McCarthy v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)
Plaintiff: Michael T McCarthy
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00955
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:56
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)..(pc)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, (AMTRAK), re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas)
February 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, (AMTRAK), re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/11/2021 (pc).
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak). Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption; summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo).
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCarthy, Thomas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael T McCarthy. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo).
February 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the docket entry must exactly match how it is listed on the complaint caption title (Amtrak was not included);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
February 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
February 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas M. McCarthy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Michael T McCarthy. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc).
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Michael T McCarthy. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23806718)Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T McCarthy
Represented By: Thomas M. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?