Calvo v. Amalgamated Housing Corp.
Plaintiff: Brandon Calvo
Defendant: Amalgamated Housing Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10859
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Brandon Calvo at 80 Van Cortland Park South, Bronx, NY 10463. (dsh)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 20-CV-10859 (LLS). An Amended Complaint for Employment Discrimination form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/10/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 3, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/28/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Amalgamated Housing Corp.. Document filed by Brandon Calvo..(rdz)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Brandon Calvo.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvo v. Amalgamated Housing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Housing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Calvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?