Doe v. Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Jake Burns, Individually, Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C. and Jake Burns
Case Number: 1:2021cv00609
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File under pseudonym . . Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lawson v. Rubin Slip Opinion).(Mesidor, Marjorie)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record (or where a party is not yet represented, such party) and, if necessary, provide them with a copy of this order. 2. Except as noted in Paragraph S below, counsel for all parties are directed to confer, complete and sign the attached "Civil Case Management Plan" and to fax it to the Court within thirty (30) days. The parties are free to set their own deadlines as long as the plan provides for the completion of all discovery within six months of this order and the filing of a proposed "joint final-pretrial order," within forty-five days of the close of discovery. (The "trial ready" date is to be left blank.) If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 5/6/2021 at 11:45 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference, as further set forth. (Telephone Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 11:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 11:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/17/2021) (mml)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marjorie Mesidor on behalf of Jane Doe. New Address: Phillips & Associates, PLLC, Phillips & Associates PLLC, 585 Stewart Avenue, Suite 410, Garden City, NY, United States 11530, 2122487431..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File under pseudonym . . Document filed by Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C...(Blumetti, Jared)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File under pseudonym . . Document filed by Jake Burns..(Steer, Richard)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Jake Burns in Opposition re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File under pseudonym .. Document filed by Jake Burns..(Steer, Richard)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Jake Burns answer due 4/9/2021. Granted. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/16/2021) (mml)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/5/2021 Replies due by 3/19/2021. (mml)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #9 Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule (Motion Doc. 5) addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Richard L. Steer dated February 15, 2021. Document filed by Jake Burns..(Steer, Richard)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Toevs Carolan on behalf of Jake Burns..(Carolan, Tara)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #20) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Toevs Carolan on behalf of Jake Burns, Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C...(Carolan, Tara) Modified on 2/10/2021 (ldi).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Francis Schmedlin on behalf of Jake Burns..(Schmedlin, William)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Lane Steer on behalf of Jake Burns..(Steer, Richard)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jake Burns served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. Service was accepted by JOHN OREFICE, CO-WORKER. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Phillips, William)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The briefing schedule is OK with me. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/2/2021) (mml)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/5/2021 Replies due by 3/19/2021. (mml)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Thomas McPartland on behalf of Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C...(McPartland, Patrick)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Evan Blumetti on behalf of Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C...(Blumetti, Jared)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jared E. Blumetti dated January 29, 2021. Document filed by Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C...(Blumetti, Jared)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted for substantially the reasons articulated by Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/28/2021) (mml)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Jake Burns, Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C.. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue).(Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C.. (sj)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jake Burns. (sj)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marjorie Mesidor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau. (sj)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marjorie Mesidor to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File under pseudonym . . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File under pseudonym . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jake Burns, Individually, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Jane Doe. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23649444)Document filed by Jane Doe.(Mesidor, Marjorie) Modified on 1/25/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Marjorie Mesidor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Burns, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polise Consulting Engineers, D.P.C.
Represented By: Jared Evan Blumetti
Represented By: Patrick Thomas McPartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Burns
Represented By: Tara Toevs Carolan
Represented By: William Francis Schmedlin
Represented By: Richard Lane Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?