Berfet v. New York
Plaintiff: Terrell Berfet
Defendant: New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv00160
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Terrell Berfet 400-430 E 30th Street New York, NY 10016 on 3/1/2021. (aan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Terrell Berfet consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Terrell Berfet.(sc)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against New York, re: amending #2 Complaint.Document filed by Terrell Berfet. Related document: #2 Complaint.(sc)
February 26, 2021 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #9 Letter. Request for Docket Report from T. Berfet received on 2/26/21. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) Modified on 3/1/2021 (sc).
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from T. Berfet, dated 2/20/21 re: I filed a lawsuit about a couple of weeks ago and I have not received a response. I would like to meet in person and talk with you about this ongoing event of your people talking and killing me etc. Document filed by Terrell Berfet.(sc)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-0160 (LLS). An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/16/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/16/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 16, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Terrell Berfet.(sc)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 2/11/2021. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 2/11/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/12/21) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 11, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Louis L. Stanton is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Terrell Berfet consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Terrell Berfet..(rdz)
January 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against New York. Document filed by Terrell Berfet..(rdz)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Terrell Berfet..(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berfet v. New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Berfet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?