Natural Resources Defense Council v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 1:2021cv00461
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 300 g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency served on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021; Andrew Wheeler served on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- EPA, #2 Exhibit B -- Acting Administrator, #3 Exhibit C -- US Atty's Office, #4 Exhibit D -- US Attorney General).(Colangelo, Aaron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Pre-Conference Statement filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for Friday, March 5, 2021 at 12:00 P.M., is hereby adjourned to Friday, April 30, 2021, at 11:00 A.M. A joint status update is due no later than Thursday, April 22, 2021. All parties and any interested members of the public must attend by dialing 1-888-363-4749, using the access code 3121171, and the security code 0461. All attendees are advised to mute their phones when not speaking and to self-identify each time they speak. Recording or rebroadcasting the proceeding is strictly prohibited by law. ( Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/26/2021) (cf)
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Bannon on behalf of U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler..(Bannon, Zachary)
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT . Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council..(Colangelo, Aaron)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #16 Motion for Aaron Schaer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/01/2021) (ama)
January 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Aaron Schaer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Schaer, Aaron)
January 29, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Aaron Schaer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 22, 2021 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Aaron Schaer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23648401. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Schaer, Aaron) Modified on 1/22/2021 (bcu).
January 22, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Aaron Schaer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23648401. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Michigan and Washington;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency..(dnh)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on March 5, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 0461. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/21/2021) (cf) Modified on 2/4/2021 (cf).
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council..(Colangelo, Aaron)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #9 Motion for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/20/2021) (ama)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Wheeler..(pc)
January 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aaron Colangelo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Aaron Colangelo to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party names on summons must EXACTLY match how they are listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Aaron Colangelo to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23576389. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Colangelo, Aaron) Modified on 1/20/2021 (ad).
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council..(Colangelo, Aaron) Modified on 1/20/2021 (pc).
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council..(Colangelo, Aaron) Modified on 1/20/2021 (pc).
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council..(Colangelo, Aaron) Modified on 1/20/2021 (pc).
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council..(Colangelo, Aaron)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23576389. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Colangelo, Aaron) Modified on 1/19/2021 (vba).
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council..(Colangelo, Aaron)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Colangelo, Aaron)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23576138)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Colangelo, Aaron)
January 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23576389. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit Not Notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Zachary Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Zachary Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Aaron Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?