People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York et al v. The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts, The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota, People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The State of New Jersey, by Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey, The District of Columbia, by Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia and The State of North Carolina ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina
Defendant: Brian P. Brooks, in his official capacity as Acting Comptroller of the Currency, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency and Brian P. Brooks
Case Number: 1:2021cv00057
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Kevin J. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
March 4, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Kevin J Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24204256. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kevin Burns).(Burns, Kevin)
March 4, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Kevin J Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24204256. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 19, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Kendrick Connolly on behalf of Brian P. Brooks, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency..(Connolly, Christopher)
February 18, 2021 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel Paul Mosteller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of North Carolina ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Mosteller, Daniel) Modified on 2/18/2021 (bcu).
February 18, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #23 MOTION for Daniel Paul Mosteller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of North Carolina. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.; Attorney Affidavit not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. The parties shall dial 888-273-3658 and use access code 7004275 to join the teleconference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/16/2021) (cf)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Nikolai N. Frant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
February 12, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Nikolai N. Frant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23903995. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Nikolai N. Frant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23903995. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nikolai Frant, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - N Frant, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Frant, Nikolai)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Adam Hoiland Welle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Adam Hoiland Welle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23488485. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam Welle, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Welle, Adam)
January 13, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Adam Hoiland Welle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23488485. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Adam Hoiland Welle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam Welle, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Welle, Adam) Modified on 1/12/2021 (aea).
January 12, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #17 MOTION for Adam Hoiland Welle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The affidavit is not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
January 11, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by mail (certified mail, return receipt requested). Document filed by The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota, People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The State of New Jersey, by Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey, People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California, The State of North Carolina ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina, People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, The District of Columbia, by Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts..(McCall, Christopher)
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (sj)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian P. Brooks. (sj)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Myron Lapinig on behalf of People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California..(Lapinig, Christopher)
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian P. Brooks, Acting Comptroller of the Currency, re: #9 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts, People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California, People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado, People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, The District of Columbia, by Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia, The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota, The State of New Jersey, by Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey, The State of North Carolina ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina..(McCall, Christopher)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, re: #9 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts, People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California, People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado, People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, The District of Columbia, by Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia, The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota, The State of New Jersey, by Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey, The State of North Carolina ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina..(McCall, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tim Sheehan on behalf of The State of New Jersey, by Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey..(Sheehan, Tim)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Brian P. Brooks, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. Document filed by The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota, People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The State of New Jersey, by Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey, People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California, The State of North Carolina ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina, People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, The District of Columbia, by Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts..(McCall, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher Leonard McCall. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher Leonard McCall to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 6, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Leonard McCall. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brian P. Brooks. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add party text separately. (jgo)
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Leonard McCall to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 6, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Konopka on behalf of The District of Columbia, by Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia..(Konopka, Kathleen)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane M. Azia on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Azia, Jane)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicklas Arnold Akers on behalf of People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California..(Akers, Nicklas)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian P. Brooks, Acting Comptroller of the Currency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(McCall, Christopher) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jgo).
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(McCall, Christopher) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jgo).
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Leonard McCall on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(McCall, Christopher)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCall, Christopher)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Brian P. Brooks, in his official capacity as Acting Comptroller of the Currency, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23351603)Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(McCall, Christopher) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York et al v. The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California, by Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Nicklas Arnold Akers
Represented By: Christopher Myron Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Minnesota, by Keith Ellison, Attorney General of the State of Minnesota
Represented By: Adam Welle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York
Represented By: Jane M. Azia
Represented By: Christopher Leonard McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of Colorado, by Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Represented By: Nikolai Frant
Represented By: Kevin J. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of New Jersey, by Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey
Represented By: Tim Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The District of Columbia, by Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Kathleen Konopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of North Carolina ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina
Represented By: Daniel Paul Mosteller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Brooks, in his official capacity as Acting Comptroller of the Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Represented By: Christopher Kendrick Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Brooks
Represented By: Christopher Kendrick Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?