Cheng v. T-Mobile USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. calvin cheng and Calvin Cheng
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01085
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc.. Document filed by Calvin Cheng. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Wilson, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #18 Letter filed by Calvin Cheng. ENDORSEMENT: Leave to amend is granted. File amended pleading by May 7. The May 6 conference is adjourned until May 24, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The conference will proceed telephonically. Call-in information is: Dial-In No.: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2021), Initial Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/23/2021) (ama)
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jeffrey L. Wilson, Esq. dated 04/23/2021 re: Advising Court of Plaintiff's Desire to Amend Complaint (Per Court Order dated 4/15/21). Document filed by Calvin Cheng..(Wilson, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #16 Letter filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. Pre-motion letter will be taken up at the conference. Plaintiff's counsel should advise whether he wishes to further amend by April 24, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/15/2021) (ama)
April 14, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John M. Magliery dated April 14, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Conference Letter on T-Mobile's anticipated Motion to Dismiss and to request an adjourn of the Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by T-Mobile USA Inc...(Magliery, John)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Stephen M. Rummage to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for James H. Moon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Stephen M. Rummage to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24370338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Rummage, Stephen)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for James H. Moon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24370123. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Moon, James)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Magliery on behalf of T-Mobile USA Inc...(Magliery, John)
April 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for James H. Moon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24370123. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for Stephen M. Rummage to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24370338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jeffrey L. Wilson dated 3/25/2021 re: Adjournment of the Initial Pretrial Conference. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned from April 12 to May 6, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/26/2021) (ama)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against T-Mobile USA Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Calvin Cheng. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Wilson, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for Plaintiff (or the Removing Defendant) shall immediately send a copy of this order to all parties. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, April 12, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a e agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981. So Ordered Initial Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/9/2021) (js) Modified on 2/10/2021 (js).
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to T-Mobile USA Inc.. (sj)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Lance Wilson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 47:0332; Dollar Demand $450,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 47:0151; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $450,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
February 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Chan on behalf of calvin cheng..(Chan, Henry)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Lance Wilson on behalf of calvin cheng..(Wilson, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T-Mobile USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by calvin cheng..(Wilson, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by calvin cheng..(Wilson, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wilson, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23853809)Document filed by calvin cheng..(Wilson, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheng v. T-Mobile USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Rummage
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: John Michael Magliery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. calvin cheng
Represented By: Henry Chan
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Cheng
Represented By: Henry Chan
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?