Jiang v. Pekoske et al
Plaintiff: Zhen Da Jiang
Defendant: Mark Hazuda, Monty Wilkinson, Secretary of DHS David Pekoske, Tracey Renaud and David Pekoske
Case Number: 1:2021cv00703
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mark Hazuda answer due 6/6/2021; David Pekoske answer due 6/6/2021; Tracey Renaud answer due 6/6/2021; Monty Wilkinson answer due 6/6/2021. (cf)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 8. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/26/2021) (cf)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the government to respond to the complaint (from April 6 to June 4, 2021) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated March 25, 2021. Document filed by Mark Hazuda, David Pekoske, Tracey Renaud, Monty Wilkinson..(Byars, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Mark Hazuda, David Pekoske, Tracey Renaud, Monty Wilkinson..(Byars, Michael)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Mark Hazuda served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; David Pekoske served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Tracey Renaud served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Monty Wilkinson served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zhen Da Jiang..(Zheng, Taobo)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 31, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/28/21) (yv)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Hazuda, David Pekoske, Tracey Renaud, Monty Wilkinson..(pc)
January 27, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 27, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 27, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Taobo Zheng. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mark Hazuda, David Pekoske, Tracey Renaud, Monty Wilkinson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Pekoske, Tracey Renaud, Mark Hazuda, Monty Wilkinson, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Zhen Da Jiang..(Zheng, Taobo)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zheng, Taobo)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Mark Hazuda, David Pekoske, Tracey Renaud, Monty Wilkinson (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23694435).Document filed by Zhen Da Jiang..(Zheng, Taobo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiang v. Pekoske et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS David Pekoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Renaud
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pekoske
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhen Da Jiang
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?