Sabina v. Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chase Sabina
Defendant: Dayton Misfeldt, Steve R. Carchedi, David C. Stump, Steven B. Ketchum, Sol Merger Sub, Inc., Viracta Therapeutics, Inc., Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., James W. Young, Homer L. Pearce, H. Ward Wolff and Nicole Onetto
Case Number: 1:2021cv00860
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
February 23, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
February 23, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00359-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Steve R. Carchedi, Steven B. Ketchum, Dayton Misfeldt, Nicole Onetto, Homer L. Pearce, Sol Merger Sub, Inc., David C. Stump, Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viracta Therapeutics, Inc., H. Ward Wolff, James W. Young. Document filed by Chase Sabina. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(MacFall, Timothy) Modified on 2/23/2021 (dt).
February 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney MacFall, Timothy to RE-FILE Document #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. ERROR(S): action is being Voluntarily Dismissed but not all parties have been selected. (tp)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Steve R. Carchedi, Steven B. Ketchum, Dayton Misfeldt, Nicole Onetto, Homer L. Pearce, Sol Merger Sub, Inc., David C. Stump, Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viracta Therapeutics, Inc. Document filed by Chase Sabina. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(MacFall, Timothy) Modified on 2/18/2021 (tp).
February 1, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 1:21-cv-00359-LAP. (dnh)
February 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-00359. Document filed by Chase Sabina..(MacFall, Timothy)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacFall, Timothy)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steve R. Carchedi, Steven B. Ketchum, Dayton Misfeldt, Nicole Onetto, Homer L. Pearce, Sol Merger Sub, Inc., David C. Stump, Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viracta Therapeutics, Inc., H. Ward Wolff, James W. Young. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23756829)Document filed by Chase Sabina..(MacFall, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabina v. Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton Misfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve R. Carchedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Ketchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sol Merger Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viracta Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer L. Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ward Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Onetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Sabina
Represented By: Timothy John MacFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?