Wilson v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Rhashawn Wilson
Defendant: City Of New York, William Dunn, Karl Rugg, Nicholas McQuail and John or Jane Doe 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00479
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Karl Rugg served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. Service was accepted by Det Phillips. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rhashawn Wilson..(Nath, Sameer)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. William Dunn served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021; Nicholas McQuail served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was accepted by P.O. Davis, PRAA Kerry. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rhashawn Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Nicholas McQuail 2.16.21).(Nath, Sameer)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nelson Leese on behalf of City Of New York..(Leese, Nelson)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/23/2021) (jca)
January 22, 2021 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information..(rpr)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York, William Dunn, Nicholas McQuail, Karl Rugg..(pc)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nath, Sameer)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Nicholas McQuail, William Dunn, Karl Rugg, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rhashawn Wilson..(Nath, Sameer)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Nicholas McQuail, William Dunn, Karl Rugg, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rhashawn Wilson..(Nath, Sameer) Modified on 1/20/2021 (jgo).
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rhashawn Wilson..(Nath, Sameer)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nath, Sameer) Modified on 1/20/2021 (jgo).
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of New York, William Dunn, John or Jane Doe 1-10, Nicholas McQuail, Karl Rugg. Document filed by Rhashawn Wilson..(Nath, Sameer)
January 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 20, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-23584592, paid on 1/19/2021..(jgo)
January 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sameer Nath to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sameer Nath to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section does not match as it appears on the pleading caption (William Rugg). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Nelson Leese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas McQuail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhashawn Wilson
Represented By: Sameer Nath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?