Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund et al v. A Plus Painting Inc.
Petitioner: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O. and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Respondent: A Plus Painting Inc. a/k/a A Plus Painting & Construction, A Plus Painting Inc. and A Plus Painting & Construction
Case Number: 1:2021cv00287
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: that the Petitioners have judgment against Respondent in the liquidated amount of $743.40, which is the principal amount of the arbitration award that is the subject of the Petition. ORDERED, that the Judgment rendered by the court on this day in favor of the Petitioners be entered as a final judgment against Respondent and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter such judgment forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/26/2021) (mml)
February 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2021. Plaintiff/Petitioner's Motion for a Default Judgment granted. J udgment to be submitted by counsel. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order served on A Plus Painting Inc a/k/a A Plus Painting & Construction on 2/17/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Petition and Summons served on A Plus Painting Inc a/k/a A Plus Painting Construction on 1/15/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court convened an initial pretrial conference today, but petitioners had not yet served the summons and petition on respondent. A second initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for Feb. 26, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. Petitioners shall serve respondents prior to that conference. The Court will permit no further adjournments. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/11/2021) (kv)
February 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/11/2021, ( Status Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
February 11, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.The public may listen in by dialing 888-363-4735 USA toll-free, 215-446-3657 international caller paid, access code 1086415..(Kotowski, Linda)
February 2, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.The dial-in information remains the same as previously posted). (Kotowski, Linda)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Dial in information 888-363-4735, Access code 1086415, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/20/2021) (jwh)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A Plus Painting Inc...(jgo)
January 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lauren Michelle Kugielska. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund; A Plus Painting Inc. a/k/a A Plus Painting & Construction. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Lauren Kugielska in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decision & Award, #2 Exhibit B- CBA, #3 Exhibit C- Notice to Arbitrate, #4 Exhibit D-Decision Cover Letter, #5 Exhibit E- Demand Letter).(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A Plus Painting Inc. a/k/a A Plus Painting & Construction, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Lauren Kugielska in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decision & Award, #2 Exhibit B- CBA, #3 Exhibit C- Notice to Arbitrate, #4 Exhibit D-Decision Cover Letter, #5 Exhibit E- Demand Letter).(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23488343).Document filed by Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Memorandum of Law).(Kugielska, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund et al v. A Plus Painting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O.
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Plus Painting Inc. a/k/a A Plus Painting & Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Plus Painting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Plus Painting & Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?