Jackson v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Jackson
Defendant: Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz SE, Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC and Allianz of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00570
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc.. Document filed by William Jackson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Squitieri, Olimpio) Modified on 2/22/2021 (tp).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE on #8 Motion for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 8. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/12/2021) (nb)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE on #7 Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 7. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/12/2021) (nb)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23901351. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Goodman, Cole)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23901245. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Skinner, Robert)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth Brust on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Brust, Mary)
February 11, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23901351. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23901245. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
January 27, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 27, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05615-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on William Jackson on 01/22/2021. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc...(Giuffra, Robert)
January 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Jackson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (gp)
January 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
January 22, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 1:20-cv-5615. (gp)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-5615. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc...(Giuffra, Robert)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC; Corporate Parent Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P.; Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz of America, Inc.; Corporate Parent PFP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC; Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America LLC; Corporate Parent Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.; Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management GmbH. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc...(Giuffra, Robert)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendants' Addresses).(Giuffra, Robert)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650015/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23628485).Document filed by Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P., Allianz SE, Allianz Asset Management GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Chart of Defendants' Citizenship).(Giuffra, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz SE
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Asset Management GmbH
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Brust
Represented By: Cole A Goodman
Represented By: Robert A. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Asset Management of America LLC
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Asset Management of America, L.P.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz of America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?