Liu v. Democratic National Committee (DNC)
Plaintiff: Lewis Y Liu
Defendant: Democratic National Committee (DNC) and Democratic National Committee
Case Number: 1:2021cv00767
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2021 by Telephone Conference. Yu-Xi Liu present by telephone for Plaintiff. Elisabeth Frost and Jacob Shelly present by telephone for Defendant. Court reporter present by telephone. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. (mf) Modified on 3/17/2021 (mf).
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Jacob Shelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (wt)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Elisabeth C. Frost dated March 5, 2021 re: Technical Issue With Conference. Document filed by Democratic National Committee..(Frost, Elisabeth)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER Letter re: #19 Technical Issue With Conference filed by Democratic National Committee. The Initial Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to March 12, 2021 at 3:00PM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. The rescheduling is as a result of a docketing error which incorrectly calendared today's Initial Conference on the Court's calendar, and through no fault of the parties. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 3/12/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Democratic National Committee..(Frost, Elisabeth)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Democratic National Committee. Responses due by 4/5/2021 Return Date set for 4/20/2021 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Frost, Elisabeth)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Elisabeth C. Frost dated March 4, 2021 re: Agreement on the Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Democratic National Committee..(Frost, Elisabeth)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Letter re: Case Management Plan).(Frost, Elisabeth)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Jacob Shelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Shelly, Jacob)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Jacob Shelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Jacob Shelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24055028. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit not Notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jacob Shelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24055028. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Shelly, Jacob) Modified on 2/24/2021 (wb).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Elisabeth C. Frost dated February 23, 2021 re: Defendant Democratic National Committee's Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Democratic National Committee..(Frost, Elisabeth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Democratic National Committee..(Frost, Elisabeth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elisabeth C. Frost on behalf of Democratic National Committee..(Frost, Elisabeth)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Democratic National Committee served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service was accepted by Ms. Emma Olsen Sharpkey, Esq. Document filed by Lewis Y Liu..(Liu, Yu-Xi)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Hugh Schuman on behalf of Democratic National Committee..(Schuman, Adam)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 5, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/12/2021) (cf)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Democratic National Committee..(jgo)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Y Liu..(Liu, Yu-Xi)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Y Liu..(Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 2/2/2021 (sj).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Democratic National Committee (DNC). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-23722708, paid on 1/28/2021..(dnh)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Liu, Yu-Xi)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Democratic National Committee (DNC). Document filed by Lewis Y Liu..(Liu, Yu-Xi)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Lewis Y Liu. Document filed by Lewis Y Liu..(Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 1/29/2021 (dnh).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 2/2/2021. (dnh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Democratic National Committee (DNC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic National Committee (DNC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Jacob D Shelly
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Adam Hugh Schuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Y Liu
Represented By: Yu-Xi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?