People of the State of New York v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York and People of The State of New York
Defendant: Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea, City Of New York and Mayor Bill de Blasio
Interested Party: Sergeants Benevolent Association
Intervenor Defendant: Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Detectives Endowment Association of New York City
Case Number: 1:2021cv00322
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Sherlock Smith on behalf of Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Smith, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/22/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 8, 2021 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2021 before Judge Colleen McMahon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 8, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jaclyn Hillary Grodin on behalf of People of The State of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10291-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 1:21-cv-00533-CM.(Grodin, Jaclyn)
March 6, 2021 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Remy Green dated 2021-03-06 re: In Re: New York City Policing During Summer 2020 Demonstrations, 20 Civ. 8924 (CM)(GWG) (Amended Complaint in Sow (21-cv-533)). Document filed by Adama Sow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint in Sow (21-cv-533))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(Green, Remy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 51 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea.Document filed by People of The State of New York. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Clarke, Jessica)
March 4, 2021 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (51 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 48 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association. . Document filed by Dectectives Endowment Association of New York City. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(McQuade, Stephen)
March 4, 2021 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Stephen Mc Quade in Support re: (51 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 48 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association.. Document filed by Dectectives Endowment Association of New York City. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(McQuade, Stephen)
March 4, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association. Document filed by Dectectives Endowment Association of New York City.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(McQuade, Stephen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Joseph Alejandro in Support re: (45 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 48 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 45 in 1:20-cv-10541-CM) MOTION to Intervene as a party-defendant.. Document filed by Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 A: Statement to the New York Attorney General's Office by the Police Benevolent Association dated June 17, 2020)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(Dolan, Richard)
March 3, 2021 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (48 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 45 in 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 45 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene as a party-defendant. . Document filed by Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(Dolan, Richard)
March 3, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Intervene as a party-defendant. Document filed by Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(Dolan, Richard)
March 3, 2021 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #43 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Sergeants Benevolent Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sgt. Edward D. Mullins, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Prof. Bruce A. Green, #3 Proposed Answer).(Coles, Anthony)
March 3, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Sergeants Benevolent Association..(Coles, Anthony)
March 3, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Henry Dolan on behalf of Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(Dolan, Richard)
March 3, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Aquinas Kissane on behalf of Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM.(Kissane, Thomas)
March 3, 2021 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association. . Document filed by Detectives Endowment Association of New York City..(McQuade, Stephen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Stephen Mc Quade in Support re: #38 MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association.. Document filed by Detectives Endowment Association of New York City. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16).(McQuade, Stephen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association. Document filed by Detectives Endowment Association of New York City..(McQuade, Stephen)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The above-referenced actions have been referred to the undersigned for pre-trial supervision as set forth in Paragraph 8 of Docket # 40 in 20 Civ. 8924. All applications to the undersigned must comply with this Court's Individual Practices, which are available at:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-gabriel-w-gorenstein. The parties must comply with the deadlines set by Chief Judge McMahon in Docket#40. In addition, the Court orders the following interim deadlines as requested by the parties in their letter dated March 1, 2021 (Docket # 42 in 20 Civ. 8924): March 18, 2021: Initial Disclosures due March 25, 2021: First Request for Documents and First Set of Interrogatories dueApril 8, 2021: Defendants to provide proposed date for completion of document production April 26, 2021: Objections and Responses due; production of documents to begin. Additionally, by June 1, 2021, the parties must confer to reserve in the summer and fall a sufficient number of deposition dates for which all counsel must be available even if specific deponents are not attached to any particular date. Depositions shall be scheduled as soon as practicable. The parties shall not require a deponent to appear for a deposition after Friday, December 3, 2021, unless all parties agree otherwise or the Court orders otherwise. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/02/2021) (ama)
March 2, 2021 Filing 36 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein dated March 1, 2021 re: Interim Discovery Deadlines. Document filed by People of The State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian)
February 22, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2021. Decision: Initial conference held. Refer to docket for scheduling order. Submitted by: Chloe Lewis. (mde)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2021. Any motion for leave to intervene, by any party, must be filed by 3/3/2021. Responses due 3/19/2021. Replies due 3/26/2021. Motions to dismiss the complaints must be filed by close of business on 3/26/2021. Responsive papers are due 4/16/2021. Replies are due 4/30/2021. The case is referred to The Hon. Gabriel W. Gorenstein for all pre-trial supervision other than the motions to dismiss and for leave to intervene. "All discovery" means ALL discovery, including expert discovery, individual discovery and Monell discovery. Potential class plaintiffs should be deposed by July 1, 2021, so that class certification motions can be made no later than September 10, 2021. Deposition due by 7/1/2021. Motions due by 11/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/22/2021) (va)
February 19, 2021 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Stephen McQuade dated 02/19/2021 re: preliminary conference. Document filed by Detectives Endowment Association of New York City..(McQuade, Stephen)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The Court will hold a conference in this matter on Monday, February 22, 2021, at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 24A. This is an open proceeding, but we have limited space in the courtroom due to the Covid-19 pandemic and social distancing requirements. Members of the public and press may dial in at: 888-363-4749; the Access Code is: 9054506. This line will remain on mute for the duration of the conference. (Signed by Chief Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/19/2021) (jca)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for a: Rule (16) conference on Monday, February 22, 2021 at 2:00 P.M. before the Honorable Colleen McMahon, United States District Judge in Courtroom 24A, U.S. District Court, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing and faxed to Chambers at (212) 805-6326. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Chief Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/18/2021) (jca)
February 16, 2021 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Anthony P. Coles dated February 16, 2021 re: advising that the Sergeants Benevolent Association anticipates moving to intervene under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) and (b). Document filed by Sergeants Benevolent Association..(Coles, Anthony)
February 15, 2021 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brachah Goykadosh, Elissa Jacobs and Dara L. Weiss dated February 15, 2021 re: Defendants' positions on coordinated discovery, consolidation and anticipated motions. Document filed by Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea..(Weiss, Dara)
February 12, 2021 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon dated February 12, 2021 re: Consolidation. Document filed by People of The State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian)
February 4, 2021 Case Stayed. (mml)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER terminating #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. All proceedings in all cases are stayed until we hold our conference. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/4/2021) (mml)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/4/2021) (mml)
February 4, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Document filed by Towaki Kamatsu, a non-party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(sc)
February 3, 2021 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Respectfully Request that the Court Sine Die Extend Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaints in These Related Cases Until After the In Person Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brachah Goykadosh dated February 3, 2021. Document filed by Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea..(Goykadosh, Brachah)
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dara Lynn Weiss on behalf of Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea..(Weiss, Dara)
February 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brachah Goykadosh on behalf of Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea..(Goykadosh, Brachah)
January 25, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-08924-CM.. (kv)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Please docket this notice from Chief Judge McMahon in cases: Payne v. DiBlasio, 20 Civ. 8924; Wood v. City of New York, 20 Civ. 10541; People v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 322; Sow v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 533. Counsel: I now have four matters on my docket relating to the conduct of the NYPD in connection with various demonstrations that occurred in New York City during 2020, that are connected to the Black Lives Matter (BLM) movement and the deaths of George Floyd and other individuals at the hands of law enforcement officials in other jurisdictions. They are Payne v. DiBlasio, 20 Civ. 8924, Wood v. City of New York, 20 Civ. 10541, People v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 322, Sow v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 533. I preliminarily consolidated these cases for pre-trial purposes. The defendants have moved to deconsolidate Payne and Wood, and the plaintiffs in Payne object to consolidation of their action with the Attorney General's suit, though they do not object to coordinated discovery and joint motion practice on the common issues of law and fact regarding policies and practices of the NYPD that undergird all four of these lawsuits. I note that Wood, People and Sow were all filed as "related cases" to Payne - and so they are, whether they end up being tried together or not - so I anticipate that most pre-trial matters, and certainly discovery, will be consolidated. I want to conference all four cases initially, so I can get my head around how to manage these cases and start them moving. I want that conference to take place in person - "in person" meaning that no more than two attorneys for each plaintiff and no more than four attorneys for the defendants may be present in my courtroom, masked and socially distanced, at an on-the-record conference. We cannot possibly accommodate all the members of the public who would want to be present at this conference, even with an overflow courtroom; we will provide a call in number for maximum public access. At present, as you know, we are not holding in person proceedings in the federal courthouses, so the February 5 date that is currently on your calendars will not work. I would like to schedule this proceeding for the week of February 16-17-18-19. As to the exact date, I would prefer to suit the convenience of counsel, so please confer and be in touch with my deputy clerk, Mariela de Jesus, Mariela_DeJesus@nysd.uscourts.gov with suggested dates and times during that week. You should be prepared to discuss anticipated motions, coordinated discovery and the reasons why these cases should or should not be consolidated. If each plaintiff and the defendants would file a letter of no more than three pages summarizing your positions at last five days prior to the conference; you can flesh them out fully at the conference. There really is no need to make a lot of formal procedural motions; I would rather hear you outline your positions and rule from the bench. Magistrate Judge Gorenstein is the assigned MJ on these cases. I will be inviting him to participate at this conference as well. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/25/2021) (mml) Modified on 2/5/2021 (mml).
January 21, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Document filed by People of The State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian)
January 21, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Document filed by People of The State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Mayor Bill de Blasio served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Document filed by People of The State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for a: Telephone conference on Friday, February 5, 2021 at 11:30 A.M. before the Honorable Colleen McMahon, United States District Judge. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing and faxed to Chambers at (212) 805-6326. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/19/2021) (mml)
January 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
January 19, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 19, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-08924-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. City Of New York served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by People of The State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan. (sj)
January 15, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea. (sj)
January 15, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mayor Bill de Blasio. (sj)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (sj)
January 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:20cv8924. (sj)
January 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
January 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica Clarke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: People of the State of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Levitz on behalf of People of The State of New York..(Levitz, Philip)
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Morril on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Morril, Gregory)
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Travis William England on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(England, Travis)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lillian Marie Marquez on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Clarke, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Clarke, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayor Bill de Blasio, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Clarke, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Clarke, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morenike Fajana on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Fajana, Morenike)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-08924. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Clarke, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clarke, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23509112)Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Clarke, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of New York v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan
Represented By: Brachah Goykadosh
Represented By: Dara Lynn Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea
Represented By: Brachah Goykadosh
Represented By: Dara Lynn Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Brachah Goykadosh
Represented By: Dara Lynn Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Represented By: Brachah Goykadosh
Represented By: Dara Lynn Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York
Represented By: Morenike Fajana
Represented By: Gregory Morril
Represented By: Travis William England
Represented By: Jessica Clarke
Represented By: Lillian Marie Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of The State of New York
Represented By: Morenike Fajana
Represented By: Gregory Morril
Represented By: Travis William England
Represented By: Jessica Clarke
Represented By: Lillian Marie Marquez
Represented By: Philip Levitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sergeants Benevolent Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Henry Dolan
Represented By: Thomas Aquinas Kissane
Represented By: Robert Sherlock Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Detectives Endowment Association of New York City
Represented By: Stephen McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?