Castillo Maradiaga v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Javier Castillo Maradiaga
Respondent: Acting Secretary Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Acting Attorney Gene Monty Wilkinson, Field Office Dir. Thomas Decker, Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor and Monty Wilkinson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00842
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/4/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 26, 2021 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2021 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 12, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/26/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 12, 2021 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2021 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: On March 4, 2021, the Court issued an oral decision granting Petitioner's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for release pursuant to Mapp v. Reno, 241 F.3d 221, 230 (2d Cir. 2001). (See Minute Entry for March 4, 2021). On March 8, 2021, the Government filed a letter requesting clarification of the scope of the relief granted in the March 4, 2021 decision. (Dkt. #25). The Court clarifies that the relief granted is limited to the relief sought by Petitioner in his Motion for a Preliminary Injunction: (i) a stay of removal pending ultimate adjudication of Petitioner's habeas petition; and (ii) release from custody during the pendency of the habeas action pursuant to Mapp. The Court is also in receipt of the parties' joint letter filed March 8, 2021, proposing that Petitioner be released during the pendency of the habeas action subject to an Order of Supervision administered by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Dkt. #24). The Court approves the terms of release as set forth in the proposed Order of Supervision. The Court's March 4, 2021 ruling remains stayed through March 10, 2021, to permit the Government to pursue an appeal with the Second Circuit if it so desires. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/9/2021) (nb)
March 8, 2021 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebecca R. Friedman dated March 8, 2021 re: request for clarification of the relief granted in Court's March 4, 2021 oral decision. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson..(Friedman, Rebecca)
March 8, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, On Behalf of Both Parties dated 03/08/2021 re: Agreed Conditions of Release. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Supervision).(Austin, Paige)
March 4, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, Counsel for Petitioner dated 03/04/2021 re: Response to Government Letter. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga..(Austin, Paige)
March 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2021 re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga: For the reasons set forth on the record, Petitioner's motion for Preliminary Injunction to stay his removal is GRANTED, and Petitioner's motion to be released from custody pursuant to Mapp is GRANTED. To permit the parties to consult on a bail package, and/or the Government to pursue an appeal with the Second Circuit, the Court's ruling is STAYED through March 10, 2021. The parties shall file either a joint letter or separate letters by COB, Monday, March 8, 2021, outlining the bond conditions agreed to, and any disputes if any. (See transcript.) (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (tn)
March 3, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebecca R. Friedman dated March 3, 2021 re: Response to Petitioner's Letter and Factual Updates Since Argument. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter).(Friedman, Rebecca)
March 3, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, Counsel for Petitioner dated 03/03/2021 re: Further Update Since Argument. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga..(Austin, Paige)
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theresa Dawn Lawson on behalf of Javier Castillo Maradiaga..(Lawson, Theresa)
March 2, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, Counsel for Petitioner dated 03/01/2021 re: Response to Government Letter and Update Since Argument. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga..(Austin, Paige)
March 2, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (tn)
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebecca R. Friedman dated March 1, 2021 re: updated information regarding the petitioners status and correction to a factual error in oral argument statement. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson..(Friedman, Rebecca)
March 1, 2021 NOTICE ADJOURNING HEARING: The conference scheduled for March 2, 2021 is ADJOURNED to March 4, 2021 at 4:00 p.m., which will be held via video conference, with public audio access at (888) 363-4749, access code 5123533. Instructions to video participants will be sent separately, in advance of the conference. (Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn) Modified on 3/2/2021 (tn).
March 1, 2021 NOTICE OF HEARING: A conference is scheduled for March 2, 2021 at 3:00 p.m., which will be held via video conference, with public audio access at (888) 363-4749, access code 5123533. Instructions to video participants will be sent separately. (Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/2/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, Counsel for Petitioner dated 02/26/2021 re: Assessment of Petitioner's Medical Records by Dr. Xavier Pereira. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Dr. Xavier Pereira and CV).(Austin, Paige)
February 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2021 re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga: Attorneys Alina Das and Paige Austin representing Petitioner present. Attorney Rebecca Ruth Friedman representing Respondents present. The Court defers ruling on Petitioner's motion. (See transcript.) (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) (tn)
February 25, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, Counsel for Petitioner dated 02/25/2021 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority and Supplemental Declaration. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Press Supp. Decl.).(Austin, Paige)
February 25, 2021 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE DIAL-IN: The conference scheduled for 2/26/2021 at 12:00 p.m. will be held via video conference, with public audio access at dial-in (917) 933-2166, conference ID code: 977979089#. Instructions to video participants will be sent separately in advance of the conference. ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Austin Decl. and Accompanying Exhibits).(Austin, Paige)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/19/2021) (nb)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, Counsel for Petitioner dated 02/19/2021. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga..(Austin, Paige)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . and In Opposition to Habeas Petition. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gomez v. Decker).(Friedman, Rebecca)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jessica Zapata in Opposition re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ., #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson..(Friedman, Rebecca)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ., #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Government Return. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Order, #2 Exhibit Rap Sheet, #3 Exhibit Rap Sheet, #4 Exhibit IJ Order, #5 Exhibit BIA Decision, #6 Exhibit Stay Denial Letter).(Friedman, Rebecca)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/11/2021) (nb)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebecca R. Friedman dated February 11, 2021. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson..(Friedman, Rebecca)
February 8, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will proceed via video conference, with instructions for video participants and public audio access to be provided in advance of the conference. ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion to Expedite. The Court is in receipt of the above letter motion from Petitioner (Dkt. #6). Petitioner's motion for an expedited briefing schedule on his Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. The Court adopts the proposed briefing schedule as set forth above. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/4/21) (yv)
February 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Responses due by 2/16/2021. Replies due by 2/23/2021. (yv)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Consent of Both Parties addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Paige Austin, Counsel for Petitioner dated 02/04/2021. Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga..(Austin, Paige)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ruth Friedman on behalf of Thomas Decker, Peter Gaynor, Tae Johnson, Monty Wilkinson..(Friedman, Rebecca)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Press Decl. and Accompanying Exhibits).(Austin, Paige)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Alina Das on behalf of Javier Castillo Maradiaga.(Das, Alina)
February 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paige Austin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Defendants. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
February 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paige Austin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (sj)
February 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Austin, Paige)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23751458)Document filed by Javier Castillo Maradiaga..(Austin, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo Maradiaga v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Peter Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tae Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Attorney Gene Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Dir. Thomas Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Gaynor
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Monty Wilkinson
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Castillo Maradiaga
Represented By: Paige Austin
Represented By: Theresa Dawn Lawson
Represented By: Alina Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?