Taylor v. Childrens Village
Plaintiff: Tara Rashay Patrick Taylor and Tara Reshay Patrick Taylor
Defendant: Childrens Village, The Children's Village(Jeremy Christopher Kohomban only) and A Womens Place(Amber Gottz)
Case Number: 1:2020cv10997
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Tara Reshay Patrick Taylor consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Tara Reshay Patrick Taylor.(sc)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A Womens Place(Amber Gottz), The Children's Village(Jeremy Christopher Kohomban only), re: amending 1 Complaint.Document filed by Tara Reshay Patrick Taylor. Related document: 1 Complaint.(sc)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to designate the complaint (ECF No. 1) Plaintiff's January 5, 2021 letter (ECF No. 4) as "case-participant view only." Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 20-CV-10997 (LLS). An Amended Complaint for Employment Discrimination form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/8/2021) (sac)
February 3, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/25/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Tara Patrick Taylor dated 12/30/20 re: "PLEASE PRINT THIS INFO AND SEND IT BACK TO ME IN A PDF FILE" - Can you docket this information in the complaint portio of the complaint filed with the Southern District U.S. Courts that this answer to this Federal Question is: Civil Rights Act of 1964 : religious belief etc. Document filed by Tara Reshay Patrick Taylor.(sc)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Tara R. Patrick Taylor consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Tara Reshay Patrick Taylor..(rdz) Modified on 12/30/2020 (rdz).
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Childrens Village. Document filed by Tara Rashay Patrick Taylor..(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Childrens Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childrens Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Children's Village(Jeremy Christopher Kohomban only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Womens Place(Amber Gottz)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Rashay Patrick Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Reshay Patrick Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?