Ramirez et al v. 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Merino, Eusebio Ramirez, Bernardo Castillo Zamora, Jose Basurto-Vazquez, Jaime Agudo, Jose Edwin Mendez, Jorge Luis Villa Medel, Ignacio Galeno and Rene Rodriguez
Defendant: 1494 FIRST AVE RESTAURANT CORP d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA, FAMOUS ITALIAN VILLAGE INC. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA, Jose Leon, JGL RESTAURANT CORP. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA, Joseph Notaro, JGL Restaurant Corp. doing business as Italian Village Pizza, Famous Italian Village Inc. doing business as Italian Village Pizza and 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp doing business as Italian Village Pizza
Case Number: 1:2020cv10949
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY AND AGREED by and between the undersigned, counsel for the parties, that Defendants' time to appear, answer, move or otherwise plead with respect to the Amended Complaint herein be extended through and including March 29, 2021. (As further set forth in this Order.) Motions terminated: #11 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Amended Complaint by Stipulation. filed by 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp, Famous Italian Village Inc., Joseph Notaro., 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp answer due 3/29/2021; Famous Italian Village Inc. answer due 3/29/2021; Joseph Notaro answer due 3/29/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/24/2021) (cf)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Joseph Notaro served on 2/15/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually); Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually); Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Rene Rodriguez(individually,); Eusebio Ramirez(individually); Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jaime Agudo(individually); Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Ignacio Galeno(individually); Jose Edwin Mendez(individually); Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Francisco Merino(individually); Rene Rodriguez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Amended Complaint,,,, by Stipulation. Document filed by 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp, Famous Italian Village Inc., Joseph Notaro..(Marcus, Joshua)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky Authorized Agent. Document filed by Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually); Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually); Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Rene Rodriguez(individually,); Eusebio Ramirez(individually); Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jaime Agudo(individually); Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Ignacio Galeno(individually); Jose Edwin Mendez(individually); Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Francisco Merino(individually); Rene Rodriguez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Famous Italian Village Inc. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky Authorized Agent. Document filed by Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually); Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually); Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Rene Rodriguez(individually,); Eusebio Ramirez(individually); Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jaime Agudo(individually); Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Ignacio Galeno(individually); Jose Edwin Mendez(individually); Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Francisco Merino(individually); Rene Rodriguez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,); Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp, Famous Italian Village Inc., Joseph Notaro..(pc)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1494 FIRST AVE RESTAURANT CORP d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; FAMOUS ITALIAN VILLAGE INC. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; JOSEPH NOTARO, re: #5 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Jaime Agudo(individually), Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually), Ignacio Galeno(individually), Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Francisco Merino(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Rene Rodriguez(individually,), Rene Rodriguez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
January 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,,,,, wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to 1494 FIRST AVE RESTAURANT CORP d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; FAMOUS ITALIAN VILLAGE INC. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; JOSEPH NOTARO, re: #5 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Jaime Agudo(individually), Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually), Ignacio Galeno(individually), Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Francisco Merino(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Rene Rodriguez(individually,), Rene Rodriguez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman) Modified on 1/12/2021 (jgo).
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,, against 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp, Famous Italian Village Inc., Joseph Notaro with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Eusebio Ramirez(individually), Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jaime Agudo(individually), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Ignacio Galeno(individually), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Francisco Merino(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually), Rene Rodriguez, Rene Rodriguez. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,..(Avshalumov, Roman)
December 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the attorney information was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 29, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 1494 FIRST AVE RESTAURANT CORP d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; FAMOUS ITALIAN VILLAGE INC. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; JGL RESTAURANT CORP. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Jaime Agudo(individually), Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually), Ignacio Galeno(individually), Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Francisco Merino(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(O'Donnell, James)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1494 FIRST AVE RESTAURANT CORP d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; FAMOUS ITALIAN VILLAGE INC. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; JGL RESTAURANT CORP. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA; JOSEPH NOTARO; JOSE LEON, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Jaime Agudo(individually), Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually), Ignacio Galeno(individually), Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Francisco Merino(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman) Modified on 12/29/2020 (jgo).
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1494 FIRST AVE RESTAURANT CORP d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA, FAMOUS ITALIAN VILLAGE INC. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA, JGL RESTAURANT CORP. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA, Jose Leon, Joseph Notaro. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23229913)Document filed by Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(individually), Eusebio Ramirez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Eusebio Ramirez(individually), Francisco Merino(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jaime Agudo(individually), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Ignacio Galeno(individually), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jaime Agudo(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Francisco Merino(individually), Jorge Luis Villa Medel(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Ignacio Galeno(On behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated,), Jose Basurto-Vazquez(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1494 FIRST AVE RESTAURANT CORP d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAMOUS ITALIAN VILLAGE INC. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JGL RESTAURANT CORP. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Notaro
Represented By: Joshua A. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JGL Restaurant Corp. doing business as Italian Village Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Famous Italian Village Inc. doing business as Italian Village Pizza
Represented By: Joshua A. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1494 First Ave Restaurant Corp doing business as Italian Village Pizza
Represented By: Joshua A. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Merino
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eusebio Ramirez
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Castillo Zamora
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Basurto-Vazquez
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Agudo
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Edwin Mendez
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Villa Medel
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Galeno
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Rodriguez
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?