In Re: Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Alexandra Uchenik, Martha Barabas, Austin Warman, Bruce Puleo, Mohammad Khalid, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Grace Kinskey, Jerry Gordon, Elizabeth Kinskey, Kaitlyn Belen, Renttext.com, Inc. and BJJ Corporation
Defendant: McGraw Hill, LLC, Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Eric Pica, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Follett Higher Education Group and Educational Publishers Enforcement Group
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Alexandra Pelletier, M. Samantha Pak and Joan Padden
Case Number: 1:2020md02946
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #45 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Denise L. Cote for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
October 7, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw Hill, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education Inc.. Document filed by Austin Warman, Austin Warman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06331-DLC.(Radice, John)
October 1, 2020 Filing 44 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Craig S. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21942575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kiyana Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Craig S. Davis in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Minnesota Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Davis, Craig) Modified on 10/2/2020 (wb).
October 1, 2020 Filing 43 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jessica N. Servais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21942520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kiyana Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jessica N. Servais in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Minnesota Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Wisconsin Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Servais, Jessica) Modified on 10/2/2020 (wb).
October 1, 2020 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Heidi M. Silton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21941873. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kiyana Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Heidi M. Silton in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Minnesota Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Silton, Heidi) Modified on 10/2/2020 (wb).
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. (82 in 1:20-cv-06364-DLC, 41 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Denise L. Cote for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a case that has been certified as a class action. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06364-DLC(dt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Cengage Learning Inc., Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., McGraw-Hill Glogal Education Holdings, LLC, McGraw-Hill LLC, Pearson Education Inc.. Document filed by Grace Kinskey, Elizabeth Kinskey. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06364-DLC.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for April Dawn Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
September 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for April Dawn Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21778671. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 22, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for April Dawn Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21778671. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Martha Barabas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Lambert, April)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Abbye Klamann Ognibene to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Denise L. Cote for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
September 21, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Cengage Learning, Inc., Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. Document filed by Grace Kinskey, Elizabeth Kinskey. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06364-DLC.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
September 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Abbye Klamann Ognibene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21733409. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 18, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Abbye Klamann Ognibene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21733409. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Martha Barabas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Abbye Klamann Ognibene, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Ognibene, Abbye)
September 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21730456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 18, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21730456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Martha Barabas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Steve W. Berman, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Berman, Steve)
September 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #32 MOTION for Lauren G. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21712601. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #33 MOTION for Thomas M. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21712716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Massachusetts - Supreme Judicial Court - 410-260-1500; missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea)
September 17, 2020 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas M. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21712716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Martha Barabas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Thomas Sobol, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing).(Sobol, Thomas) Modified on 9/17/2020 (aea).
September 17, 2020 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lauren G. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21712601. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Martha Barabas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lauren Barnes, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing).(Barnes, Lauren) Modified on 9/17/2020 (aea).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP shall serve as Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Plaintiffs. Steckler Gresham Cochran PLLC and Thompson Coburn LLP shall serve as Co-Lead Counsel for the Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs. The Student Purchaser Plaintiffs and Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs shall each file their consolidated amended complaints for their respective actions and any actions consolidated with their respective actions on or before October 16, 2020. Defendants shall file an answer to the consolidated amended complaints or a motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaints by December 4. If a motion to dismiss either of the two consolidated amended complaints is filed, the Student Purchaser Plaintiffs and Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs shall file a letter by December 11, 2020 indicating a desire to further amend their complaints in response to the motion. Any second consolidated amended complaints must be filed by December 18. If the Student Purchaser Plaintiffs and Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs elect to further amend, any Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before January 22, 2021. The plaintiffs shall file their oppositions to the motions by February 19. Defendants shall file their replies on or before March 5. (And as further set forth herein.) (Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2020., Motions due by 1/22/2021., Responses due by 2/19/2021, Replies due by 3/5/2021.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (jca)
September 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Telephone Conference to address applications for appointment as lead counsel in this matter held on 9/3/2020. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun) Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al.(gr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel., #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP, Fegan Scott LLC and Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C. as Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class. . Document filed by Joan Padden, M. Samantha Pak, Alexandra Pelletier..(Verrier, Keith)
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elana Katcher on behalf of Alexandra Uchenik..(Katcher, Elana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Robert N. Kaplan in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Levin Sedran & Berman LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class., #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Alexandra Uchenik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Kaplan, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel., #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Levin Sedran & Berman LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class. . Document filed by Alexandra Uchenik..(Kaplan, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: On August 12, 2020, this Court issued an Order scheduling atelephone conference for September 3. On August 24, this Court ordered that the September 3 conference shall address the applications for appointment as lead counsel and set a schedule for consolidated class actions. It is herebyORDERED that counsel for the plaintiffs shall consult with each other and submit an appearance sheet that lists the names and phone numbers of each attorney who will make an appearance at the conference by Wednesday, September 2 at 5:00 p.m. The appearance sheet may be submitted to this Courts Chambers via email at cotenysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP, Fegan Scott LLC and Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C. as Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class., #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Levin Sedran & Berman LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class. The Radice/HBSS Team's Response to the Opposing Applications for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Martha Barabas..(Fernandez-Silber, Natasha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of John D. Radice in Support re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Martha Barabas..(Radice, John)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: On August 28, 2020, Martha Barabas, one of the Student Plaintiffs in this case, moved for the appointment of the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as interim co-lead counsel. In support of the motion, Barabas submitted a declaration by John D. Radice (Declaration) and requested that it be filed under seal. The Court having reviewed the Declaration, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file the Declaration with only the third paragraph redacted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/31/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Stuart Lee Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
August 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Stuart Lee Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21403692. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Stuart Lee Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21403692. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B- Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Cochran, Stuart)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Levin Sedran & Berman LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class. Document filed by Alexandra Pelletier, Joan Padden, M. Samantha Pak. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law).(Verrier, Keith)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP, Fegan Scott LLC and Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C. as Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class. . Document filed by Alexandra Uchenik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Kaplan, Robert)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP, Fegan Scott LLC and Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C. as Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Class. Document filed by Alexandra Uchenik..(Kaplan, Robert)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 ***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of John D. Radice in Support re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Martha Barabas. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Radice, John)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter-motion to file the Declaration of John Radice ex parte for an in camera review addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from John Radice dated 08/28/2020. Document filed by Martha Barabas..(Radice, John)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Martha Barabas. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Natasha Fernandez-Silber, #3 Exhibits to Declaration).(Fernandez-Silber, Natasha)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of of Plaintiff Retailers' Application to Appoint Steckler Gresham Cochran PLLC and Thompson Coburn LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel for Putative Class of Independent Collegiate Retailers re: #8 Order,,,. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Application to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel, #2 Declaration of Bruce W. Steckler, #3 Declaration of Nicole Williams, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Steckler, Bruce)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David S. Nalven on behalf of Martha Barabas..(Nalven, David)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER in case 1:20-cv-03162-DLC; granting (10) Motion for Nicole Williams. to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02946-DLC. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This action, Cabral v. Cengage Learning, Inc., et al, 20cv3660, is related to the MDL which has been assigned to this Court. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Student Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Retailer Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection to those applications shall be filed by Tuesday, September 1, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 3 conference will address the applications for appointment as lead counsel and seta schedule for consolidated class actions. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/26/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Nicole Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21339869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Nicole Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21339869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of N. Williams, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Williams, Nicole)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: These actions having been transferred to this Court as part of the In Re: Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation, 20md2946 MDL, it is hereby ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Student Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Retailer Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection to those applications shall be filed by Tuesday, September 1, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 3 conference will address the applications for appointment as lead counsel and set a schedule for consolidated class actions. (Motions due by 8/28/2020. Responses due by 9/1/2020) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/25/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (jwh)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: These MDL actions having been assigned to this Court, and having reviewed the parties August 21, 2020 submissions, it is hereby ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Student Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Retailer Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection to those applications shall be filed by Tuesday, September 1, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 3 conference willaddress the applications for appointment as lead counsel and set a schedule for consolidated class actions. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/24/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Publishers and Retailers dated August 21, 2020 re: proposed schedule pursuant to the Court's August 11, 2020. Document filed by McGraw Hill, LLC..(Cavanaugh, William)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Powers McCahill on behalf of Alexandra Uchenik..(McCahill, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert N. Kaplan dated 8/21/2020 re: propose schedule. Document filed by Alexandra Uchenik..(Kaplan, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Bruce W. Steckler dated August 21, 2020 re: Proposal for a Schedule, pursuant to Order dated August 11, 2020. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc...(Steckler, Bruce)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Proposing a Briefing Schedule for Consolidated Amended Complaint and Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Natasha J. Fernandez-Silber dated August 21, 2020. Document filed by Martha Barabas..(Fernandez-Silber, Natasha)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that by August 21, 2020, all parties in In Re: Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation, 20 MDL No. 2946; and Cabral v. Cengage Learning, Inc., et al, 20cv03660 shall submit proposals for a schedule in this litigation, in letters no longer than two pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone conference will be held on September 3, 2020 at 2:30 P.M. The dial-in credentials for the telephone conference are the following: Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall use a landline if one is available. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (jca)
August 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 11, 2020 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:20-cv-03162 (DLC). (sjo)
August 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Delaware, Illinois, New Jersey and New York, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Denise L. Cote, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/11/2020) (sjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGraw Hill, LLC
Represented By: Amy Neda Vegari
Represented By: Saul Benjamin Shapiro
Represented By: William Francis Cavanaugh, Jr
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Ian Macaulay Hansen
Represented By: Lynn Hagman Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Lee R. Crain
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Di Vincenzo
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: John K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Saul Benjamin Shapiro
Represented By: William Francis Cavanaugh, Jr
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Amy N. Vegari
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Ian Macaulay Hansen
Represented By: Lynn Hagman Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cengage Learning, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Vandergeest
Represented By: Andrew Ewalt
Represented By: Richard Sutton Snyder, Sr.
Represented By: Stephanie D. Edelson
Represented By: Glenn A. Clark
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Richard Snyder
Represented By: Eric Mahr
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Ian Macaulay Hansen
Represented By: Lynn Hagman Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Pica
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Amy Neda Vegari
Represented By: Saul Benjamin Shapiro
Represented By: William Francis Cavanaugh, Jr
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Ian Macaulay Hansen
Represented By: Lynn Hagman Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.
Represented By: Lee R. Crain
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Di Vincenzo
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson Education, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Quinn-Barabanov
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Follett Higher Education Group
Represented By: Linda G. Harvey
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Matt D. Basil
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Publishers Enforcement Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Uchenik
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Marc Edelson
Represented By: Elana Katcher
Represented By: Matthew Powers McCahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Barabas
Represented By: John D. Radice
Represented By: Natasha Juanita Fernandez-Silber
Represented By: April Dawn Lambert
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: David S. Nalven
Represented By: Abbye Rose Klamann Ognibene
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Sobol
Represented By: Lauren Guth Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Warman
Represented By: John D. Radice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Puleo
Represented By: William Gerald Caldes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Khalid
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campus Book Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBSKY, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBSNM, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Kinskey
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Gordon
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Kinskey
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Belen
Represented By: Joseph J. DePalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renttext.com, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJJ Corporation
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Bruce Steckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Alexandra Pelletier
Represented By: Keith J Verrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: M. Samantha Pak
Represented By: Keith J Verrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Joan Padden
Represented By: Keith J Verrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?