. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paradigm Operations LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (CA), #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (CA), #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #5 Text of Proposed Order /Proposed Order).(Kallen, Michelle)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER granting #746 Motion for Lewis Rinaudo Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #746 MOTION for Lewis Rinaudo Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27135363. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 746 MOTION for Lewis Rinaudo Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27135363. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paradigm Operations LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit /Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit //Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #3 Exhibit /Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #4 Text of Proposed Order /Proposed Order Granting Admission).(Cohen, Lewis)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 745 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated December 22, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 744 LETTER MOTION to Seal or Redact Certain Summary Judgment Materials addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated December 22, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Letter Motion to Seal - Table of Proposed Sealing Requests, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kristina Campbell, #3 Appendix A to Exhibit A - Table of Certain Proposed Sealing Requests).(Ceresney, Andrew)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER granting #741 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2022) (kv)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER granting #733 Motion for Rodrigo Seira to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/13/2023. (kv)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 741 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File redacted Daubert Motions and accompanying exhibits on the public docket addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated December 20, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 740 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #734 MOTION for Nicole Tatz to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Nicole Tatz from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Nicole Tatz terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/20/2022) (jca)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #734 MOTION for Nicole Tatz to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Nicole Tatz from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Nicole Tatz terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/20/2022) (jca)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #738 MOTION for Michelle Kallen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia 804-786-2251 (State Bar of Virginia not accepted); the filing fee was not paid. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (sgz)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 738 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michelle Kallen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paradigm Operations LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (CA), #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (VA), #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #5 Text of Proposed Order /Proposed Order).(Kallen, Michelle) Modified on 12/20/2022 (sgz).
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER granting #527 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #550 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #561 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #565 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #579 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #581 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #601 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #603 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #617 Letter Motion to Seal. For the foregoing reasons, the SEC's motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, the Defendants' motions are GRANTED, MoneyGram's motion is GRANTED, and Third-Party A's motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motions at ECF Nos. 527, 550, 561, 565, 579, 581, 601, 603, and 617. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/19/2022) (kv)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 736 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. Related Document Number: #734 ..(Tatz, Nicole)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 735 DECLARATION of Nicole Tatz in Support re: #734 MOTION for Nicole Tatz to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Tatz, Nicole)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 734 MOTION for Nicole Tatz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Tatz, Nicole)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #733 MOTION for Rodrigo Seira to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27092778. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MOTION for Rodrigo Seira to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27092778. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paradigm Operations LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (WA), #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Seira, Rodrigo)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER FOR ALL NON-PARTY MOTIONS TO SEAL PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RELATED MATERIALS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: any non-parties must file, by January 4, 2023, a motion to seal any Summary Judgment Materials to the extent the non-party seeks additional or different sealing treatment or redactions than requested by the Parties; and, by January 18, 2023, all Parties and non-parties must file oppositions, if any, to the non-party motions to seal. If no such motion is received by January 4, 2023, the non-party will have waived their right to object to the Court's ultimate ruling on the Parties' motions to seal or redact the Summary Judgment Materials. Motions due by 1/4/2023. Responses due by 1/18/2023 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/12/2022) (kv)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 731 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J Ceresney dated December 9, 2022 re: Deadlines for Non-Party Sealing Motions re: Summary Judgment Motions. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Deadlines for Non-Party Sealing Motions re: Summary Judgment Motions).(Ceresney, Andrew)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 730 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #639 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 729 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Redacted). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Support re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX 248, #2 Exhibit PX 403, #3 Exhibit PX 534, #4 Exhibit PX 553, #5 Exhibit PX 664, #6 Exhibit PX 671)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Sylvester, Mark)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ***SELECTED PARTIES***COUNTER STATEMENT TO #623 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #695 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #639 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #695 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Erol Gulay in Support re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 280, #2 Exhibit 281, #3 Exhibit 282, #4 Exhibit 283, #5 Exhibit 284, #6 Exhibit 285, #7 Exhibit 286, #8 Exhibit 287, #9 Exhibit 288, #10 Exhibit 289, #11 Exhibit 290, #12 Exhibit 291, #13 Exhibit 292, #14 Exhibit 293, #15 Exhibit 294, #16 Exhibit 295, #17 Exhibit 296, #18 Exhibit 297, #19 Exhibit 298, #20 Exhibit 299)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Gulay, Erol)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE re: #668 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #695 .(Kellogg, Michael)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #695 .(Kellogg, Michael)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 722 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae Valhil Capital, LLC in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Valhil Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of James Vallee in Support).(Duke, Brandon)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 721 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Athanasia Charmani on behalf of Valhil Capital, LLC..(Charmani, Athanasia)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 720 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerry Donovan on behalf of Valhil Capital, LLC..(Donovan, Kerry)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 719 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Eric Mastoris on behalf of Valhil Capital, LLC..(Mastoris, George)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 718 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon W. Duke on behalf of Valhil Capital, LLC..(Duke, Brandon)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 717 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #639 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants., #699 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Scott D. Brenner, Esq (Parlatore Law Group LLP) dated November 10, 2022. . Document filed by New Sports Economy Institute..(Brenner, Scott)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 716 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #639 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. Amicus Curiae Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Cryptillian Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Vincent Bono).(Budd, Eileen)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER granting #696 Motion for Frederick Anthony Rispoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER granting #692 Motion for Jeffrey Donoho to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER granting #691 Motion for Benjamin Tompkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 712 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from William M. Cunningham, non-party economist, dated 11/15/22 re: I write in a pro se capacity to request the Court's permission to file an amicus brief in the action referenced above etc. William Michael Cunningham submits this memorandum in support of his motion for leave to file a brief amicus curiae in this matter. His education and experience have uniquely positioned him to provide objective and independent research and opinions to the Court. (sc)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 711 BRIEF of the Crypto Council for Innovation as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants. Document filed by Crypto Council for Innovation..(Boone, Robert)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 710 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae Reaper Financial, LLC. Document filed by Reaper Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick L. Riley, CEO of Reaper Financial).(Rispoli, Frederick)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 709 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae Veri DAO. Document filed by Veri DAO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lloyd Cupp).(Tompkins, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 708 BRIEF re: #639 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. . Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John E. Deaton, #2 Exhibit Ex. A: History of Bitcoin, #3 Exhibit Ex. B: Grundfest Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex. C: SEC Select Accomplishments, #5 Exhibit Ex D: ICO craze, #6 Exhibit Ex. E: Ripple Facts, #7 Exhibit Ex. F: GAO report, #8 Exhibit Ex. G: Coinflip Order, #9 Exhibit Ex. H: FSOC Annual Report, #10 Exhibit Ex. I: Baillard Code of Ethics, #11 Exhibit Ex. J: XRP overtakes, #12 Exhibit Ex. K: Crypto Market Cap, #13 Exhibit Ex. L: Coinbase accepts XRP, #14 Exhibit Ex. M: MoneyGram Ripple Purchase Agreement, #15 Exhibit Ex. N: MoneyGram announcement, #16 Exhibit Ex. O: Moneygram Form 8-K, #17 Exhibit Ex. P: SEC OIEA emails, #18 Exhibit Ex. Q: Gensler-Crypto Platforms need to Register, #19 Exhibit Ex. R: Gensler-Push to get crypto exchanges to register, #20 Exhibit Ex. S: Gensler-Crypto intermediaries should register with SEC, #21 Exhibit Ex. T: XRP tipbot, #22 Exhibit Ex. U: Time Magazine accepts crypto, #23 Exhibit Ex. V: 1500+ companies and stores accept XRP, #24 Exhibit Ex. W: XRP Mastercard, #25 Exhibit Ex. X: Uphold Debit Card, #26 Exhibit Ex. Y: FTX partners with Visa, #27 Exhibit Ex. Z: crypto payroll tool, #28 Exhibit Ex. AA: connecting with Bitpay, #29 Exhibit Ex. BB: Coinbase Ad, #30 Exhibit Ex. CC: Coinbase expands to cross border payments, #31 Exhibit Ex. DD: How to buy XRP, #32 Exhibit Ex. EE: XRP can easily be bought straight from bank account, #33 Exhibit Ex. FF: XRP use cases, #34 Exhibit Ex. GG: XRP Staking, #35 Exhibit Ex. HH: XRP loans, #36 Exhibit Ex. II: Celcius bankruptcy, #37 Exhibit Ex. JJ: Gensler blockchain video, #38 Exhibit Ex. KK: SEC remarks Aspen Security, #39 Exhibit Ex. LL: XRPL services).(Deaton, John)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 707 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae Paradigm Operations LP. Document filed by Paradigm Operations LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Sadeghi, Kayvan)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 706 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae The Blockchain Association. Document filed by Blockchain Association..(Gottlieb, Jason)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 705 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae Coinbase, Inc.. Document filed by Coinbase, Inc...(Heller, Nola)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER granting #680 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #685 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #687 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #688 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #689 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #690 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #694 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #697 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #699 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #700 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #701 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Accordingly, the requests to file amicus curiae briefs are GRANTED. By November 18, 2022, the Association, the six XRP holders, Coinbase, the CCI, Valhil, Cryptillian, Veri DAO, Reaper Financial, InvestReady, the NSEI, and Paradigm shall file their briefs. Amici are reminded that their briefs must comply with the requirements set forth in Section III.D of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 680, 685, 687, 688, 689, 690, 694, 697, 698, 699, 700, and 701. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/14/2022) (kv)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 11/18/2022. (kv)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 703 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shailee Diwanji Sharma on behalf of Paradigm Operations LP..(Sharma, Shailee)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 702 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kayvan Betteridge Sadeghi on behalf of Paradigm Operations LP..(Sadeghi, Kayvan)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 701 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kayvan B. Sadeghi dated November 11, 2022. Document filed by Paradigm Operations LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Article).(Sadeghi, Kayvan)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 700 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Eileen Budd dated November 11, 2022. Document filed by Cryptillian Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Declaration of Vincent Bono).(Budd, Eileen)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 699 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Scott D. Brenner, Esq (Parlatore Law Group LLP) dated November 10, 2022. Document filed by New Sports Economy Institute..(Brenner, Scott)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #696 MOTION for Frederick Anthony Rispoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice As Counsel For Amicus Curiae Reaper Financial, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26941460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Cler. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 698 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Adrian Alvarez, Esq., CEO of InvestReady dated 11/9/22 re: "LETTER MOTION OF ACCREDIFY, INC. D/B/A INVESTREADY FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE IN SEC V. RIPPLE LABS, INC.Document filed by Adrian Alvarez, Esq. sc)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 697 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief on behalf of Reaper Financial, LLC addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Frederick Anthony Rispoli dated 11/09/2022. Document filed by Reaper Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief of Reaper Financial, LLC).(Rispoli, Frederick)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MOTION for Frederick Anthony Rispoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice As Counsel For Amicus Curiae Reaper Financial, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26941460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reaper Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Local Rule 1.3 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Rispoli, Frederick)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER granting #693 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #693 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro dated November 3, 2022. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 1/9/2023 Replies due by 11/30/2022.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/4/2022) (kv)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #691 MOTION for Benjamin Tompkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26914220. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #692 MOTION for Jeffrey Donoho to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26914385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/22/2022. (kv)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 694 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Benjamin Tompkins dated 11/3/2022. Document filed by Veri DAO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amicus Brief, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Declaration of L. Cupp).(Tompkins, Benjamin)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 693 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro dated November 3, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 692 MOTION for Jeffrey Donoho to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26914385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veri DAO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 - Donoho Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Donoho certificates of good standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Donoho proposed order).(Donoho, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MOTION for Benjamin Tompkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26914220. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veri DAO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 - Tompkins affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Tomkpkins certificates of good standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Tompkins proposed order).(Tompkins, Benjamin)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 690 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Eileen Budd dated 11/2/2022. Document filed by Cryptillian Payment Systems, LLC..(Budd, Eileen)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 689 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief of Valhil Capital, LLC, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brandon Duke dated October 31, 2022. Document filed by Valhil Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed amicus brief, #2 Affidavit (Declaration) of James Vallee).(Duke, Brandon)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 688 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert L. Boone dated October 31, 2022. Document filed by Crypto Council for Innovation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief).(Boone, Robert)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 687 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Nola B. Heller dated October 31, 2022. Document filed by Coinbase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief).(Heller, Nola)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 686 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #677 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's application for leave to make the above-specified redactions is GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/31/2022) (ras) Modified on 11/1/2022 (ras). (Main Document 686 replaced on 11/1/2022) (ras).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 685 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated October 31, 2022. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief).(Deaton, John)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 684 BRIEF . Document filed by SpendTheBits, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J.).(Alisme, Joam)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 683 BRIEF for Amici Curiae Investor Choice Advocates Network and Phillip Goldstein in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Phillip Goldstein, Investor Choice Advocates Network..(Weitzman, Avi)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 682 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #680 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by Blockchain Association..(Gottlieb, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 681 DECLARATION of Jason Gottlieb in Support re: #680 MOTION to File Amicus Brief .. Document filed by Blockchain Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Brief of Amicus Curiae the Blockchain Association).(Gottlieb, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 680 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Blockchain Association..(Gottlieb, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER granting #666 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #676 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. The Court has reviewed the requests by Phillip Goldstein and the Investor Choice Advocates Network ("ICAN") and SpendTheBits, Inc. for leave to file amicus curiae briefs dated October 18 and 21, 2022, ECF Nos. 666, 676, and Plaintiffs letter dated October 26, 2022, ECF No. 678. Accordingly, the requests are GRANTED. By November 2, 2022, Phillip Goldstein and ICAN and SpendTheBits, Inc. shall file their briefs. Amici are reminded that their briefs must comply with the requirements set forth in Section III.D of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Plaintiff may respond to amici in its reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 666, 676. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/28/2022) (kv)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 11/2/2022. (kv)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 678 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated October 26, 2022 re: #676 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Joam Alisme, Esq. dated 10/21/2022., #666 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Avi Weitzman dated October 18, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 677 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated October 21, 2022 re: in camera submission. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 676 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Joam Alisme, Esq. dated 10/21/2022. Document filed by SpendTheBits, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J. Affidavit, #2 Supplement Brief).(Alisme, Joam)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 675 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. (Corrected from #673 Redacted). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 673 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. (Redacted). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 671 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Redact Declaration Of Third-Party C's Officer, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jonathan Rotenberg dated 10/19/22. Document filed by Third-Party C..(Rotenberg, Jonathan)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 645, #2 Exhibit 646, #3 Exhibit 647, #4 Exhibit 648, #5 Exhibit 649, #6 Exhibit 650, #7 Exhibit 651, #8 Exhibit 652, #9 Exhibit 653, #10 Exhibit 654, #11 Exhibit 655, #12 Exhibit 656, #13 Exhibit 657, #14 Exhibit 658, #15 Exhibit 659, #16 Exhibit 660, #17 Exhibit 661, #18 Exhibit 662, #19 Exhibit 663, #20 Exhibit 665, #21 Exhibit 666, #22 Exhibit 667, #23 Exhibit 668, #24 Exhibit 669, #25 Exhibit 670, #26 Exhibit 672, #27 Exhibit 673, #28 Exhibit 674, #29 Exhibit 675, #30 Exhibit 676, #31 Exhibit 677, #32 Exhibit 678, #33 Exhibit 679, #34 Exhibit 680, #35 Exhibit 681, #36 Exhibit 682, #37 Exhibit 683, #38 Exhibit 684, #39 Exhibit 685, #40 Exhibit 686, #41 Exhibit 687, #42 Exhibit 688, #43 Exhibit 689, #44 Exhibit 690, #45 Exhibit 691, #46 Exhibit 692, #47 Exhibit 693, #48 Exhibit 694, #49 Exhibit 695, #50 Exhibit 696, #51 Exhibit 697, #52 Exhibit 698, #53 Exhibit 699, #54 Exhibit 701, #55 Exhibit 702, #56 Exhibit 703, #57 Exhibit 704, #58 Exhibit 705, #59 Exhibit 706, #60 Exhibit 707, #61 Exhibit 708, #62 Exhibit 709, #63 Exhibit 710, #64 Exhibit 711, #65 Exhibit 712, #66 Exhibit 713, #67 Exhibit 714, #68 Exhibit 715, #69 Exhibit 716, #70 Exhibit 717, #71 Exhibit 718, #72 Exhibit 719, #73 Exhibit 720, #74 Exhibit 721, #75 Exhibit 722, #76 Exhibit 724, #77 Exhibit 725, #78 Exhibit 726, #79 Exhibit 727, #80 Exhibit 728, #81 Exhibit 729, #82 Exhibit 730, #83 Exhibit 731, #84 Exhibit 732, #85 Exhibit 733, #86 Exhibit 734, #87 Exhibit 735, #88 Exhibit 736, #89 Exhibit 737, #90 Exhibit 738, #91 Exhibit 739, #92 Exhibit 740, #93 Exhibit 741, #94 Exhibit 742, #95 Exhibit 743, #96 Exhibit 744, #97 Exhibit 745, #98 Exhibit 746, #99 Exhibit 747, #100 Exhibit 748, #101 Exhibit 749, #102 Exhibit 750, #103 Exhibit 751, #104 Exhibit 752, #105 Exhibit 753, #106 Exhibit 754, #107 Exhibit 755, #108 Exhibit 756, #109 Exhibit 757, #110 Exhibit 758, #111 Exhibit 759, #112 Exhibit 760, #113 Exhibit 761, #114 Exhibit 762, #115 Exhibit 763, #116 Exhibit 764, #117 Exhibit 765, #118 Exhibit 766, #119 Exhibit 767, #120 Exhibit 768, #121 Exhibit 769, #122 Exhibit 770, #123 Exhibit 771)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Sylvester, Mark)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Opposition re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 113, #2 Exhibit 398, #3 Exhibit 409, #4 Exhibit 456, #5 Exhibit 457, #6 Exhibit 499, #7 Exhibit 500, #8 Exhibit 505, #9 Exhibit 525, #10 Exhibit 526, #11 Exhibit 528, #12 Exhibit 529, #13 Exhibit 530, #14 Exhibit 532, #15 Exhibit 533, #16 Exhibit 535, #17 Exhibit 537, #18 Exhibit 538, #19 Exhibit 539, #20 Exhibit 547, #21 Exhibit 548, #22 Exhibit 552, #23 Exhibit 555, #24 Exhibit 556, #25 Exhibit 557, #26 Exhibit 559, #27 Exhibit 560, #28 Exhibit 561, #29 Exhibit 562, #30 Exhibit 563, #31 Exhibit 564, #32 Exhibit 565, #33 Exhibit 566, #34 Exhibit 567, #35 Exhibit 568, #36 Exhibit 569, #37 Exhibit 570, #38 Exhibit 571, #39 Exhibit 573, #40 Exhibit 574, #41 Exhibit 575, #42 Exhibit 576, #43 Exhibit 577, #44 Exhibit 578, #45 Exhibit 579, #46 Exhibit 580, #47 Exhibit 581, #48 Exhibit 582, #49 Exhibit 583, #50 Exhibit 584, #51 Exhibit 585, #52 Exhibit 586, #53 Exhibit 587, #54 Exhibit 588, #55 Exhibit 589, #56 Exhibit 590, #57 Exhibit 591, #58 Exhibit 592, #59 Exhibit 593, #60 Exhibit 594, #61 Exhibit 595, #62 Exhibit 596, #63 Exhibit 597, #64 Exhibit 598, #65 Exhibit 599, #66 Exhibit 600, #67 Exhibit 601, #68 Exhibit 602, #69 Exhibit 603, #70 Exhibit 604, #71 Exhibit 605, #72 Exhibit 606, #73 Exhibit 607, #74 Exhibit 608, #75 Exhibit 609, #76 Exhibit 610, #77 Exhibit 611, #78 Exhibit 612, #79 Exhibit 613, #80 Exhibit 614, #81 Exhibit 615, #82 Exhibit 616, #83 Exhibit 617, #84 Exhibit 618, #85 Exhibit 619, #86 Exhibit 620, #87 Exhibit 621, #88 Exhibit 623, #89 Exhibit 624, #90 Exhibit 625, #91 Exhibit 626, #92 Exhibit 629, #93 Exhibit 630, #94 Exhibit 631, #95 Exhibit 632, #96 Exhibit 633, #97 Exhibit 634, #98 Exhibit 635, #99 Exhibit 636, #100 Exhibit 637, #101 Exhibit 638, #102 Exhibit 639, #103 Exhibit 640, #104 Exhibit 641, #105 Exhibit 642, #106 Exhibit 643, #107 Exhibit 644)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Stewart, Ladan)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ***SELECTED PARTIES***COUNTER STATEMENT TO #623 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 666 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Avi Weitzman dated October 18, 2022. Document filed by Investor Choice Advocates Network, Phillip Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief).(Weitzman, Avi)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Erol Gulay in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 167.01, #2 Exhibit 167.02, #3 Exhibit 167.03, #4 Exhibit 167.04, #5 Exhibit 167.05, #6 Exhibit 167.06, #7 Exhibit 167.07, #8 Exhibit 167.08, #9 Exhibit 167.09, #10 Exhibit 167.10, #11 Exhibit 167.11, #12 Exhibit 167.12, #13 Exhibit 167.13, #14 Exhibit 167.14, #15 Exhibit 167.15, #16 Exhibit 167.16, #17 Exhibit 167.17, #18 Exhibit 167.18, #19 Exhibit 167.19, #20 Exhibit 167.20, #21 Exhibit 167.21, #22 Exhibit 167.22, #23 Exhibit 167.23, #24 Exhibit 167.24, #25 Exhibit 167.25, #26 Exhibit 167.26, #27 Exhibit 168, #28 Exhibit 169, #29 Exhibit 170, #30 Exhibit 171, #31 Exhibit 172, #32 Exhibit 173, #33 Exhibit 174, #34 Exhibit 175, #35 Exhibit 176, #36 Exhibit 177, #37 Exhibit 178, #38 Exhibit 179, #39 Exhibit 180, #40 Exhibit 181, #41 Exhibit 182, #42 Exhibit 183, #43 Exhibit 184, #44 Exhibit 185, #45 Exhibit 186, #46 Exhibit 187, #47 Exhibit 188, #48 Exhibit 189, #49 Exhibit 190, #50 Exhibit 191, #51 Exhibit 192, #52 Exhibit 193, #53 Exhibit 194, #54 Exhibit 195, #55 Exhibit 196, #56 Exhibit 197, #57 Exhibit 198, #58 Exhibit 199, #59 Exhibit 200, #60 Exhibit 201, #61 Exhibit 202, #62 Exhibit 203, #63 Exhibit 204, #64 Exhibit 205, #65 Exhibit 206, #66 Exhibit 207, #67 Exhibit 208, #68 Exhibit 209, #69 Exhibit 210, #70 Exhibit 211, #71 Exhibit 212, #72 Exhibit 213, #73 Exhibit 214, #74 Exhibit 215, #75 Exhibit 216, #76 Exhibit 217, #77 Exhibit 218, #78 Exhibit 219, #79 Exhibit 220, #80 Exhibit 221, #81 Exhibit 222, #82 Exhibit 223, #83 Exhibit 224, #84 Exhibit 225, #85 Exhibit 226, #86 Exhibit 227, #87 Exhibit 228, #88 Exhibit 229, #89 Exhibit 230, #90 Exhibit 231, #91 Exhibit 232, #92 Exhibit 233, #93 Exhibit 234, #94 Exhibit 235, #95 Exhibit 236, #96 Exhibit 237, #97 Exhibit 238, #98 Exhibit 239, #99 Exhibit 240, #100 Exhibit 241, #101 Exhibit 242, #102 Exhibit 243, #103 Exhibit 244, #104 Exhibit 245, #105 Exhibit 246, #106 Exhibit 247, #107 Exhibit 248, #108 Exhibit 249, #109 Exhibit 250, #110 Exhibit 251, #111 Exhibit 252, #112 Exhibit 253, #113 Exhibit 254, #114 Exhibit 255, #115 Exhibit 256, #116 Exhibit 257, #117 Exhibit 258, #118 Exhibit 259, #119 Exhibit 260, #120 Exhibit 261, #121 Exhibit 262, #122 Exhibit 263, #123 Exhibit 264, #124 Exhibit 265, #125 Exhibit 266, #126 Exhibit 267, #127 Exhibit 268, #128 Exhibit 269, #129 Exhibit 270, #130 Exhibit 271, #131 Exhibit 272, #132 Exhibit 273, #133 Exhibit 274, #134 Exhibit 275, #135 Exhibit 276, #136 Exhibit 277, #137 Exhibit 278, #138 Exhibit 279)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Gulay, Erol)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Christopher S. Ford in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 107, #2 Exhibit 108, #3 Exhibit 109, #4 Exhibit 110, #5 Exhibit 111, #6 Exhibit 112, #7 Exhibit 113, #8 Exhibit 114, #9 Exhibit 115, #10 Exhibit 116, #11 Exhibit 117, #12 Exhibit 118, #13 Exhibit 119, #14 Exhibit 120, #15 Exhibit 121, #16 Exhibit 122, #17 Exhibit 123, #18 Exhibit 124, #19 Exhibit 125, #20 Exhibit 126, #21 Exhibit 127, #22 Exhibit 128, #23 Exhibit 129, #24 Exhibit 130, #25 Exhibit 131, #26 Exhibit 132, #27 Exhibit 133, #28 Exhibit 134, #29 Exhibit 135, #30 Exhibit 136, #31 Exhibit 137, #32 Exhibit 138, #33 Exhibit 139, #34 Exhibit 140, #35 Exhibit 141, #36 Exhibit 142, #37 Exhibit 143, #38 Exhibit 144, #39 Exhibit 145, #40 Exhibit 146, #41 Exhibit 147, #42 Exhibit 148, #43 Exhibit 149, #44 Exhibit 150, #45 Exhibit 151, #46 Exhibit 152, #47 Exhibit 153, #48 Exhibit 154, #49 Exhibit 155, #50 Exhibit 156, #51 Exhibit 157, #52 Exhibit 158, #53 Exhibit 159, #54 Exhibit 160, #55 Exhibit 161, #56 Exhibit 162, #57 Exhibit 163, #58 Exhibit 164, #59 Exhibit 165, #60 Exhibit 166)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Ford, Christopher)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ***SELECTED PARTIES***COUNTER STATEMENT TO #629 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Kellogg, Michael)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Kellogg, Michael)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 661 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Amicus Brief of TapJets, Inc., in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Debra L Fein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eugene Kesselman, Founder and CEO of TapJets, Inc.).(Fein, Debra)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 660 BRIEF re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment . AMICUS BRIEF BY I-REMIT, INC IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by I-REMIT, INC...(Farkas, Brian)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER granting #653 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #656 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. Accordingly, the requests are GRANTED. By October 14, 2022, I-Remit, Inc. and TapJets, Inc. shall file their briefs. Amici are reminded that their briefs must comply with the requirements set forth in Section III.D of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 653, 656. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/11/2022) (kv)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 10/14/2022. (kv)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 658 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated October 5, 2022 re: #653 MOTION to File Amicus Brief, #656 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief of TapJets, Inc., #657 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 657 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated October 4, 2022 re: #653 MOTION to File Amicus Brief ., #656 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief of TapJets, Inc. on behalf of Defendant addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Debra L. Fein/ TapJets, Inc. dated September 30, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 656 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief of TapJets, Inc. on behalf of Defendant addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Debra L. Fein/ TapJets, Inc. dated September 30, 2022. Document filed by Debra L Fein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit of Debra L. Fein, #3 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing FL Bar, #4 Text of Proposed Order On Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Fein, Debra)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 655 DECLARATION of Brian Farkas in Support re: #653 MOTION to File Amicus Brief .. Document filed by I-REMIT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief).(Farkas, Brian)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 654 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #653 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by I-REMIT, INC...(Farkas, Brian)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 653 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by I-REMIT, INC...(Farkas, Brian)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court OVERRULES the SEC's objections and directs the SEC to comply with the Orders. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/29/2022) (ama)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER granting #650 Motion for Bethan R. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JMS)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #650 MOTION for Bethan R. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26726440. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION for Bethan R. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26726440. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Jones, Bethan)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 649 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae The Chamber of Digital Commerce. Document filed by The Chamber of Digital Commerce..(Tessler, Lilya)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 648 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #645 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 12/22/2022) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/21/2022) (kv) Modified on 9/22/2022 (kv).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting #632 Motion to File Amicus Brief. The request is GRANTED. By September 26, 2022, the Chamber of Digital Commerce shall file its brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 632. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/21/22) (yv)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 9/26/2022. (yv)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 646 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated September 20, 2022 re: #632 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 645 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated September 19, 2022 re: schedule for third-party sealing motions. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 644 RESPONSE to Motion re: #632 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
September 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 643 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Redacted). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
September 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 642 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
September 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 641 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#643) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Redacted). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew) Modified on 9/19/2022 (lb).
September 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 640 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #639 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
September 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 639 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 10/18/2022.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ***EX-PARTE*** LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Letter Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Katherine A. Marshall dated September 16, 2022. Document filed by Third-Party B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #637 .(Marshall, Katherine)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 637 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Katherine A. Marshall dated September 16, 2022. Document filed by Third-Party B..(Marshall, Katherine)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ***EX-PARTE*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael A. Hanin dated September 14, 2022 re: Third-Party Application to Seal. Document filed by Third-Party A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #635 .(Hanin, Michael)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 635 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael A. Hanin dated September 14, 2022. Document filed by Third-Party A..(Hanin, Michael)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 634 DECLARATION of Lilya Tessler in Support re: #632 MOTION to File Amicus Brief .. Document filed by The Chamber of Digital Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief).(Tessler, Lilya)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #632 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by The Chamber of Digital Commerce..(Tessler, Lilya)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 632 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by The Chamber of Digital Commerce..(Tessler, Lilya)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ***SELECTED PARTIES***RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Mark R Sylvester in Support re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 201, #2 Exhibit 202, #3 Exhibit 203, #4 Exhibit 204, #5 Exhibit 205, #6 Exhibit 206, #7 Exhibit 207, #8 Exhibit 208, #9 Exhibit 209, #10 Exhibit 210, #11 Exhibit 211, #12 Exhibit 212, #13 Exhibit 213, #14 Exhibit 214, #15 Exhibit 215, #16 Exhibit 216, #17 Exhibit 217, #18 Exhibit 218, #19 Exhibit 219, #20 Exhibit 220, #21 Exhibit 221, #22 Exhibit 222, #23 Exhibit 223, #24 Exhibit 224, #25 Exhibit 225, #26 Exhibit 226, #27 Exhibit 227, #28 Exhibit 228, #29 Exhibit 229, #30 Exhibit 230, #31 Exhibit 231, #32 Exhibit 232, #33 Exhibit 233, #34 Exhibit 234, #35 Exhibit 235, #36 Exhibit 236, #37 Exhibit 237, #38 Exhibit 238, #39 Exhibit 239, #40 Exhibit 240, #41 Exhibit 241, #42 Exhibit 242, #43 Exhibit 243, #44 Exhibit 244, #45 Exhibit 245, #46 Exhibit 246, #47 Exhibit 247, #48 Exhibit 248, #49 Exhibit 249, #50 Exhibit 250, #51 Exhibit 251, #52 Errata 252, #53 Exhibit 253, #54 Exhibit 254, #55 Exhibit 255, #56 Exhibit 256, #57 Exhibit 257, #58 Exhibit 258, #59 Exhibit 259, #60 Exhibit 260, #61 Exhibit 261, #62 Exhibit 262, #63 Exhibit 263, #64 Exhibit 264, #65 Exhibit 265, #66 Exhibit 266, #67 Exhibit 267, #68 Exhibit 268, #69 Exhibit 269, #70 Exhibit 270, #71 Exhibit 271, #72 Exhibit 272, #73 Exhibit 273, #74 Exhibit 274, #75 Exhibit 275, #76 Exhibit 276, #77 Exhibit 277, #78 Exhibit 278, #79 Exhibit 279, #80 Exhibit 280, #81 Exhibit 281, #82 Exhibit 282, #83 Exhibit 283, #84 Exhibit 284, #85 Exhibit 285, #86 Exhibit 286, #87 Exhibit 287, #88 Exhibit 288, #89 Exhibit 289, #90 Exhibit 290, #91 Exhibit 291, #92 Exhibit 292, #93 Exhibit 293, #94 Exhibit 294, #95 Exhibit 295, #96 Exhibit 296, #97 Exhibit 297, #98 Exhibit 298, #99 Exhibit 299, #100 Exhibit 300, #101 Exhibit 301, #102 Exhibit 302, #103 Exhibit 303, #104 Exhibit 304, #105 Exhibit 305, #106 Exhibit 306, #107 Exhibit 307, #108 Exhibit 308, #109 Exhibit 309, #110 Exhibit 310, #111 Exhibit 311, #112 Exhibit 312, #113 Exhibit 313, #114 Exhibit 314, #115 Exhibit 315, #116 Exhibit 316, #117 Exhibit 317, #118 Exhibit 318, #119 Exhibit 319, #120 Exhibit 320, #121 Exhibit 321, #122 Exhibit 322, #123 Exhibit 323, #124 Exhibit 324, #125 Exhibit 325, #126 Exhibit 326, #127 Exhibit 327, #128 Exhibit 328, #129 Exhibit 329, #130 Exhibit 330, #131 Exhibit 331, #132 Exhibit 332, #133 Exhibit 333, #134 Exhibit 334, #135 Exhibit 335, #136 Exhibit 336, #137 Exhibit 337, #138 Exhibit 338, #139 Exhibit 339, #140 Exhibit 340, #141 Exhibit 341, #142 Exhibit 342, #143 Exhibit 343, #144 Exhibit 344, #145 Exhibit 345, #146 Exhibit 346, #147 Exhibit 347, #148 Exhibit 348, #149 Exhibit 349, #150 Exhibit 350, #151 Exhibit 351, #152 Exhibit 352, #153 Exhibit 353, #154 Exhibit 354, #155 Exhibit 355, #156 Exhibit 356, #157 Exhibit 357, #158 Exhibit 358, #159 Exhibit 359, #160 Exhibit 360, #161 Exhibit 361, #162 Exhibit 362, #163 Exhibit 363, #164 Exhibit 364, #165 Exhibit 365, #166 Exhibit 366, #167 Exhibit 367, #168 Exhibit 368, #169 Exhibit 369, #170 Exhibit 370, #171 Exhibit 371, #172 Exhibit 372, #173 Exhibit 373, #174 Exhibit 374, #175 Exhibit 375, #176 Exhibit 376, #177 Exhibit 377, #178 Exhibit 378, #179 Exhibit 379, #180 Exhibit 380, #181 Exhibit 381, #182 Exhibit 382, #183 Exhibit 383, #184 Exhibit 384, #185 Exhibit 385, #186 Exhibit 386, #187 Exhibit 387, #188 Exhibit 388, #189 Exhibit 390, #190 Exhibit 391, #191 Exhibit 392, #192 Exhibit 393, #193 Exhibit 394, #194 Exhibit 395, #195 Exhibit 396, #196 Exhibit 397, #197 Exhibit 399, #198 Exhibit 400, #199 Exhibit 540, #200 Exhibit 545)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Sylvester, Mark)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106, #107 Exhibit 107, #108 Exhibit 108, #109 Exhibit 109, #110 Exhibit 110, #111 Exhibit 111, #112 Exhibit 112, #113 Exhibit 114, #114 Exhibit 115, #115 Exhibit 116, #116 Exhibit 117, #117 Exhibit 118, #118 Exhibit 119, #119 Exhibit 120, #120 Exhibit 121, #121 Exhibit 122, #122 Exhibit 123, #123 Exhibit 124, #124 Exhibit 125, #125 Exhibit 126, #126 Exhibit 127, #127 Exhibit 128, #128 Exhibit 129, #129 Exhibit 130, #130 Exhibit 131, #131 Exhibit 132, #132 Exhibit 133, #133 Exhibit 134, #134 Exhibit 135, #135 Exhibit 136, #136 Exhibit 137, #137 Exhibit 138, #138 Exhibit 139, #139 Exhibit 140, #140 Exhibit 141, #141 Exhibit 142, #142 Exhibit 143, #143 Exhibit 144, #144 Exhibit 145, #145 Exhibit 146, #146 Exhibit 147, #147 Exhibit 148, #148 Exhibit 149, #149 Exhibit 150, #150 Exhibit 151, #151 Exhibit 152, #152 Exhibit 153, #153 Exhibit 154, #154 Exhibit 155, #155 Exhibit 156, #156 Exhibit 157, #157 Exhibit 158, #158 Exhibit 159, #159 Exhibit 160, #160 Exhibit 161, #161 Exhibit 162, #162 Exhibit 163, #163 Exhibit 164, #164 Exhibit 165, #165 Exhibit 166, #166 Exhibit 167, #167 Exhibit 168, #168 Exhibit 169, #169 Exhibit 170, #170 Exhibit 171, #171 Exhibit 172, #172 Exhibit 173, #173 Exhibit 174, #174 Exhibit 175, #175 Exhibit 176, #176 Exhibit 177, #177 Exhibit 178, #178 Exhibit 179, #179 Exhibit 180, #180 Exhibit 181, #181 Exhibit 182, #182 Exhibit 183, #183 Exhibit 184, #184 Exhibit 185, #185 Exhibit 186, #186 Exhibit 187, #187 Exhibit 188, #188 Exhibit 189, #189 Exhibit 190, #190 Exhibit 191, #191 Exhibit 192, #192 Exhibit 193, #193 Exhibit 194, #194 Exhibit 195, #195 Exhibit 196, #196 Exhibit 197, #197 Exhibit 198, #198 Exhibit 199, #199 Exhibit 200)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Stewart, Ladan)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Jorge G Tenreiro in Support re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 401, #2 Affidavit 402, #3 Exhibit 404, #4 Appendix 405, #5 Exhibit 406, #6 Exhibit 407, #7 Exhibit 408, #8 Exhibit 410, #9 Exhibit 411, #10 Exhibit 412, #11 Exhibit 413, #12 Exhibit 414, #13 Exhibit 415, #14 Exhibit 416, #15 Exhibit 417, #16 Exhibit 418, #17 Exhibit 419, #18 Exhibit 420, #19 Exhibit 421, #20 Exhibit 422, #21 Exhibit 423, #22 Exhibit 424, #23 Exhibit 425, #24 Exhibit 426, #25 Exhibit 427, #26 Exhibit 428, #27 Exhibit 429, #28 Exhibit 430, #29 Exhibit 431, #30 Exhibit 432, #31 Exhibit 433, #32 Exhibit 434, #33 Exhibit 435, #34 Exhibit 436, #35 Exhibit 437, #36 Exhibit 438, #37 Exhibit 439, #38 Exhibit 440, #39 Exhibit 441, #40 Exhibit 442, #41 Exhibit 443, #42 Exhibit 444, #43 Exhibit 445, #44 Exhibit 446, #45 Exhibit 447, #46 Exhibit 448, #47 Exhibit 449, #48 Exhibit 450, #49 Exhibit 451, #50 Exhibit 452, #51 Exhibit 453, #52 Exhibit 454, #53 Exhibit 455, #54 Exhibit 458, #55 Exhibit 459, #56 Exhibit 460, #57 Exhibit 461, #58 Exhibit 462, #59 Exhibit 463, #60 Exhibit 464, #61 Exhibit 465, #62 Exhibit 466, #63 Exhibit 467, #64 Exhibit 468, #65 Exhibit 469, #66 Exhibit 470, #67 Exhibit 471, #68 Exhibit 472, #69 Exhibit 473, #70 Exhibit 474, #71 Exhibit 475, #72 Exhibit 476, #73 Exhibit 477, #74 Exhibit 478, #75 Exhibit 479, #76 Exhibit 480, #77 Exhibit 481, #78 Exhibit 482, #79 Exhibit 483, #80 Exhibit 484, #81 Exhibit 485, #82 Exhibit 486, #83 Exhibit 487, #84 Exhibit 488, #85 Exhibit 489, #86 Exhibit 490, #87 Exhibit 491, #88 Exhibit 492, #89 Exhibit 493, #90 Exhibit 494, #91 Exhibit 495, #92 Exhibit 496, #93 Exhibit 497, #94 Exhibit 498, #95 Exhibit 510, #96 Exhibit 511, #97 Exhibit 513, #98 Exhibit 514, #99 Exhibit 515, #100 Exhibit 516, #101 Exhibit 517, #102 Exhibit 518, #103 Exhibit 519, #104 Exhibit 520, #105 Exhibit 521, #106 Exhibit 522, #107 Exhibit 523, #108 Exhibit 541, #109 Exhibit 542, #110 Exhibit 543, #111 Exhibit 544)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Daphna A. Waxman in Support re: #625 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 500, #2 Exhibit 500.01 - 500.28, #3 Exhibit 501, #4 Exhibit 501.01 - 501.16, #5 Exhibit 502, #6 Exhibit 502.01 - 502.08, #7 Exhibit 503, #8 Exhibit 503.01 - 503.25, #9 Exhibit 504, #10 Exhibit 504.01 - 504.42, #11 Exhibit 505, #12 Exhibit 506, #13 Exhibit 506.01 - 506.123, #14 Exhibit 507, #15 Exhibit 507.01 - 507.20, #16 Exhibit 508, #17 Exhibit 508.01 - 508.37, #18 Exhibit 509, #19 Exhibit 509.01 - 509.91)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION for Summary Judgment against all Defendants. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Responses due by 10/18/2022Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Michael K. Kellogg in Support re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Kellogg, Michael)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ***SELECTED PARTIES***RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Kellogg, Michael)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #621 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Kellogg, Michael)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #620 .(Kellogg, Michael)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 620 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #616 Letter filed by Ripple Labs Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 12/9/2022., Responses due by 9/22/2022, Replies due by 11/15/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/12/2022) (kv)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 619 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew Ceresney dated September 12, 2022 re: #617 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 9, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 9, 2022 re: Motion to Seal. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Dkt. 608, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Dkt. 610, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Dkt. 612, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Dkt. 613, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Dkt. 614, #6 Exhibit Ex. F Dkt. 609, #7 Exhibit Ex. G Dkt. 611, #8 Exhibit Ex. H Dkt. 615)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 617 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 9, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Dkt. 608, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Dkt. 610, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Dkt. 612, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Dkt. 613, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Dkt. 614, #6 Exhibit Ex. F Dkt. 609, #7 Exhibit Ex. G Dkt. 611, #8 Exhibit Ex. H Dkt. 615).(Guerrier, Pascale)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 616 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J Ceresney dated September 8, 2022 re: Deadlines for Sealing Applications. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #535 MOTION to Preclude . Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Sylvester, Mark)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #540 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Zornberg, Lisa)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #537 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #532 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Kylie Chiseul Kim in Support re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5.. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - Mergers in Regulated Industries The Uses and Abuses of Event Studies)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Kim, Chiseul)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Figel, Reid)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Bradley E. Oppenheimer in Support re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1.. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J - ECF No. 173-3 (Def. Rule 16 Disclosure), U.S. v. Sayre, No. 05-cr-00198 (C.D. Cal. July 15, 2008), #2 Exhibit K - ECF No. 225 (Trial Tr.), U.S. v. Sayre, No. 05-cr-00198 (C.D. Cal. Aug. 21, 2008), #3 Exhibit L - ECF No. 58, SEC v. Telegram, No. 19-cv-09439 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 6, 2020))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 607 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Benjamin Hanauer dated 08/26/2022 re: #601 LETTER MOTION to Seal / Letter Motion to Redact Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Responses addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 19, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Hanauer, Benjamin)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting #605 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/25/2022) (kv)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 605 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Reply in Further Support of SEC's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated August 24, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated August 19, 2022 re: Redactions to Daubert Opposition Papers. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Stewart, Ladan)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 603 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated August 19, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 19, 2022 re: Redaction of Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Responses. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #601 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 601 LETTER MOTION to Seal / Letter Motion to Redact Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Responses addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 19, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 600 REPLY re: Objection to Orders Compelling the SEC To Produce Privileged Internal Communications. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
August 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER granting #583 Letter Motion for Leave to Serve Two Non-Party Subpoenas. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Kylie Chiseul Kim in Opposition re: #535 MOTION to Preclude .. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Kellogg, Michael)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #537 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #535 MOTION to Preclude . Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Kellogg, Michael)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #532 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Sylvester, Mark)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Sylvester, Mark)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Mark R. Sylvester in Opposition re: #540 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Sylvester, Mark)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #540 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Sylvester, Mark)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Opposition re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Stewart, Ladan)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #586 .(Stewart, Ladan)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 588 DECLARATION of Matthew C. Solomon in Opposition re: #575 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 13, 2022 Order, #2 Exhibit B - April 11, 2022 Order, #3 Exhibit C - July 12, 2022 Order, #4 Exhibit D - W. Hinman Speech, #5 Exhibit E - April 6, 2021 Court Conference Transcript, #6 Exhibit F - SEC Motion to Quash W. Hinman Deposition, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of W. Hinman, #8 Exhibit H - July 15, 2021 Court Conference Transcript, #9 Exhibit I - August 21, 2021 Court Conference Transcript, #10 Exhibit J - SEC Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Clarification, #11 Exhibit K - June 7, 2022 Court Conference Transcript, #12 Exhibit L - SEC Motion to Strike Fourth Affirmative Defense, #13 Exhibit M - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of W. Hinman, #14 Exhibit N - Declaration of W. Hinman in SEC v. LBRY).(Solomon, Matthew)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 587 RESPONSE re: #575 Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #584 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Brief due by 8/30/2022., Motions due by 9/9/2022., Responses due by 9/16/2022) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/9/2022) (kv)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 585 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated August 8, 2022 re: #583 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File /leave to serve non-party subpoenas on behalf of Defendants Ripple Labs, Inc., Brad Garlinghouse and Chris Larsen addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated 8/3/22. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 584 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated August 8, 2022 re: Deadlines for Sealing Applications. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 583 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File /leave to serve non-party subpoenas on behalf of Defendants Ripple Labs, Inc., Brad Garlinghouse and Chris Larsen addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated 8/3/22. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 581 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael A. Hanin dated July 28, 2022. Document filed by Third-Party A..(Hanin, Michael)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ***EX-PARTE***Exhibit List // Exhibit A. Document filed by MoneyGram International, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #579 .(Masella, Jessica)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 579 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jessica Ann Masella dated July 28, 2022. Document filed by MoneyGram International, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 578 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 28, 2022 re: #561 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Letter Motion to Redact Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Motions addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 22, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER granting #571 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/28/2022) (kv)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 576 DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Support re: #575 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7).(Stewart, Ladan)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Objection to Orders Compelling the SEC To Produce Privileged Internal Communications. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ladan Stewart to RE-FILE Document #574 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Use the event type Objection (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (tp)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 574 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stewart Declaration and Exhibits).(Stewart, Ladan) Modified on 7/27/2022 (tp).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 573 BRIEF re: Objections to Orders Compelling the SEC to Produce Privileged Internal Communications. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER: denying #489 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. The Court has reviewed the letters addressing a request by Movants, six individual XRP holders, for leave to file an amicus brief concerning a motion to exclude one of the experts put forward by the Securities and Exchange Commission (the "SEC"). See ECF Nos. 489, 555, 556, 567. On October 4, 2021, the Court permitted Movants "to act as amici curiae" and "brief legal issues relevant to the case as approved in advance by the Court." ECF No. 372 at 11. In that order, the Court stated that "such assistance will be most beneficial during briefing on dispositive motions." Id. Here, the Court finds that it would not benefit from Movants' assistance in evaluating the qualifications of the SEC's expert Movants may file an application to brief their concerns regarding the SEC's expert, and other relevant and helpful matters, with respect to the parties' contemplated motions for summary judgment. Accordingly, Movant's request is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/26/2022) (ama)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 571 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply Letter in support of Sealing Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 26, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Letter).(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 570 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Securities and Exchange Commission dated July 25, 2022 re: #561 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Letter Motion to Redact Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Motions addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 22, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 25, 2022 re: #565 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 22, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 568 DECLARATION of JOHN E DEATON in Support re: #489 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief regarding Daubert issues related to opinions of Patrick B. Doody addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated 05.21.22.. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, JOHN DEATON TWEETS, #2 Exhibit B, WILLIAM HINMAN EMAILS).(Deaton, John)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from JOHN E DEATON dated July 25, 2022 re: #489 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief regarding Daubert issues related to opinions of Patrick B. Doody addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated 05.21.22. . Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 22, 2022 re: Redactions to Daubert Motion Papers. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32-A, #33 Exhibit 32-B, #34 Exhibit 32-C, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37-A, #40 Exhibit 37-B, #41 Exhibit 37-C, #42 Exhibit 37-D, #43 Exhibit 37-E, #44 Exhibit 37-F, #45 Exhibit 38, #46 Exhibit 39, #47 Exhibit 40, #48 Exhibit 41, #49 Exhibit 42, #50 Exhibit 43, #51 Exhibit 44, #52 Exhibit 45, #53 Exhibit 46, #54 Exhibit 47, #55 Exhibit 48, #56 Exhibit 49, #57 Exhibit 50, #58 Exhibit 51, #59 Exhibit 52, #60 Exhibit 53)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #565 .(Stewart, Ladan)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 565 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 22, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER FOR ALL NON-PARTY RESPONSES TO PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL PARTIES' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: any non-parties that (i) have not already given consent to one of the Parties for their proposed redactions of the non-parties' confidential information appearing in the Daubert Motions; and (ii) seek additional or different redactions, must file, by July 28, 2022, a letter explaining the need for such redactions. If no such letter is received by July 28, 2022, the non-party will have waived their right to object to the Court's ultimate ruling on the Parties' motions to seal or redact the Daubert Motions. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/22/2022) (kv)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #558 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The SEC may file a 20-page opening brief and a 10-page reply brief. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/22/2022) (kv)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 22, 2022 re: Redaction of Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Motions. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Letter re: Redaction of Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Motions, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 561 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Letter Motion to Redact Certain Exhibits to the Daubert Motions addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 22, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Letter Motion - Table of Redacted Daubert Motion Exhibits, #2 Exhibit P - Declaration of Kristina Campbell, #3 Appendix A to Exhibit P - Table of Specific Redactions).(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 560 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew C. Solomon dated July 22, 2022 re: #558 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 21, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 559 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 22, 2022 re: Setting Deadline for Non-Party Sealing Applications. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For all Non-Party Responses to Pending Motions to Seal Parties' Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony).(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 558 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 21, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #484 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; granting in part and denying in part #486 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The SEC is ordered to file amended responses to RFA 319-20 & 342-44 with the term "any person" in lieu of "market participants." The SEC is ordered to file amended responses to RFA 294, with the date "March 29, 2018" in lieu of "April 13, 2018." The SEC is ordered to file amended responses to RFA 263-67 & 273-75, which concerns SEC policy, not individual employee trading data; the SEC must answer what the policy was, not whether that policy was followed or whether employees were granted relief from the policy. The SEC is ordered to file amended responses to RFA 491, 492, & 494 as amended so that the "Ripple October 2013 Presentation" is defined as when "Representatives of Ripple met with members of the SEC and other U.S. regulatory agencies on or about October 29, 2013." The SEC is ordered to file amended responses to the No-Action Letters RFAs, except it does not need to file amended responses to RFA 473, 478, 484, & 488, for which its objections are sustained. The SEC's objections with respect to RFA 255 & 260-62 are sustained. The parties are further ordered to meet and confer to reach agreement on the Authenticity of Recorded Remarks RFAs. As proposed by Defendants, such agreement might entail creating downloaded versions of the remarks for purposes of authentication and preservation. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 556 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 7, 2022 re: Response in Opposition to Motion to File Amicus Brief re: Daubert issues. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q).(Stewart, Ladan)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 555 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated June 10, 2022 re: Response to Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief regarding Daubert issues (Public Refiling of ECF Nos. 503 and 503-1 in Response to Court Order ECF No. 554). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - L Zornberg Email to SEC).(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letters proposing redactions filed on July 15, 2022, ECF Nos. 550-53, and finds them to be "narrowly tailored" to preserve the "higher values" identified by the parties, see Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 124 (2d Cir. 2006). Accordingly, by July 19, 2022, the parties shall publicly file versions of the SEC's opposition to Movants' request (the "SEC Letter"), ECF No. 509, Defendants' response to the SEC Letter (the "Defendants' Letter"), ECF No. 503, and the exhibits submitted in support of both letters, ECF Nos. 509-1- 17, 503-1, that comply with the Court's order dated July 11, 2022, and that include the redactions discussed in ECF Nos. 550- 53. By July 25, 2022, Movants shall file their response to the SEC Letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/18/2022) (jca)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 15, 2022 re: proposed redactions pursuant to D.E. 529. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #529 .(Stewart, Ladan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 552 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 15, 2022 re: proposed redactions pursuant to D.E. 529. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 15, 2022 Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed redactions)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #550 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 550 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit O to SEC Letter {ECF 509} addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 15, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Kylie Chiseul Kim in Support re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opening Expert Report of Expert No. 5, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript of Expert No. 5, #3 Exhibit C - Expert Rebuttal Report of Daniel Fischel, #4 Exhibit D - Supplemental Deposition Transcript of Expert No. 5, #5 Exhibit E - Supplemental Expert Report of Expert No. 5, #6 Exhibit F - Supplemental Expert Report of M. Laurentius Marais, #7 Exhibit G - Exhibit 16, Supplemental Deposition of Expert No. 5)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Kim, Chiseul)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Pascale Guerrier in Support re: #535 MOTION to Preclude .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 45)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #546 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. / Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Figel, Reid)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 5. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Figel, Reid)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Bradley E. Oppenheimer in Support re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opening Expert Report of Expert No. 1, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript of Expert No. 1, #3 Exhibit C - Expert Rebuttal Report of Kristina Shampanier, #4 Exhibit D - Opening Expert Report of Allen Ferrell, #5 Exhibit E - Opening Expert Report of Carol Osler, #6 Exhibit F - Expert Rebuttal Report of Expert No. 1, #7 Exhibit G - Second Amended Expert Rebuttal Report of Expert No. 1, #8 Exhibit H - Opening Expert Report of Peter Adriaens, #9 Exhibit I - Opening Expert Report of Yesha Yadav)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #543 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. / Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 1. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Oppenheimer, Bradley)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Christopher S. Ford in Support re: #540 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Expert 4, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript of Expert 4, #3 Exhibit C - GAO Report, #4 Exhibit D - Neha Narula Tweet, #5 Exhibit E - Sai Article, #6 Exhibit F - Troncoso Article, #7 Exhibit G - Expert 4 Publication, #8 Exhibit H - SUERF Policy Note, #9 Exhibit I - XRP Chat Thread)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Ford, Christopher)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #540 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. / Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Zornberg, Lisa)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 4. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Zornberg, Lisa)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Andrew J. Ceresney in Support re: #537 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of SEC Expert No. 3, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcript of SEC Expert No. 3, #3 Exhibit 3 - Article by SEC Expert No. 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ferrell Rebuttal Report)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #537 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. / Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 3. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #535 MOTION to Preclude . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Preclude . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Anna R. Gressel in Support re: #532 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2.. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Expert No. 2, #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert No. 2 Deposition Transcript)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Gressel, Anna)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #532 MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. / Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Preclude / Notice of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of SEC Expert No. 2. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #530 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 531 OPINION & ORDER: By letter motion, the Securities and Exchange Commission ("SEC") argues that the attorney-client privilege protects internal documents related to a June 14, 2018 speech (the "Speech") given by William Hinman, then the Director of the Division of Corporate Finance. This argument was previously raised secondarily, with the SEC primarily asserting the deliberative process privilege. The SEC's motion is DENIED. Consistent with the Court's April 11, 2022 Order, the SEC shall submit the two proposed redactions in Entries 29 and 35 for the Court's in camera review. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/12/2022) (ras)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letters dated July 10 and 11, 2022. ECF Nos. 527-28. Accordingly, 1. By July 12, 2022, as previously ordered, see ECF No. 472, the parties shall file their motions to exclude expert testimony under seal. 2. By July 22, 2022, the parties shall file any motions to seal their motions to exclude expert testimony. If the Court does not receive motions to seal by that date, it shall order the unsealing of the motions to exclude expert testimony. The parties also reminded that they must sufficiently justify all proposed sealings and redactions, even those to which both parties agree, because "bargained-for confidentiality does not overcome the presumption of access to judicial documents." Bernsten v. O'Reilly, 307 F. Supp. 3d 161, 168 (S.D.N.Y. 2018). 3. By July 25, 2022, the parties shall file any oppositions to the sealing motions. ( Motions due by 7/22/2022, Responses due by 7/25/2022) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2022) (ate)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #498 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #508 Letter Motion to Seal. For the foregoing reasons, the parties' motions are GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Specifically, 1) The SEC's request to redact language in the SEC Letter is GRANTED, and Defendants' request to redact the citation to Exhibit O in the SEC Letter is DENIED. 2) The SEC's request to redact language in the Defendants' Letter, with the exception of the redaction of footnote one, is GRANTED. The SEC's request to redact footnote one is DENIED. 3) The SEC's request to seal Exhibits D, E, F, G, and P to the SEC Letter and redact Exhibit B to the SEC Letter and Exhibit 1 to the Defendants' Letter is GRANTED. The SEC's request to seal Exhibits C, H, L, M, N, and Q to the SEC Letter is DENIED. Defendants' request to seal Exhibit O to the SEC Letter is DENIED. By July 15, 2022, the parties may propose narrowly tailored redactions to Exhibits C, H, L, M, N, O, and Q, along with an explanation justifying their redactions. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motions at ECF Nos. 498 and 508. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/11/2022) (kv)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 528 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated July 11, 2022 re: #527 LETTER MOTION to Seal and request for expedited briefing schedule addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 10, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
July 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 527 LETTER MOTION to Seal and request for expedited briefing schedule addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated July 10, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting #523 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #523 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/7/2022) (kv)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #522 Motion for Clayton J. Masterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clayton J. Masterman may appear on behalf of Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting #521 Motion for Chiseul Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Chiseul Kim may appear on behalf of Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #521 AMENDED MOTION for Chiseul Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #522 AMENDED MOTION for Clayton J. Masterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 523 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Daubert Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Securities and Exchange Commission dated July 6, 2022., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Securities and Exchange Commission dated July 6, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 522 AMENDED MOTION for Clayton J. Masterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Masterman, Clayton)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 521 AMENDED MOTION for Chiseul Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Kim, Chiseul)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #519 MOTION for Chiseul Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26367770. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit Not Notarized; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #520 MOTION for Clayton J. Masterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26367869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit Not Notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 520 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Clayton J. Masterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26367869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Masterman, Clayton) Modified on 7/6/2022 (sgz).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 519 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Chiseul Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26367770. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Kim, Chiseul) Modified on 7/6/2022 (sgz).
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 518 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated 6/27/2022 re: Proposed Redactions to Defendants' Letter [ECF 503 and 504]. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 517 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/7/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 516 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2022..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 23, 2022 re: Proposed Redactions to Defendants' Letter [ECF 503 and 504]. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #514 .(Stewart, Ladan)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 514 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 23, 2022 re: Proposed Redactions to Defendants' Letter [ECF 503 and 504]. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendants' response to the Securities and Exchange Commission's (the "SEC's") opposition brief and their letter regarding the sealing of that response. See ECF Nos. 503, 504. Defendants state that they wish to file their entire response on the public docket, but that they filed it under seal because of the Court's pending ruling on the SEC's motion to seal. ECF No. 504. Accordingly, by June 23, 2022, the SEC shall file any proposed redactions to Defendants' response and a letter explaining its proposal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/21/2022) (vfr)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 512 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 17, 2022 re: LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated June 15, 2022 #510 . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 511 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated June 16, 2022 re: D.E. 507. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 (Revised Summary Chart of Entries on SEC Privilege Logs)).(Guerrier, Pascale)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 510 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated June 15th, 2022 re: Defendants Ripple Labs, Bradley Garlinghouse and Christian A. Larsen's response to the SEC's letter motion to seal #508 . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 7, 2022 re: #489 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief regarding Daubert issues related to opinions of Patrick B. Doody addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated 05.21.22. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #508 .(Stewart, Ladan)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 508 LETTER MOTION to Seal SEC's Opposition to Amici Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 14, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER: The Court previously permitted the SEC to submit 10 exemplar documents for in camera review in connection with its motion for partial reconsideration of the Court's January 13, 2022 order. See ECF No. 419. On the basis of attorney-client privilege, the SEC seeks to withhold these and other documents described in Attachment 1 to the SEC's February 17, 2022 motion for partial reconsideration. See ECF No. 429 at 12-18; ECF No. 473 at 2, 5. The Court has reviewed the 10 exemplar documents previously in the context of the deliberative process privilege but has not reviewed any other documents listed in Attachment 1. To facilitate the Court's review of the communications to which the SEC claims the attorney-client privilege applies, by June 16, 2022, the SEC may submit 10 additional documents listed in Attachment 1 for in camera review. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/14/2022) (mml)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #505 Letter Motion to Seal. As set forth in the SEC's motion to seal, selected portions of Exhibit A to Defendants' letter motion at ECF No. 486 may be filed under seal. The motion is granted on an interim basis, and the Court may reconsider its ruling when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 505 LETTER MOTION to Seal Re D.E. 486-1 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated June 10, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 504 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J Ceresney dated June 10, 2022 re: Sealing of Defendants' Response to Amici Letter. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J Ceresney dated June 10, 2022 re: Response to Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief Regarding Daubert Issues. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Email from L Zornberg to SEC)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #502 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER: Accordingly, by June 14, 2022, the SEC shall file a redacted version of the brief and its exhibits, under seal, that redacts information "only to the extent necessary to safeguard information sought to be filed under seal." Individual Practices in Civil Cases, Rule IV.A.ii. By June 14, 2022, the SEC shall also file a letter explaining its proposed redactions and specifying which exhibits it seeks to seal. "To be approved, any redaction or sealing of a court filing must be narrowly tailored to serve whatever purpose justifies the redaction or sealing and must be otherwise consistent with the presumption in favor of public access to judicial documents." Id. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/9/2022) (ks) Modified on 6/9/2022 (ks).
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 501 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated June 9, 2022 re: #498 LETTER MOTION to Seal SEC's Opposition to Amici Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 7, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 500 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated June 8, 2022 re: Letter-Motion clarification. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 7, 2022 re: #489 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief regarding Daubert issues related to opinions of Patrick B. Doody addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated 05.21.22. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #498 .(Stewart, Ladan)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 498 LETTER MOTION to Seal SEC's Opposition to Amici Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated June 7, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 497 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated June 7, 2022 re: #486 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated May 18, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the conference scheduled in this case for 3:00 p.m. is RESCHEDULED for 3:30 p.m. The public is referred to the Order at ECF No. 495 for dial in information, which remains the same. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/7/2022) (mml)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER: A conference is scheduled for Tuesday, June 7, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. ECF No. 493. Members of the public may listen to the proceedings at the following numbers: USA: (877) 226-8215 International: (409) 207-6982 Access Code: 4713826 # Unauthorized recording and rebroadcasting of the conference (e.g., YouTube, Twitch, audio-only streams, etc.) is strictly prohibited. Any unauthorized recordings will be investigated, and anyone found to engage in such behaviors may be subject to criminal sanctions. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/1/2022) (ras)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 494 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated May 31, 2022 re: #486 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated May 18, 2022., #484 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated May 18, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER: A conference is scheduled for Tuesday, June 07, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. to discuss the SEC's renewed assertion of attorney-client privilege as to internal documents related to then-Director Hinmans June 14, 2018 speech. See ECF No. 473. The conference shall take place in Courtroom 23B, Daniel P. Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties are required to comply with the Court's most recent COVID-19 safety guidance, including courtroom and entry protocols. Information about the Court's protocols is available at: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/covid-19-coronavirus. The parties should plan to arrive at least 30 minutes in advance to complete the entry screening process. (Discovery Hearing set for 6/7/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/31/2022) (ras)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 492 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 27, 2022 re: Fee Award. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #490 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #490 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Letter by Amici Curiae addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated May 24, 2022. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 6/7/2022 Replies due by 6/10/2022.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/25/2022) (kv)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 490 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Letter by Amici Curiae addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ladan F. Stewart dated May 24, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
May 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 489 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief regarding Daubert issues related to opinions of Patrick B. Doody addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated 05.21.22. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: 04.27.22 Letter from Attorney Deaton, Amici Counsel to Parties re: information related to amici participation, #2 Exhibit 2: 05.02.22 Reply Letter from Attorney Guerrier, Plaintiff's Counsel to Amici Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3: 05.05.22 Reply Letter from Attorney Zornberg, Defense Counsel to Amici Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4: 05.05.22 Reply Letter from Attorney Deaton, Amici Counsel to Attorney Zornberg, #5 Exhibit 5: 05.10.22 Letter from Amici Counsel to Parties requesting copy of Plaintiff's Expert Report, #6 Exhibit 6: 05.11.22 Email from Attorney Guerrier to Attorney Zornberg designating Plaintiff's Expert's report as confidential, #7 Exhibit 7: 05.11.22 Letter from Attorney Guerrier to Amici Counsel notifying Amici of the SEC's objection, #8 Exhibit 8: 12.20.19 Expert Report of Patrick B. Doody).(Deaton, John)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 488 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated May 18, 2022 re: #476 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply (Re: D.E. 473 & D.E. 474) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated May 3, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Larsen Dep. Tr., #2 Exhibit Ex. B Zagone Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit Ex. C O'Gorman Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit Ex. D July 2021 Hearing Tr.).(Guerrier, Pascale)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated May 18, 2022 re: #476 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply (Re: D.E. 473 & D.E. 474) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated May 3, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Larsen Tr., #2 Exhibit Ex. B. Zagone Tr., #3 Exhibit Ex. C O'Gorman Tr.)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated May 18, 2022. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (SEALED) SEC RFA Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence from L. Zornberg to SEC)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Zornberg, Lisa)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 485 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #486) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated May 18, 2022. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SEC RFA Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence from L. Zornberg to SEC)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Zornberg, Lisa) Modified on 5/19/2022 (kj).(As Per Email Request on 5/19/22 @8:07am).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 484 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated May 18, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (REDACTED) SEC RFA Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence from L. Zornberg to SEC).(Zornberg, Lisa)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #482 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants' anticipated motion may not exceed 7 pages and is due no later than May 23, 2022. The SEC's opposition may not exceed 7 pages and is due within 10 business days of the filing of Defendants' motion (or no later than June 7, 2022). Defendants' reply, if any, may not exceed 4 pages and is due within 7 business days of the SEC's opposition (no later than June 16, 2022). (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 482 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated May 17, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Zornberg, Lisa)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER granting #479 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Any motion for attorneys' fees as described in the Court's April 19, 2022 order, ECF No. 469, is due by May 27, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 480 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated May 13, 2022 re: response to SEC's April 29 letter regarding attorney-client privilege #473 . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hinman Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Hinman Deposition Transcript Excerpts).(Solomon, Matthew)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re motion for attorney's fees addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated May 13, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER granting #476 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The SEC's reply is due by May 18, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 477 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated May 3, 2022 re: #476 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply (Re: D.E. 473 & D.E. 474) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated May 3, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply (Re: D.E. 473 & D.E. 474) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated May 3, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting #474 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants' response to the SEC's letter brief is due by May 13, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 474 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the SEC's letter brief setting forth its assertions that internal documents related to a speech given by a former SEC official, ECF No. #473 are protected from disclosure by the attorney-client privilege addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated May 2, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 473 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated April 29, 2022 re: SEC's Assertion of Attorney-Client Privilege. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letter dated April 22, 2022. ECF No. 471. Accordingly, 1. By July 12, 2022, the parties shall file any motions to exclude expert testimony. By August 9, 2022, the parties shall file their oppositions. By August 30, 2022, the parties shall file replies, if any. Each motion to exclude expert testimony and response will be limited to 15 pages per side. Either party may move the Court to file an omnibus motion and propose an appropriate page length. 2. By September 13, 2022, the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment and Rule 56.1 statements. By October 18, 2022, the parties shall file their oppositions and responses to Rule 56.1 statements. By November 15, 2022, the parties shall file replies, if any. If Defendants choose to file separate motions, their motions and oppositions will be limited to 30 pages, and their replies, if any, will be limited to 15 pages. If Defendants choose to file a joint motion, their motion and opposition will be limited to 75 pages, and their reply, if any, will be limited to 45 pages. The Securities and Exchange Commission's motion and opposition will be limited to 75 pages, and its reply will be limited to 45 pages. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 9/13/2022., Responses due by 10/18/2022, Replies due by 11/15/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/28/2022) (tg)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 471 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated April 22, 2022 re: briefing schedule for summary judgment motions and motions to exclude the testimony of experts. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER granting #467 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/19/2022) (jca)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER denying #439 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Defendants' motion to strike Dr. Metz's supplemental report is DENIED. Expert discovery is reopened until May 13, 2022, to re-depose Dr. Metz as to the analysis in his supplemental report and to permit the filing of any supplemental report by Defendants responding to Dr. Metz's report. The SEC is ordered to pay Defendants for reasonable expenses incurred in filing their motion to strike and re-deposing Dr. Metz. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and reach agreement on a reasonable fee award. If the parties cannot reach agreement, Defendants may accept 10 hours at the average hourly rate for counsel who worked on this motion after removing the highest and lowest hourly rate, plus four hours for Dr. Metz's deposition. In the alternative, any motion for attorneys' fees shall be filed by May 13, 2022. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to deny the motion at ECF No. 439. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/19/2022) (ras)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER denying #424 LETTER MOTION for Conference re SEC Privilege Assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated February 10, 2022. Garlinghouse's motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 424. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/19/2022) (ras)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to January 13, 2022 and April 11, 2022 Orders addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated April 15, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated April 15, 2022 re: Discovery Pursuant to D.E. 452. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 OPINION & ORDER re: #429 LETTER MOTION for Discovery re: Partial Reconsideration and Clarification addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated February 17, 2022, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The SEC's motion for reconsideration is DENIED and its motion for clarification is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 429. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/11/2022) (ras)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #454 Letter, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has reviewed the SEC's proposed redactions. The SEC's request is GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/11/2022) (ras)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated April 6, 2022 re: Amended Declaration of V. Szczepanik. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of V. Szczepanik).(Guerrier, Pascale)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the SEC's letter requesting leave to redact portions of four sets of handwritten notes by SEC staff. The SEC is ORDERED to submit its proposed redactions for in camera review by April 8, 2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/5/2022) (ras)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated April 4, 2022 re: response to the SEC's request for leave to redact portions of handwritten notes by SEC staff (ECF No. #454 ).. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting #457 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The SEC is directed to produce the redacted documents for Defendants' assessment by March 30, 2022. Defendants' response is due April 4, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to the SEC's request for leave to redact notes addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated March 25, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting #453 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Individual Defendants' request is GRANTED. The Individual Defendants' answers are due no later than April 8, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 24, 2022 re: #439 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 11, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 454 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 23, 2022 re: Leave to Redact Notes Pursuant to 1/13/22 Order (Dkt. 413). Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Szczepanik Declaration, #2 Seaman Declaration, #3 Ingram Declaration).(Guerrier, Pascale)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #46 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum and Matthew C. Solomon dated March 23, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen..(Flumenbaum, Martin)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting #449 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The SEC's request is GRANTED. The SEC shall inform the Court of its position on whether any additional discovery is required within a week of the filing of the Individual Defendants' answers. The parties are directed to meet and confer as to a briefing schedule for summary judgment motions. The parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule for the Court's approval no later than one week after the SEC's submission. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 21, 2022 re: #449 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 21, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated March 21, 2022 re: SEC's March 14 Letter (ECF No. #445 ). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 21, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert Moye dated March 18, 2022 re: #439 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 11, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Metz deposition transcript pages).(Moye, Robert)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting #446 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants' response to the SEC's letter, ECF No. 445, is due by March 21, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to SEC's letter regarding Pending Motions in Light of D.E. 441 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated March 15, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated March 14, 2022 re: Pending Motions in Light of D.E. 441. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Sylvester, Mark)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER: In light of the Court's March 11, 2022 order denying Defendant Larsen's and Defendant Garlinghouse's motions to dismiss, the parties are directed to meet and confer to determine what, if any, additional discovery is necessary. The parties shall file a joint letter by March 23, 2022, informing the Court of any additional discovery they intend to seek. The letter should propose a schedule for the efficient completion of this discovery. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/14/22022) (ras)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #442 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The SEC's response to Defendants' motion is due by March 18, 2022. Defendants' reply, if any, is due by March 24, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike Dr. Metz's Supplemental Expert Report addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated March 14, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER denying #105 Motion to Dismiss; denying #110 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, the Individual Defendants' motions are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 105 and 110. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/11/2022) (kv)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER denying #128 Motion to Strike docket entry and document #128 MOTION to Strike Document No. #51 Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #51 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Ripple Labs Inc. from the record. For the foregoing reasons, the SEC's motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 128. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/11/2022) (kv)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 11, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Expert Report of Albert Metz, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Opening Expert Report of Albert Metz, #3 Exhibit C - Expert Rebuttal Report of Albert Metz, #4 Exhibit D - Expert Rebuttal Report of M. Laurentius Marais, #5 Exhibit E - Expert Rebuttal Report of Daniel R. Fischel).(Kellogg, Michael)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #435 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Christian A. Larsen. Attorney Justin David Ward terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/28/2022) (ras)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon and Nowell D. Bamberger dated February 28, 2022 re: #424 LETTER MOTION for Conference re SEC Privilege Assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated February 10, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated February 25, 2022 re: #429 LETTER MOTION for Discovery re: Partial Reconsideration and Clarification addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated February 17, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hinman Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - SEC Motion to Quash, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt from Hinman Depo Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - SEC v. LBRY - Motion Hearing).(Solomon, Matthew)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Ward, Justin)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated February 24, 2022 re: #424 LETTER MOTION for Conference re SEC Privilege Assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated February 10, 2022. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Stewart, Ladan)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER: denying #431 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/23/2022) (ama)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated 02/22/2022 re: Response to the SEC's Letter Motion Seeking Leave to Submit a Sur-sur-reply. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Benjamin Hanauer dated 02/22/2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Sur-Sur-Reply).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER re: #428 Letter, filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. The Court has reviewed Defendants Ripple Labs, Inc. and Christian A. Larsen's letter and proposed redactions to Exhibit E. See ECF Nos. 428, 428-1. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to unseal ECF Nos. 106, 108-1, 108-2, 130-1, 130-2, 131, 172, 179-1, 179-2, 183, and 222. The Clerk of Court is further directed to strike ECF No. 179-3 from the docket. The document at ECF No. 428-1 shall be considered ECF No. 179-3. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/18/2022) (kv)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 LETTER MOTION for Discovery re: Partial Reconsideration and Clarification addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated February 17, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Stewart, Ladan)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Martin Flumenbaum and Andrew J. Ceresney dated February 17, 2022 re: Response to the Court's 2/3/22 Order. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Proposed Redaction).(Flumenbaum, Martin)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting #425 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The SEC shall file its response to Defendants' letter motion (ECF No. 424) on February 24, 2022. At that time, the SEC is further ORDERED to email to chambers the challenged "Estabrook Notes" for in camera review. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated February 11, 2022 re: #425 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Garlinghouse's Motion to Compel (D.E. 424) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated February 11, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Garlinghouse's Motion to Compel (D.E. 424) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated February 11, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 LETTER MOTION for Conference re SEC Privilege Assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated February 10, 2022. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2022.01.20 SEC Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit B 2022.01.20 Ltr. from SEC, #3 Exhibit C 2022.01.28 Ltr. from Defendants, #4 Exhibit D 2022.02.02 Ltr. from SEC, #5 Exhibit E 2018.11.14 Email from B. Garlinghouse, #6 Exhibit F 2021.09.20 Garlinghouse Dep. Tr., #7 Exhibit G 2018.08.20 SEC Memo).(Solomon, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #128 MOTION to Strike Document No. #51 Motion to Strike Defendant Ripple Labs, Inc.'s Fourth Affirmative Defense. SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kellogg, Michael)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER denying #104 Letter Motion to Seal; denying #170 Letter Motion to Seal; denying #221 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #225 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #229 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motions are GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Specifically, 1) Larsen's and Ripple's motions to seal the Legal Memos are DENIED. By February 17, 2022, Larsen and Ripple shall propose specific redactions that comply with the Court's Order. If they have not done so by that date, the Court shall direct the Clerk of Court to (a) unseal the legal memorandum at ECF Nos. 108-1, 130-1, and 179-1 and replace it with the redacted version at ECF No. 178-1, and (b) unseal the legal memorandum at ECF Nos. 108-2, 130-2, and 179-2 and replace it with the redacted version at 178-2. 2) Larsen's motion to seal Exhibit E is DENIED. By February 17, 2022, Larsen shall submit a letter to the Court explaining why Exhibit E should be sealed and propose specific redactions that comply with the Court's Order. If he has not done so by that date, the Court shall direct the Clerk of Court to unseal Exhibit E at ECF No. 179-3. 3) Larsen's motion to file redacted versions of the Larsen Memo, Larsen Reply, and SEC Opposition is DENIED. By February 17, 2022, Larsen shall propose specific redactions that comply with the Court's Order. If he has not done so by that date, the Court shall direct the Clerk of Court to unseal the Larsen Memo, ECF No. 106, the Larsen Reply, ECF No. 222, and the SEC Opposition, ECF No. 183. 4) Ripple's motion to file redacted versions of the Ripple Opposition and the SEC Memo is DENIED. By February 17, 2022, Ripple shall propose specific redactions that comply with the Court's Order. If it has not done so by that date, the Court shall direct the Clerk of Court to unseal the Ripple Opposition, ECF No. 127, and the SEC Memo, ECF No. 131. 5) Garlinghouse's motion to seal Exhibits K, L, and M is GRANTED. 6) The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the documents at ECF Nos. 172-1, 179-4, and 179-5. 7) Ripple's motion for leave to file a sur-reply is GRANTED. By February 9, 2022, Ripple shall file its sur-reply. 8) The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 104, 170, 221, 225, and 229. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/3/2022) (kv)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Surreplies due by 2/9/2022. (kv)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated January 27, 2022 re: Response to the SEC's notice of supplemental authority (ECF No. 420). Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated January 27, 2022 re: Supplemental Authority re SEC's Motion to Strike Ripple's Fourth Affirmative Defense. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Sylvester, Mark)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting in part #416 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part #417 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The SEC's request is granted in part. The SEC may file any motion for reconsideration by February 17, 2022, and the Defendants may file their response by February 25, 2022. No reply briefs are permitted. Briefs shall be limited to ten pages (double-spaced) and the publicly-filed versions should be minimally redacted. The SEC may submit 10 additional documents for in camera review, along with its motion. The deadline for either party to file an objection to District Judge Torres from the Court's January 13, 2022 Opinion & Order is stayed until 14 days from a decision on the motion for reconsideration. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated January 24, 2022 re: #416 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated January 21, 2022. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated January 21, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated January 21, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #414 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Christian A. Larsen. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney Robin Linsenmayer terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/18/2022) (js)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen..(Linsenmayer, Robin)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 OPINION & ORDER re: #290 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions [REDACTED] addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021, filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021, filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. Defendants' motion is GRANTED in part as to Parts A, C-F, H-K, N, and P of Entry 1 of Appendix A, and GRANTED in full as to Entry 9 of Appendix A. To the extent the SEC believes discrete portions of the notes in Entry 1 express the notetakers' own thinking or reflect deliberations or communications among SEC staff, the SEC may seek leave for limited redactions. Defendants' motion is otherwise DENIED. The SEC is further ordered to review its privilege log and produce, in full or in part, any documents previously withheld based on the privilege that would be inconsistent with this order. Respectfully, the Clerk of Court is directed to grant in part and deny in part the motions at ECF Nos. 289 and 290. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/13/2022) (ras)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting #98 Letter Motion to Seal. In light of the Court's decisions on the merits of Defendants' motions at ECF Nos. 59 and 67, Defendants' motion to seal is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting #410 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert discovery shall be completed by February 28, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Agreed Motion) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Benjamin J. Hanauer dated January 12, 2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A (proposed order)).(Hanauer, Benjamin)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael K. Kellogg dated January 10, 2022 re: Response to the SEC's notice of supplemental authority (ECF No. 408). Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated January 6, 2022 re: Supplemental Authority re SEC's Motion to Strike Ripple's Fourth Affirmative Defense. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - SEC v. Fife).(Sylvester, Mark)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER granting #406 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' request is GRANTED. The parties may conduct one final expert deposition on January 19, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 406 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Take One Expert Deposition on January 19, 2022 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated December 10, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order).(Sylvester, Mark)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 405 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated December 8, 2021 re: Second Circuit's decision in NRDC v. EPA #403 . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated December 8, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Stewart, Ladan)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER with respect to #289 Letter Motion for Conference re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. On November 29, 2021, the Court of Appeals issued a decision in Nat. Res. Def. Council v. U.S. Env't Prot. Agency, No. 20-cv-422, 2021 WL 5549405 (2d Cir. Nov. 29, 2021), addressing the scope of the deliberative process privilege. In light of this decision, by December 8, 2021, the parties shall simultaneously file letter briefs no longer than three pages to supplement their arguments concerning Defendants' motion to compel, ECF No. 289. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/3/2021) (tg)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #370 Letter Motion. Ripple's search of its recorded meetings has been inadequate under the circumstances. While the Court recognizes that a human review of the recordings may be unreasonable, a reasonable search could include automated transcriptions of recordings (similar to the common technology used to transcribe voicemail messages) and the use of search terms. Accordingly, Ripple is ORDERED to conduct a reasonable search of the relevant video and audio-taped recordings and produce responsive documents. Because Ripple represents that it has more than 4,000 recordings, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer to determine whether there are particular time periods when recordings are most likely to be responsive to the SEC's discovery demands. For example, meetings in the weeks preceding dates of significance may generate more probative material than meetings held at other times. Similarly, cross-references with the calendars for the Individual Defendants or other key employees may identify meetings of significance. In light of the close of discovery, Ripple is order to undertake such efforts without delay. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting #398 Letter Motion to Seal. As set forth in Defendants' motion to seal, the following documents may be filed under seal: Exhibits A and B to Defendants' October 22, 2021 letter response to the SEC's October 15, 2021 filing (ECF Nos. 399-1, 399-2). The motion is granted on an interim basis, and the Court may reconsider its ruling when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 400 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated October 22, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. [REDACTED]. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SEC 9/2/2021 Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit B - 10/23/2018 Law Firm Memo).(Solomon, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated October 22, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SEC 9/2/2021 Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit B - 10/23/2018 Law Firm Memo)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #398 .(Solomon, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 398 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated October 22, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #326 Letter Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #367 Letter Motion for Conference re: #326 LETTER MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 31, 2021., #367 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Seek a Protective Order against Excessive Requests for Admission addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert Moye dated September 30, 2021. Defendants' motion to compel is granted as to Ripple Interrogatory Nos. 2 and 11 and denied without prejudice as to Larsen Interrogatory No. 5. As to the rest of the interrogatories at issue, Defendants' motion is granted insofar as the SEC is ordered to supplement any responses that are unverified because they incorporate or refer to unverified statements, and to supplement any responses that incorporate by reference its responses to other interrogatories in accordance with Rule 33(b)(3). The SEC's motion for a protective order is granted as to the Sixth Set of Requests and denied as to the Fourth and Fifth Sets of Requests. Unless otherwise provided in this Order, the SEC must respond to these discovery demands within 45 days. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to grant in part and deny in part the motions at ECF No. 326 and 367. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/21/2021) (jca)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting #389 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties agree to extend the deadline to exchange expert rebuttal reports to November 12, 2021. They dispute, however, whether all expert discovery (including depositions) should be completed by December 10, 2021 (giving the parties 18 business days to conduct depositions) or January 14, 2022 (giving the parties 36 business days). The parties acknowledge that there are likely at least 14 expert witnesses that will be deposed. The Defendants believe these depositions can reasonably be conducted within 18 business days given the resources available to the SEC. They further argue that any further delay in resolving this case will cause serious harm to the interests of the Defendants and XRP holders. While the Court recognizes that both parties have dedicated substantial resources to prosecute this case, given the pending motions to dismiss and strike, and the previous adjournment of any deadline to file a motion for summary judgment, the additional time sought by the SEC will not affect the schedule to resolve this case. Rather, the additional time sought by the SEC will allow both sides to complete the outstanding fact discovery and properly prepare for expert depositions. Accordingly, the SEC's application is GRANTED. Expert discovery will be completed on January 14, 2022, with rebuttal reports exchanged by November 12, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER denying #392 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. The XRP Holders' request to submit a statement with respect to their interest in the scheduling of discovery is denied. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Meredith Richardson Dearborn on behalf of Christian A. Larsen. New Address: Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, 535 Mission St., 24th Fl, San Francisco, California, USA 94105, 628-432-5100..(Dearborn, Meredith)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting #380 Letter Motion to Seal. As set forth in Defendant Ripple's motion to seal, the following documents may be filed under seal: (i) redacted portions of the SEC's October 1, 2021 letter motion to compel recordings of Ripple meetings (ECF No. 369); (ii) exhibits the SEC filed under seal in support thereof (ECF No. 369-1 - 369-9); (iii) redacted portions of Defendant Ripple's October 8, 2021 letter in response to the motion to compel (ECF No. 378); and (iv) exhibits Defendant Ripple filed under seal in support thereof (ECF No. 378-1 - 378-3). The motion is granted on an interim basis, and the Court may reconsider its ruling when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 392 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John E. Deaton dated 10/19/2021. Document filed by Jordan Deaton, James LaMonte, Mya LaMonte, Tyler LaMonte, Mitchell McKenna, Kristiana Warner..(Deaton, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robin Linsenmayer on behalf of Christian A. Larsen. New Address: Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, 535 Mission St., 24th Fl, San Francisco, CA, USA 94105, 628-432-5117..(Linsenmayer, Robin)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Ceresney dated 10/18/21 re: Opposing Letter Motion filed at ECF 389 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Respect to Rebuttal Report Date and Expert Discovery Deadline. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Ceresney, Andrew)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Rebuttal Report Date and Expert Discovery Deadline addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated October 15, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Sylvester, Mark)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 388 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated October 15, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 14, 2021 re: #380 LETTER MOTION to Seal (i) redacted portions of the SECs 10/1/21 letter-motion to compel, (ii) the exhibits the SEC filed under seal in support thereof, (iii) the redacted portions of Ripples 10/8/21 letter in response to the Motion to Compel and t . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 14, 2021 re: #380 LETTER MOTION to Seal (i) redacted portions of the SECs 10/1/21 letter-motion to compel, (ii) the exhibits the SEC filed under seal in support thereof, (iii) the redacted portions of Ripples 10/8/21 letter in response to the Motion to Compel and t . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated October 13, 2021 re: #370 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Sylvester, Mark)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated October 13, 2021 re: #369 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Sylvester, Mark)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated October 12, 2021 re: #367 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Seek a Protective Order against Excessive Requests for Admission addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert Moye dated September 30, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Sylvester, Mark)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated October 12, 2021 re: #367 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Seek a Protective Order against Excessive Requests for Admission addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert Moye dated September 30, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Sylvester, Mark)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 381 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew C. Solomon and Martin Flumenbaum dated October 12, 2021 re: response to the SEC's notice of supplemental authority in opposition to the Individual Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (related document #375 ). Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen..(Solomon, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 LETTER MOTION to Seal (i) redacted portions of the SECs 10/1/21 letter-motion to compel, (ii) the exhibits the SEC filed under seal in support thereof, (iii) the redacted portions of Ripples 10/8/21 letter in response to the Motion to Compel and the exhibits filed under seal in support thereof addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated 10/8/21. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 379 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated 10/8/21 re: #369 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Guerrier Email Aug. 26, 2021 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit B- Guerrier Email Sept. 21, 2021, #3 Exhibit C- Gulay Emails Sept. 9, 28, 2021, #4 Exhibit D- Garlinghouse Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit E -Ripple Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)).(Ceresney, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated 10/8/21 re: #369 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guerrier Email Aug. 26, 2021, #2 Exhibit Garlinghouse Transcript, #3 Exhibit Ripple Transcript)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #358 Letter filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is GRANTED. The SEC shall submit the two documents related to the SEC's meetings with law firms and the email chain for in camera review, along with a submission explaining its privilege assertions for each of those documents, no later than October 15, 2021. The SEC shall file a redacted version of its submission on the public docket. Defendants' response is due no later than October 22, 2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/7/2021) (ras)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated October 7, 2021 re: #367 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Seek a Protective Order against Excessive Requests for Admission addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert Moye dated September 30, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 09/27/2021 Email from B. Oppenheimer to R. Moye, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Sixth Set of Requests for Admission).(Kellogg, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mark R. Sylvester dated October 7, 2021 re: Supplemental Authority re Individual Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #371 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #369 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. Defendant Ripple's request is GRANTED. Defendant may respond to the SEC's letter motion (ECF No. 369) and file a motion to seal, if any, no later than October 8, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #368 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated October 1, 2021. Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants may respond to the SEC's letter motion (ECF No. 367) no later than October 7, 2021. (Responses due by 10/7/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/4/2021) (ras) Modified on 10/4/2021 (ras).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER denying #122 Motion to Intervene. For the reasons stated above, Movants' motion to intervene is DENIED. Movants shall be permitted to act as amici curiae, as described in this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 122. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/4/2021) (kv)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #369 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated October 4, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Gulay Email Sept. 9, 2021, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Waxman Email Sept. 9, 2021, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Gulay Email Sept. 9, 2021, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Gulay Email Sept. 9, 2021, #6 Exhibit Ex. F Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit Ex. G Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit Ex. H Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit Ex. I Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit Ex. J Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit Ex. K Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit Ex. L Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit Ex. M Filed Under Seal).(Guerrier, Pascale)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated October 1, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Guerrier Email Sept. 8, 2021, #2 Exhibit Ex. F Garlinghouse Tr. Dec. 12, 2017, #3 Exhibit Ex. G Kanaan Tr. April 10, 2018, #4 Exhibit Ex. H Beard Tr. Oct. 4, 2018, #5 Exhibit Ex. I Will Tr. Dec. 11, 2017, #6 Exhibit Ex. J Garlinghouse Tr. Oct. 4, 2016, #7 Exhibit Ex. K Garlinghouse Tr. Dec. 14, 2017, #8 Exhibit Ex. L Garlinghouse Tr. July 10, 2018, #9 Exhibit Ex. M Garlinghouse Dep. Tr.)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated October 1, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Seek a Protective Order against Excessive Requests for Admission addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert Moye dated September 30, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Moye, Robert)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/31/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/31/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2021..(Moya, Goretti)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated September 28, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Summary Chart of Documents Submitted by SEC for In Camera Review).(Solomon, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #364) - LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated September 28, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Summary Chart of Documents Submitted by SEC for In Camera Review).(Solomon, Matthew) Modified on 9/29/2021 (ldi).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated September 27, 2021 re: Response to September 24, 2021 Letter from Matthew C. Solomon. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #359 Letter Motion to Seal. As set forth in the SEC's motion to seal, the following documents may be filed under seal: portions of Exhibit C to the SEC's letter opposing Defendants' motion to compel interrogatory responses (ECF No. 344-2). The motion is granted on an interim basis, and the Court may reconsider its ruling when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting #353 Letter Motion to Seal. As set forth in Defendant Ripple's motion to seal, the following documents may be filed under seal: certain exhibits the SEC filed under seal in support of its opposition to Defendants' motion to compel interrogatory responses (ECF Nos. 344-1, 344-2). The motion is granted on an interim basis, and the Court may reconsider its ruling when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 359 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated September 24, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Sylvester, Mark)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 358 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated September 24, 2021 Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse..(Solomon, Matthew)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #356 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The SEC may file its motion to seal no later than September 24, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re Motion to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated September 22, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 355 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 21, 2021 re: #353 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated September 16, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER: Defendants' request for documents reflecting the SEC's trading preclearance decisions with respect to SEC employees' transactions in bitcoin, ether, or XRP, and annual certifications concerning SEC employees' XRP holdings is DENIED. The SEC is directed to provide Defendants any documentation supporting SEC counsel's statement during the August 25, 2021 meet and confer that, after the formal order of investigation was issued as to Ripple on March 9, 2019, SEC employees could no longer trade XRP. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/21/2021) (ras)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 353 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated September 16, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Kellogg, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 352 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated September 15, 2021 re: #326 LETTER MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 31, 2021. . Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ladan F. Stewart dated September 14, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Stewart, Ladan)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 350 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 10, 2021 re: #343 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated September 7, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 10, 2021 re: #343 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated September 7, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER denying as moot #320 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. In light of the SEC's letter at ECF No. 346, this application is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the parallel motion at ECF No. 319. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #343 Letter Motion to Seal. As set forth in Defendant Ripple's motion to seal, the following documents may be filed under seal: (i) certain redacted portions of the SEC's August 30, 2021 letter-motion to compel certain recordings of internal Ripple meetings (ECF No. 319); (ii) certain of the exhibits the SEC filed under seal in support thereof (ECF Nos. 319-1319-4); (iii) the redacted portions of Ripple's September 7, 2021 letter in response to the SEC Letter-Motion (ECF No. 339); and (iv) the exhibits filed under seal in support thereof (ECF Nos. 339-1339-8). The motion is granted on an interim basis, and the Court may reconsider its ruling when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 10, 2021 re: #320 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated August 30, 2021., #319 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated August 30, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated September 8, 2021 re: #326 LETTER MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 31, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D).(Sylvester, Mark)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated September 8, 2021 re: #326 LETTER MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 31, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Sylvester, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated September 7, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated September 7, 2021 re: Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Preclearance Trading. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Note: under seal] Exhibit A - 2014 OEC Guidance)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Zornberg, Lisa)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated September 7, 2021 re: Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Preclearance Trading. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Note: under seal] Exhibit A - 2014 OEC Guidance).(Zornberg, Lisa)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated September 7, 2021 re: Opposition to Letter-Motion to Compel Production of Recordings. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: SECs First RFPs to Ripple (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit Ex. B: Ripples Responses and Objections to SECs First RFPs, #3 Exhibit Ex C: M. Vias Deposition Transcript (SEALED), #4 Exhibit Ex. D : R. Zagone Deposition Transcript (SEALED), #5 Exhibit Ex. E : Produced Email (SEALED), #6 Exhibit Ex. F: Produced Email (SEALED), #7 Exhibit Ex. G: J Tenreiro Email, Aug. 10, 2021, #8 Exhibit Ex. H: E Gulay Email, Aug. 17, 2021, #9 Exhibit Ex. I: E Gulay Email, Aug 20, 2021, #10 Exhibit Ex. J: March 26, 2021 Meet and Confer Letter (REDACTED), #11 Exhibit Ex. K: D Waxman Email, Apr 23, 2021 (REDACTED), #12 Exhibit Ex. L: May 13, 2021 Meet and Confer Letter (REDACTED)).(Ceresney, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated September 7, 2021 re: Opposition to Letter-Motion to Compel Production of Recordings. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: SECs First RFPs to Ripple (SEALED), #2 Exhibit Ex C: M. Vias Deposition Transcript (SEALED), #3 Exhibit Ex. D : R. Zagone Deposition Transcript (SEALED), #4 Exhibit Ex. E : Produced Email (SEALED), #5 Exhibit Ex. F: Produced Email (SEALED), #6 Exhibit Ex. J: March 26, 2021 Meet and Confer Letter (SEALED), #7 Exhibit Ex. K: D Waxman Email, Apr 23, 2021 (SEALED), #8 Exhibit Ex. L: May 13, 2021 Meet and Confer Letter (SEALED))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 338 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #339) - ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated September 7, 2021 re: Opposition to Letter-Motion to Compel Production of Recordings. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: SECs First RFPs to Ripple, #2 Exhibit Ex C: M. Vias Deposition Transcript (SEALED), #3 Exhibit Ex. D : R. Zagone Deposition Transcript (SEALED), #4 Exhibit Ex. E : Produced Email (SEALED), #5 Exhibit Ex. F: Produced Email (SEALED), #6 Exhibit Ex. J: March 26, 2021 Meet and Confer Letter (SEALED), #7 Exhibit Ex D.: Waxman Email dated April 23, 2021., #8 Exhibit Ex. L: May 13, 2021 Meet and Confer Letter (SEALED))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Ceresney, Andrew) Modified on 9/8/2021 (ldi).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting #331 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants Ripple and Larsen may reply to the SEC's response to ECF No. 326 no later than September 15, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting #332 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joy Guo terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated September 3, 2021 re: #314 LETTER MOTION to Compel Preclearance Trading Documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated August 27, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guerrier, Pascale)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anna Rebecca Gressel on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Gressel, Anna)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erol Nazim Gulay on behalf of Ripple Labs Inc...(Gulay, Erol)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MOTION for Joy Guo to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joy Guo in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Guo, Joy)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 331 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated September 3, 2021. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #329 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The SEC may respond to Defendants' letter motion no later than September 8, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re Defendants' Letter Motion for a Rule 37.2 Conference (D.E. 326) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated September 1, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER denying #324 Motion for Lilya Tessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney does not represent a party or a movant in the case. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike The Chamber of Digital Commerce from the docket pending a proper motion for leave to file an amicus brief. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #283 Letter Motion. The Slack messages sought are relevant to the parties' claims and defenses and proportional to the needs of the case. Any burden to Ripple is outweighed by its previous agreement to produce the relevant Slack messages, the relative resources of the parties, and the amount in controversy. Accordingly, Ripple is ordered to search and produce responsive documents from the Slack platform from the 22 custodians identified by the SEC. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion at ECF No. 282. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #324 MOTION for Lilya Tessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25005680. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 LETTER MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 31, 2021. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Kellogg, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #323 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants may file a combined letter of 7 pages or fewer. The SEC's response, if any, may not exceed 7 pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MOTION for Lilya Tessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25005680. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chamber of Digital Commerce..(Tessler, Lilya)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 31, 2021. Document filed by Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Kellogg, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #321 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #319 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated August 30, 2021. Defendant Ripple's request is GRANTED. Defendant may respond to the SEC's letter motion and file an associated motion to seal, if any, no later than September 7, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #319 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated August 30, 2021. addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 31, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2021. Court Reporter present. (ras)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated August 30, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A Guerrier Email 8.26.21, #2 Exhibit EX B Guo Email 8.12.21, #3 Exhibit EX C Waxman Email 7.7.21, #4 Exhibit EX D Guo Email 7.12.21, #5 Exhibit EX E O'Gorman Dep. Tr., #6 Exhibit EX F Zagone Dep. Tr., #7 Exhibit EX G Schwartz Dep. Tr., #8 Exhibit EX H Vias Dep. Tr., #9 Exhibit EX I Waxman Email 8.8.21, #10 Exhibit EX J Gulay Email 8.10.21, #11 Exhibit EX K Tenreiro Email 8.13.21, #12 Exhibit EX L Gulay Email 8.23.21, #13 Exhibit EX M Gulay Email 8.30.21).(Guerrier, Pascale)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Securities and Exchange Commission dated August 30, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX E O'Gorman Dep. Tr., #2 Exhibit EX F Zagone Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit EX G Schwartz Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit EX H Vias Dep. Tr.)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Guerrier, Pascale)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER: A telephonic conference is scheduled for Tuesday, August 31, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. to discuss the Defendants' pending motion to compel the SEC to produce certain documents it designated as privileged. ECF No. 289. Members of the public may listen to the proceedings at the following numbers: USA: (844) 867-6163, International: (409) 207-6969, Access Code: 9453921#. Unauthorized recording and rebroadcasting of the conference (e.g., YouTube, Twitch, audio-only streams, etc.) is strictly prohibited. Any unauthorized recordings will be investigated, and anyone found to engage in such behaviors may be subject to criminal sanctions. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2021) (ras)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #301 Letter Motion to Seal. The Privilege Logs, the Amended Privilege Logs, and the highlighted portions of Director Hinman's deposition transcript may be filed under seal subject to further reconsideration by the Court when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #298 Letter Motion to Seal. As set forth in Defendant Ripple's motion to seal, the following documents may be filed under seal: (i) certain redacted portions of the SEC's August 9, 2021 letter-motion to compel certain Slack discovery (ECF No. 282); (ii) certain of the exhibits the SEC filed under seal in support thereof (ECF Nos. 282-1282-10); (iii) the redacted portions of Ripple's August 16, 2021 letter in response to the SEC Letter-Motion (ECF No. 296); and (iv) the seven exhibits filed under seal in support thereof (ECF Nos. 296-2296-8). The motion is granted on an interim basis, and the Court may reconsider its ruling when it considers the merits of the underlying motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER re #314 Motion to Compel. The SEC may respond to Defendants' letter motion no later than September 3, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 LETTER MOTION to Compel Preclearance Trading Documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Zornberg dated August 27, 2021. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Jan. 2018 SEC Ethics Guidance Regarding Digital Assets), #2 Exhibit B (Aug. 11, 2021 E-mail from L. Stewart to M. Hirsch), #3 Exhibit C (Defendants Second RFP to the SEC), #4 Exhibit D (Aug. 20, 2021 E-mail from L. Zornberg to J. Tenreiro)).(Zornberg, Lisa)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #312 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' request is GRANTED. The parties may conduct the depositions of Defendants Garlinghouse and Larsen after the close of the August 31, 2021 fact discovery deadline. The deadline to conduct expert discovery is extended to November 12, 2021. The deadline for the parties to exchange their respective Statements of Material Facts pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and their pre-motion letters regarding motions for summary judgment is adjourned sine die pending resolution of the motions to dismiss and strike. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery & Other Matters addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Parties dated August 24, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER: A telephonic conference is scheduled for Tuesday, August 31, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. to discuss the Defendants' pending motion to compel the SEC to produce certain documents it designated as privileged. ECF No. 289. The Court will contact the parties to establish a conference line and will post a public dial-in number before the conference. (Telephone Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/24/2021) (ras)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 23, 2021 re: #283 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Slack communications addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G Tenreiro dated August 9, 2021. [SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION]. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc...(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 23, 2021 re: #282 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Slack communications addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G Tenreiro dated August 9, 2021. [SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION]. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 23, 2021 re: #289 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: SEC privilege assertions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew C. Solomon dated August 10, 2021. . Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc...(Solomon, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #306 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendant Ripples sur-reply shall be filed no later than August 24, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Leave to File proposed sur-reply to the SEC's reply in support of its letter-motion seeking an order to compel Ripple to search for and produce additional Slack communications re ECF 282, 283, 296, 302 & 303 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 20, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Emergency Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Slack communications re ECF 282, 283, 296, 302 & 303 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 20, 2021. Document filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply (redacted)).(Ceresney, Andrew)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mark R. Sylvester dated August 19, 2021 re: #298 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Ceresney dated August 16, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Sylvester, Mark)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 303 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated August 19, 2021 re: #283 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Slack communications addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G Tenreiro dated August 9, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to SEC Motion - Unredacted, #2 Exhibit B to SEC Motion - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit A to SEC Reply).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated August 19, 2021 re: #282 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Slack communications addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G Tenreiro dated August 9, 2021. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Bradley Garlinghouse, Christian A. Larsen, Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #53 .(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 LETTER MOTION to Seal certain exhibits in D.E. 290 & D.E. 299 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated August 17, 2021. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300