Gill v. National Football League et al
Plaintiff: Sietel Singh Gill
Defendant: National Football League and NFL Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01032
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint. Granted. Defendants' response to the Complaint is due by April 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/26/2021) (jca)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. NFL Enterprises LLC served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, Clerk for the Building. Document filed by Sietel Singh Gill..(Kronenberger, Karl)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NFL Ventures, L.P. for NFL Enterprises LLC. Document filed by NFL Enterprises LLC..(Robinson, Tyler)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Football League..(Robinson, Tyler)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Sara A. Ricciardi dated February 26, 2021. Document filed by NFL Enterprises LLC, National Football League..(Ricciardi, Sara)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Ann Ricciardi on behalf of NFL Enterprises LLC, National Football League..(Ricciardi, Sara)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tyler Brooks Robinson on behalf of NFL Enterprises LLC, National Football League..(Robinson, Tyler)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: NFL Enterprises LLC answer due 4/8/2021; National Football League answer due 4/8/2021. Motions due by 4/8/2021. (jca)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. National Football League served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was accepted by Bonnie Jarrett - Agent for Service. Document filed by Sietel Singh Gill..(Kronenberger, Karl)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NFL Enterprises LLC..(jgo)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Football League..(jgo)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NFL Enterprises, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sietel Singh Gill..(Kronenberger, Karl)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Football League, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sietel Singh Gill..(Kronenberger, Karl)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kronenberger, Karl)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NFL Enterprises LLC, National Football League. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23825966)Document filed by Sietel Singh Gill..(Kronenberger, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sietel Singh Gill
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Sara Ann Ricciardi
Represented By: Tyler Brooks Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Sara Ann Ricciardi
Represented By: Tyler Brooks Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?