Harris v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Plaintiff: Dave Harris
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), National Association and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00575
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ONLY: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff Dave Harris, through his attorneys, Law Offices of Robert S. Gitmeid & Associates, PLLC, hereby dismiss Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., only, without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/10/2021) (jca)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Capital One Bank (USA), National Association. Document filed by Dave Harris. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Oh, Kenny)
February 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul G. Gardephe for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY: The Court having been advised that all claims against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC ("Equifax") have been settled, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Equifax are dismissed with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that if the settlement is not consummated within thirty days of this order, either party may apply by letter within the thirty-day period for restoration of Plaintiff's claims against Equifax to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event Plaintiff's claims against Equifax will be restored. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Any pending dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die, and any pending motions are moot, as to Equifax. SO ORDERED. Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/1/2021) (jca)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on April 29, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT(S) MUST: (i) IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL ATTORNEYS IN THIS ACTION BY SERVING UPON EACH OF THEM COPIES OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURTS INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES; AND (ii) SEND A COPY OF SUCH NOTICE TO CHAMBERS (without attachments). IF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT(S) IS UNAWARE OF THE IDENTITY OF COUNSEL FOR ANY OF THE PARTIES, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT(S) MUST IMMEDIATELY SEND COPIES OF THE NOTICE AND INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO THAT PARTY PERSONALLY. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Seven days before the conference, the parties must submit a joint letter addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/30/2021) (ama)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement AS TO EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY. Document filed by Dave Harris..(Oh, Kenny)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenny G. Oh on behalf of Dave Harris..(Oh, Kenny)
January 26, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nicodemus, Camille)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 160163/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23640594).Document filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint To Trans Union, LLC).(Nicodemus, Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Harris
Represented By: Kenny G. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?