Bianco et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Maureen Reed, Winsome Nelson Reid, Doris McCloud, Geraldine Sands, Giselle Huber, Alexandra Lopez Feliciano, Loreen Fremaint, John Doe 90, Desmond Green, Patrick O'Shea, Jr., Cynthia Lesemann, Ester Yevdayeva, Jane Thompson, James White, Michael Bianco, John Doe 93, John Doe 94, Veronica Morris, Steven Wayne Milam, Carey Pierce, John Doe 97, Dinnette Medina, Jo Ann Dwyer, Pamela Pabon, Dylan Boyle, Alda Walcott, William White, Andrew Walcott, Ronda Boyle, Nancy Bolger, Delano Walcott, Wanda Rose, Tommie Milam, Barbara Timpone, Malikah Jeffries, Dorothy Swick, Berta Elseth, Amber Ann Amundson, Barbara Echtermann, Jermaine Cook, Effie Milam, Brendan Dwyer, Mary Doherty, Nathan Boyle, Sheila O'Shea, Barbara Doherty, Harlan Elseth, John Doe 96, Allen Richard Boyle, Charlotte Amundson, Alfred Jeffries, Sr., Edwin Ovalles, Hector L. Walcott, James Elseth, Otis Tolbert, Natalie Pollack, Nancy Tolbert, Megan O'Shea, John Doe 92, Regina White, Suzanne Antoniou, Alfredo Samuel Espinal, Patrick Cartier, Christopher White, John Doe 91, Sarah Dwyer, Terry Paul, Douglas Caufield, Monique Riviere, Elliot Amundson, Curtis Elseth, John Doe 89 and John Doe 95
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2020cv10902
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting (7144) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN. The plaintiffs in Ryan et al., v. Iran et al., No. 20-cv-00266 (GBD)(SN) (Jan. 10. 2020) move for the issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Islamic Republic of Iran. ECF No. 7144. That motion is GRANTED. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of the Court to issue Letters Rogatory directed to the Islamic Republic of Iran, substantially similar in form to those attached as EXHIBIT A to the Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No. 7144-1), requesting assistance in serving the Complaint in this matter and the necessary accompanying documents, upon the following defendants: (1) National Iranian Tanker Corporation; (2) National Iranian Oil Corporation; (3) National Iranian Gas Corporation; (4) National Iranian Petrochemical Company; (5) Iran Airlines; (6) Hezbollah, (7) Ayatollah Ali Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; and (8) the Estate of Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, former Chairman of the Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran.The Letters Rogatory and the accompanying legal documents, including any translations, related to the Complaint in this case shall be transmitted to the U.S. Department of State for delivery to the appropriate judicial authority of the Islamic Republic of Iran, pursuant to 1608(b)(3)(A). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/28/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
September 28, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/14/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 28, 2021 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/14/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 27, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to National Iranian Tanker Corporation; National Iranian Oil Corporation; National Iranian Gas Corporation; National Iranian Petrochemical Company; Iran Airlines; Hezbollah; Ayatollah Ali Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; Estate of Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, former Chairman of the Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran in Switzerland for delivery to the Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Patricia Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Memorandum of Law In Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Corr, Stephen)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting (7041) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (583) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; granting (533) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (767) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (169) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (154) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (157) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (134) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (154) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (118) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (111) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (110) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; granting (101) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (106) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN; granting (111) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN; granting (32) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-09376-GBD-SN; granting (32) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-09387-GBD-SN; granting (34) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10460-GBD-SN; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN. (Attorney Alexandra Pluscarr terminated.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
August 17, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Greene on behalf of C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, John O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Greene, Alexander)
August 17, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, John O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Related Document Number: 7041 ..(Goldman, Jerry)
August 17, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: (118 in 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN, 533 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN, 111 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 23 in 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN, 134 in 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN, 43 in 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN, 50 in 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN, 767 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 113 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN, 50 in 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN, 154 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 99 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN, 7041 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 49 in 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN, 32 in 1:20-cv-09376-GBD-SN, 88 in 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN, 111 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 583 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN, 169 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 89 in 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN, 101 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 106 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 154 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN, 52 in 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN, 43 in 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN, 157 in 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN, 110 in 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN, 49 in 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN, 32 in 1:20-cv-09387-GBD-SN, 52 in 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN, 50 in 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN, 34 in 1:20-cv-10460-GBD-SN) MOTION for Alexandra Pluscarr to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, John O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Goldman, Jerry)
August 17, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Alexandra Pluscarr to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Goldman, Jerry)
July 9, 2021 Filing 22 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Islamic Republic of Iran, issued July 9, 2021 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN.(dt)
July 9, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: (20 in 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN, 6929 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Michael Bianco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN.(Goldman, Jerry)
July 9, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Michael Bianco..(Goldman, Jerry) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 7/9/2021 (dt).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER:On June 23, 2021, the Court issued an order granting the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' motion at ECF No. 6816. ECF No. 6872. That order was made under seal in light of some of the content in motions preceding that order. To increase public access to the docket and reduce the volume of material that must undergo redaction review, the Court now proposes to unseal the order at ECF No. 6872. If the parties have any objections to unsealing that order, those must be filed with the Court by July 9, 2021. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 7/9/2021) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/02/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ama)
June 17, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ethan Greenberg on behalf of C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Peter Asaro, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, James Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Robert Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Greenberg, Ethan)
May 12, 2021 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint deemed filed on December 23, 2020, Summons, Statement of relatedness, Notice of Suit prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1220, 1391(f), 1441( d) and 1602-1611, Affidavit of Translator(along with translations of the above documents in Farsi) mailed to Mohammad Javad Zarif at the following address: Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522 on 2/3/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 816111844447, as per #9 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting (6768) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (6774) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (574) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (577) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; granting (524) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (527) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (758) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (761) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (160) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (163) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (145) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (148) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (148) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (151) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (125) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (128) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (148) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (109) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (112) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (102) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (105) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (107) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (101) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (95) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (100) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (37) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN; granting (102) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (105) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (34) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (34) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-09376-GBD-SN; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-09387-GBD-SN; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10460-GBD-SN; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN. (Attorney Nicholas Maxwell terminated. Attorney Samantha Smith terminated.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
April 29, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, James Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Related Document Number: 6774 ..(Goldman, Jerry)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: (6774 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 43 in 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN, 577 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 34 in 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN, 34 in 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN, 45 in 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN, 43 in 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN, 31 in 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:20-cv-10460-GBD-SN, 112 in 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN, 45 in 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN, 40 in 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN, 148 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN, 163 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 104 in 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN, 148 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 23 in 1:20-cv-09376-GBD-SN, 105 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN, 151 in 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN, 93 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN, 100 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 41 in 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN, 107 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN, 761 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 128 in 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN, 23 in 1:20-cv-09387-GBD-SN, 95 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN, 82 in 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN, 82 in 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN, 527 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN, 105 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN) MOTION for Samantha Smith to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, James Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Goldman, Jerry)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Samantha Smith to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Joseph Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, James Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Goldman, Jerry)
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, Peter Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, James Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Related Document Number: 6768 ..(Goldman, Jerry)
April 28, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: (574 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 160 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN, 43 in 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN, 101 in 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN, 145 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN, 40 in 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN, 41 in 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN, 41 in 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN, 92 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 148 in 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN, 79 in 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN, 102 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 22 in 1:20-cv-10460-GBD-SN, 20 in 1:20-cv-09387-GBD-SN, 31 in 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN, 28 in 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN, 37 in 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN, 125 in 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN, 20 in 1:20-cv-09376-GBD-SN, 104 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN, 40 in 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN, 102 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 79 in 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN, 31 in 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN, 41 in 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN, 758 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 6768 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN, 109 in 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN, 20 in 1:18-cv-11841-GBD-SN, 90 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 524 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN, 11 in 1:20-cv-10902-GBD-SN, 21 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN, 42 in 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN, 97 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN) MOTION for Nicholas Maxwell to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, James Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Goldman, Jerry)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Nicholas Maxwell to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Ber Barry Aron, Paul Asaro, August Bernaerts, Michael Bianco, Deborah Bodner, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Joseph Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Carly Gordenstein, James Hargrave, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, BNY Mellon, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. O'Neill, C. I. O'Neill, John O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Jack Zelmanowitz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Goldman, Jerry)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/3/2021) (va)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint deemed filed on December 23, 2020, Summons, Statement of relatedness, Notice of Suit prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1220, 1391(f), 1441(d) and 1602-1611, Affidavit of Translator(along with translations of the above documents in Farsi). mailed to Mohammad Javad Zarif at the following address: Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 02/03/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 816111844447, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (JKR)
January 6, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
January 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on December 23, 2020, Civil Cover Sheet, Statement of Relatedness, Notice of suit, Affidavit of Translator mailed to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs at the following address: Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 01/04/2021 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002639649US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (JKR)
December 29, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mary Doherty (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty), Sheila O'Shea (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'shea), Jo Ann Dwyer (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer), Ronda Boyle ('on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle), John Doe 96, John Doe 97, John Doe 94, John Doe 90, John Doe 91, John Doe 92, Alda Walcott (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott), John Doe 89, John Doe 93, John Doe 95, Winsome Nelson Reid(on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson) added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,.Document filed by Mary Doherty (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty), Sheila O'Shea (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'shea), Jo Ann Dwyer (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer), Ronda Boyle ('on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle), John Doe 96, John Doe 97, John Doe 94, John Doe 90, John Doe 91, John Doe 92, Alda Walcott (on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott), John Doe 89, John Doe 93, John Doe 95, Winsome Nelson Reid(on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson). Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran..(jgo)
December 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
December 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties Ronda Boyle with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle', John Doe 96 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Cartier', John Doe 93 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert Caufield', Mary Doherty with party teext 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty', Jo Ann Dwyer with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer', John Doe 95 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret Ruth Echtermann', John Doe 92 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Eileen Flecha', Winsome Nelson Reid with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson', Sheila O'Shea with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'shea', John Doe 90 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jesus Ovalles', John Doe 94 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Paul', John Doe 97 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Dennis Pierce', John Doe 91 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Otis Tolbert', Alda Walcott with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott', and, John Doe 89 with party text 'on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward White". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
December 28, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 24, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jerry S. Goldman Esq. dated 12/24/20 Document filed by Amber Ann Amundson, Charlotte Amundson, Elliot Amundson, Suzanne Antoniou, Michael Bianco, Nancy Bolger, Allen Richard Boyle, Dylan Boyle, Nathan Boyle, Ronda Boyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Allen Boyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle), Ronda Boyle(individually, as surviving spouse of Allen Boyle), Patrick Cartier, Douglas Caufield, Jermaine Cook, John Doe 89, John Doe 90, John Doe 91, John Doe 92, John Doe 93, John Doe 94, John Doe 95, John Doe 96, John Doe 97, Barbara Doherty, Mary Doherty(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Doherty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty), Mary Doherty(individually, as surviving spouse of John Doherty), Brendan Dwyer, Jo Ann Dwyer(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Dwyer), Jo Ann Dwyer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Dwyer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer), Sarah Dwyer, Barbara Echtermann, Berta Elseth, Curtis Elseth, Harlan Elseth, James Elseth, Alfredo Samuel Espinal, Loreen Fremaint, Desmond Green, Giselle Huber, Alfred Jeffries, Sr, Malikah Jeffries, Cynthia Lesemann, Alexandra Lopez Feliciano, Doris McCloud, Dinnette Medina, Effie Milam, Steven Wayne Milam, Tommie Milam, Veronica Morris, Winsome Nelson Reid(individually, as surviving parent of Michele Ann Nelson), Winsome Nelson Reid(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michele Nelson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson), Megan O'Shea, Patrick O'Shea, Jr, Sheila O'Shea(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick O'Shea), Sheila O'Shea(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick O'Shea, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'Shea), Edwin Ovalles, Pamela Pabon, Terry Paul, Carey Pierce, Natalie Pollack, Maureen Reed, Monique Riviere, Wanda Rose, Geraldine Sands, Dorothy Swick, Jane Thompson, Barbara Timpone, Nancy Tolbert, Otis Tolbert, Alda Walcott(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Courtney Walcott, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott), Alda Walcott(individually, as surviving parent of Courtney Walcott), Andrew Walcott, Delano Walcott, Hector L. Walcott, Christopher White, James White, Regina White(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward James White, Jr., deceased, the late parent of Edward White), Regina White(individually, as surviving parent of Edward White), William White, Ester Yevdayeva..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Amber Ann Amundson, Charlotte Amundson, Elliot Amundson, Suzanne Antoniou, Michael Bianco, Nancy Bolger, Allen Richard Boyle, Dylan Boyle, Nathan Boyle, Ronda Boyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Allen Boyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle), Ronda Boyle(individually, as surviving spouse of Allen Boyle), Patrick Cartier, Douglas Caufield, Jermaine Cook, John Doe 89, John Doe 90, John Doe 91, John Doe 92, John Doe 93, John Doe 94, John Doe 95, John Doe 96, John Doe 97, Barbara Doherty, Mary Doherty(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Doherty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty), Mary Doherty(individually, as surviving spouse of John Doherty), Brendan Dwyer, Jo Ann Dwyer(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Dwyer), Jo Ann Dwyer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Dwyer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer), Sarah Dwyer, Barbara Echtermann, Berta Elseth, Curtis Elseth, Harlan Elseth, James Elseth, Alfredo Samuel Espinal, Loreen Fremaint, Desmond Green, Giselle Huber, Alfred Jeffries, Sr, Malikah Jeffries, Cynthia Lesemann, Alexandra Lopez Feliciano, Doris McCloud, Dinnette Medina, Effie Milam, Steven Wayne Milam, Tommie Milam, Veronica Morris, Winsome Nelson Reid(individually, as surviving parent of Michele Ann Nelson), Winsome Nelson Reid(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michele Nelson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson), Megan O'Shea, Patrick O'Shea, Jr, Sheila O'Shea(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick O'Shea), Sheila O'Shea(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick O'Shea, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'Shea), Edwin Ovalles, Pamela Pabon, Terry Paul, Carey Pierce, Natalie Pollack, Maureen Reed, Monique Riviere, Wanda Rose, Geraldine Sands, Dorothy Swick, Jane Thompson, Barbara Timpone, Nancy Tolbert, Otis Tolbert, Alda Walcott(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Courtney Walcott, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott), Alda Walcott(individually, as surviving parent of Courtney Walcott), Andrew Walcott, Delano Walcott, Hector L. Walcott, Christopher White, James White, Regina White(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward James White, Jr., deceased, the late parent of Edward White), Regina White(individually, as surviving parent of Edward White), William White, Ester Yevdayeva..(Strong, Bruce)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Amber Ann Amundson, Charlotte Amundson, Elliot Amundson, Suzanne Antoniou, Michael Bianco, Nancy Bolger, Allen Richard Boyle, Dylan Boyle, Nathan Boyle, Ronda Boyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Allen Boyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle), Ronda Boyle(individually, as surviving spouse of Allen Boyle), Patrick Cartier, Douglas Caufield, Jermaine Cook, John Doe 89, John Doe 90, John Doe 91, John Doe 92, John Doe 93, John Doe 94, John Doe 95, John Doe 96, John Doe 97, Barbara Doherty, Mary Doherty(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Doherty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty), Mary Doherty(individually, as surviving spouse of John Doherty), Brendan Dwyer, Jo Ann Dwyer(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Dwyer), Jo Ann Dwyer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Dwyer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer), Sarah Dwyer, Barbara Echtermann, Berta Elseth, Curtis Elseth, Harlan Elseth, James Elseth, Alfredo Samuel Espinal, Loreen Fremaint, Desmond Green, Giselle Huber, Alfred Jeffries, Sr, Malikah Jeffries, Cynthia Lesemann, Alexandra Lopez Feliciano, Doris McCloud, Dinnette Medina, Effie Milam, Steven Wayne Milam, Tommie Milam, Veronica Morris, Winsome Nelson Reid(individually, as surviving parent of Michele Ann Nelson), Winsome Nelson Reid(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michele Nelson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson), Megan O'Shea, Patrick O'Shea, Jr, Sheila O'Shea(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick O'Shea), Sheila O'Shea(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick O'Shea, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'Shea), Edwin Ovalles, Pamela Pabon, Terry Paul, Carey Pierce, Natalie Pollack, Maureen Reed, Monique Riviere, Wanda Rose, Geraldine Sands, Dorothy Swick, Jane Thompson, Barbara Timpone, Nancy Tolbert, Otis Tolbert, Alda Walcott(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Courtney Walcott, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott), Alda Walcott(individually, as surviving parent of Courtney Walcott), Andrew Walcott, Delano Walcott, Hector L. Walcott, Christopher White, James White, Regina White(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward James White, Jr., deceased, the late parent of Edward White), Regina White(individually, as surviving parent of Edward White), William White, Ester Yevdayeva..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Amber Ann Amundson, Charlotte Amundson, Elliot Amundson, Suzanne Antoniou, Michael Bianco, Nancy Bolger, Allen Richard Boyle, Dylan Boyle, Nathan Boyle, Ronda Boyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Allen Boyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle), Ronda Boyle(individually, as surviving spouse of Allen Boyle), Patrick Cartier, Douglas Caufield, Jermaine Cook, John Doe 89, John Doe 90, John Doe 91, John Doe 92, John Doe 93, John Doe 94, John Doe 95, John Doe 96, John Doe 97, Barbara Doherty, Mary Doherty(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Doherty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty), Mary Doherty(individually, as surviving spouse of John Doherty), Brendan Dwyer, Jo Ann Dwyer(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Dwyer), Jo Ann Dwyer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Dwyer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer), Sarah Dwyer, Barbara Echtermann, Berta Elseth, Curtis Elseth, Harlan Elseth, James Elseth, Alfredo Samuel Espinal, Loreen Fremaint, Desmond Green, Giselle Huber, Alfred Jeffries, Sr, Malikah Jeffries, Cynthia Lesemann, Alexandra Lopez Feliciano, Doris McCloud, Dinnette Medina, Effie Milam, Steven Wayne Milam, Tommie Milam, Veronica Morris, Winsome Nelson Reid(individually, as surviving parent of Michele Ann Nelson), Winsome Nelson Reid(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michele Nelson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson), Megan O'Shea, Patrick O'Shea, Jr, Sheila O'Shea(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick O'Shea), Sheila O'Shea(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick O'Shea, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'Shea), Edwin Ovalles, Pamela Pabon, Terry Paul, Carey Pierce, Natalie Pollack, Maureen Reed, Monique Riviere, Wanda Rose, Geraldine Sands, Dorothy Swick, Jane Thompson, Barbara Timpone, Nancy Tolbert, Otis Tolbert, Alda Walcott(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Courtney Walcott, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott), Alda Walcott(individually, as surviving parent of Courtney Walcott), Andrew Walcott, Delano Walcott, Hector L. Walcott, Christopher White, James White, Regina White(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward James White, Jr., deceased, the late parent of Edward White), Regina White(individually, as surviving parent of Edward White), William White, Ester Yevdayeva..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Jerry)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23181163)Document filed by Dorothy Swick, John Doe 92, Loreen Fremaint, Jo Ann Dwyer(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Dwyer), Andrew Walcott, Ronda Boyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Allen Boyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Allen Boyle), Wanda Rose, Berta Elseth, Barbara Doherty, Delano Walcott, Mary Doherty(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Doherty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Doherty), Effie Milam, Pamela Pabon, Christopher White, Curtis Elseth, John Doe 94, Cynthia Lesemann, Sarah Dwyer, Nathan Boyle, Alfredo Samuel Espinal, Jane Thompson, Patrick Cartier, Suzanne Antoniou, Monique Riviere, William White, Otis Tolbert, Harlan Elseth, Sheila O'Shea(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick O'Shea), Malikah Jeffries, Dinnette Medina, Carey Pierce, Alexandra Lopez Feliciano, John Doe 96, Jermaine Cook, Megan O'Shea, John Doe 97, Terry Paul, Nancy Tolbert, Steven Wayne Milam, John Doe 89, Regina White(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward James White, Jr., deceased, the late parent of Edward White), Maureen Reed, Geraldine Sands, John Doe 90, John Doe 91, Hector L. Walcott, Alda Walcott(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Courtney Walcott, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Courtney Walcott), Charlotte Amundson, Mary Doherty(individually, as surviving spouse of John Doherty), Michael Bianco, Nancy Bolger, John Doe 95, James Elseth, Regina White(individually, as surviving parent of Edward White), Giselle Huber, John Doe 93, Alda Walcott(individually, as surviving parent of Courtney Walcott), Barbara Timpone, Sheila O'Shea(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick O'Shea, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick O'Shea), Barbara Echtermann, Edwin Ovalles, James White, Jo Ann Dwyer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Dwyer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick Dwyer), Doris McCloud, Winsome Nelson Reid(individually, as surviving parent of Michele Ann Nelson), Brendan Dwyer, Douglas Caufield, Ronda Boyle(individually, as surviving spouse of Allen Boyle), Elliot Amundson, Desmond Green, Dylan Boyle, Patrick O'Shea, Jr, Winsome Nelson Reid(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michele Nelson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michele Ann Nelson), Allen Richard Boyle, Alfred Jeffries, Sr, Amber Ann Amundson, Veronica Morris, Ester Yevdayeva, Tommie Milam, Natalie Pollack..(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bianco et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Reed
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winsome Nelson Reid
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris McCloud
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Sands
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giselle Huber
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Lopez Feliciano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loreen Fremaint
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 90
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Shea, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lesemann
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Yevdayeva
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Thompson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bianco
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Alexander Greene
Represented By: Ethan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 93
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 94
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Morris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Milam
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Pierce
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 97
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinnette Medina
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Dwyer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Pabon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Boyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alda Walcott
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William White
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Walcott
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Boyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Bolger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delano Walcott
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Rose
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Milam
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Timpone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malikah Jeffries
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Swick
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berta Elseth
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Ann Amundson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Echtermann
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Cook
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Effie Milam
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Dwyer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Doherty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Boyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila O'Shea
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Doherty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlan Elseth
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 96
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Richard Boyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Amundson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Jeffries, Sr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Ovalles
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector L. Walcott
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Elseth
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Tolbert
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Pollack
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Tolbert
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan O'Shea
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 92
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina White
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Antoniou
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Samuel Espinal
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Cartier
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher White
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 91
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Dwyer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Paul
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Caufield
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Riviere
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Amundson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Elseth
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 89
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 95
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?