KARIO-PAUL BROWN v. ASHOK VEMURI
Plaintiff: ABC, Brown Kario-Paul and Kario-Paul Brown
Defendant: Brian Webb-Walsh, Vemuri Ashok, DEF and Ashok Vemuri
Petitioner: Jack Kiner
Nominal Defendant: Conduent Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00239
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED DERIVATIVE ACTIONS FOR CERTAIN PURPOSES, APPOINTING LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL, AND DEFERRING RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS: Defendants need not answer, move, or otherwise respond to any of the individual complaints filed in the Related Derivative Actions. Within forty-five (45) days of the entry of an order consolidating the Related Derivative Actions pursuant to this Stipulation, the parties shall meet and confer, and present a proposed case management/scheduling order for the Court's approval. The following actions are hereby related and consolidated into one consolidated action for all purposes other than adjudicating issues of pleading and proof regarding contentions of wrongful demand refusal and demand futility: Kiner v. Webb-Walsh, et al., 1:20-cv-10964-MKV and Brown v. Vemuri, et al., 1:21-cv-00239-MKV. Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Derivative Action, or in any other action subsequently included herein, shall bear the following caption; as set forth herein. The files of the Consolidated Derivative Action shall be maintained in one file under Master Docket No. 1:20-cv-10964-MKV. Demand Lead Counsel shall be: ROBBINS LLP, BRIAN J. ROBBINS, CRAIG W. SMITH, SHANE P. SANDERS, EMILY R. BISHOP; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/3/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-10964-MKV, 1:21-cv-00239-MKV (mro)
March 3, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-10964-MKV. (mro)
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Conduent Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Document filed by Kario-Paul Brown..(Licata, Vincent)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ashok Vemuri waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Document filed by Kario-Paul Brown..(Licata, Vincent)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brian Webb-Walsh waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Document filed by Kario-Paul Brown..(Licata, Vincent)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Conduent Inc., Ashok Vemuri, Brian Webb-Walsh. Document filed by Kario-Paul Brown..(Licata, Vincent)
February 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Vincent Licata to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-10964. Document filed by ABC..(Licata, Vincent)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Licata, Vincent)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against DEF. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23617060)Document filed by ABC. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Kario-Paul Brown Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23.1(b)).(Licata, Vincent) Modified on 2/16/2021 (gp).
January 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
January 21, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-10964-MKV. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
January 21, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF KARIO-PAUL BROWN PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23.1 (b). Document filed by Brown Kario-Paul. : ( This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 (the unsealing Order). (ama).(ama)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20cv10964. Document filed by Brown Kario-Paul. ( This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 (the unsealing Order).(ama)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION: as to Vemuri Ashok, Brian Webb-Walsh, Conduent Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Vemuri Request for Summons, #2 Supplement Webb-Walsh Summons Request). (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 (the unsealing Order). (ama)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET: ( This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 (the unsealing Order). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider, #2 Supplement Blank Civil Cover Sheet).(ama)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CASE UNDER SEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff may file under seal his Case. The case will remain under seal for a period of seven (7) days, to permit Plaintiff to file a redacted version of the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint on the public docket. Plaintiff will also be permitted to file the unredacted version of the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint under seal. (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 (the unsealing Order). (Signed by Part I Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/11/2021) (ama)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(nmo)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***Sealed*** ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 01/11/2021) (nmo)
January 12, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil as possibly related to 20-cv-10964. (nmo)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff may file under seal his case. The case will remain under seal for a period of seven (7) days, to permit Plaintiff to file a redacted version of the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint on the public docket. Plaintiff will also be permitted to file the Unredacted version of the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint under seal. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 01/11/2021)(jus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARIO-PAUL BROWN v. ASHOK VEMURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Conduent Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Webb-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vemuri Ashok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashok Vemuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC
Represented By: Vincent A Licata, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Kario-Paul
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Seth David Rigrodsky
Represented By: Vincent A Licata, I
Represented By: Timothy John MacFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kario-Paul Brown
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Seth David Rigrodsky
Represented By: Vincent A Licata, I
Represented By: Timothy John MacFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jack Kiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?