New York Marine & General Insurance Company v. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: New York Marine & General Insurance Company
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01112
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John David McKenna on behalf of American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. New Address: LAbbate, Balkan, Colavita & Contini, L.L.P., 3 Huntington Quadrangle, Suite 102-S, Melville, NY, 11747, 5162948844..(McKenna, John)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eileen De Callies on behalf of American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. New Address: LAbbate, Balkan, Colavita & Contini, L.L.P., 3 Huntington Quadrangle, Suite 102-S, Melville, NY, 11747, (516) 294-8844..(De Callies, Eileen)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Eileen de Callies dated March 16, 2021. Application Granted. So Ordered. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company answer due 4/12/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/17/2021) (js)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Eileen de Callies dated March 16, 2021. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(De Callies, Eileen)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John David McKenna on behalf of American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(McKenna, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eileen De Callies on behalf of American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(De Callies, Eileen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ProSight Specialty Insurance Group for New York Marine & General Insurance Company. Document filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company..(Stewart, William)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney William F Stewart to RE-FILE Document #7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. Service was accepted by Connor Davis, Security Agent. Document filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company..(Stewart, William)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company..(Stewart, William) Modified on 3/11/2021 (lb).
March 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney William F Stewart to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(dnh)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company..(Stewart, William)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William F Stewart to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form dated June 2012. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William F Stewart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company..(Stewart, William) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo).
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company..(Stewart, William) Modified on 3/1/2021 (ldi).
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stewart, William)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23858306)Document filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-New York Marine Policy, #2 Exhibit B-Notias and Hillview Contract, #3 Exhibit C-American Empire Policy, #4 Exhibit D-Notias and Stams Subcontract, #5 Exhibit E-Verified Complaint, #6 Exhibit F-American Empire Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G-Third-Party Complaint, #8 Exhibit H-10.22.19 Bill of Particulars).(Stewart, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Marine & General Insurance Company v. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Marine & General Insurance Company
Represented By: William F Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Eileen De Callies
Represented By: John David McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?