No More Deaths et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights and No More Deaths
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 1:2021cv00954
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by United States Customs and Border Protection. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request is granted. The parties shall submit a joint status update by April 26, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/25/2021) (jca)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lucas Issacharoff dated 3/25/2021 re: Case Status. Document filed by United States Customs and Border Protection..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Customs and Border Protection..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's request is GRANTED. The parties shall have until March 25, 2021 to submit their joint letter. (See Dkt. 6.). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/18/2021) (ama)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Letter addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lucas Issacharoff dated 2/18/2021. Document filed by United States Customs and Border Protection..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States Customs and Border Protection served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by No More Deaths; Center for Constitutional Rights..(Guisado, Angelo)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed three pages, providing (1) a brief description of the materials sought by Plaintiffs, the basis for seeking the materials, and the status of any productions already made; (2) a brief description of any claim exemptions from production by Defendant; (3) an anticipated timeline for production of further materials; and (4) whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need for discovery or an initial conference, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendant has not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of such service. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/9/2021) (nb)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection..(dnh)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, No More Deaths..(Guisado, Angelo)
February 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Angelo Romans-Taylor Guisado to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the FIOA summons form not the standard summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, No More Deaths..(Guisado, Angelo) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc).
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guisado, Angelo)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Customs and Border Protection. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23806328)Document filed by No More Deaths, Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Guisado, Angelo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: No More Deaths et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights
Represented By: Angelo Romans-Taylor Guisado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No More Deaths
Represented By: Angelo Romans-Taylor Guisado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?