Reynolds v. Amtrak et al
Plaintiff: Angela Reynolds
Defendant: AMTRAK A/K/A NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION D/B/A AMTRAK, Long Island Railroad, Metropolitan Transit Authority, Amtrak and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01132
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1349
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Hines on behalf of Amtrak, Long Island Railroad, Metropolitan Transit Authority..(Hines, Patricia)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amtrak, Long Island Railroad, Metropolitan Transit Authority..(Ree, Sophia)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metropolitan Transit Authority..(Ree, Sophia)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Long Island Railroad..(Ree, Sophia)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Washington Terminal Company, Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway for Amtrak. Document filed by Amtrak..(Ree, Sophia)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Metropolitan Transit Authority served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was accepted by Victoria Clement. Document filed by Angela Reynolds..(Brewington, Frederick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Long Island Railroad served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Service was accepted by Ryan Selks. Document filed by Angela Reynolds..(Brewington, Frederick)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, April 23, 2021 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/19/2021) (rjm)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amtrak, Long Island Railroad, Metropolitan Transit Authority..(dnh)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amtrak d/b/a National Railroad Passenger Corporation, The Long Island Railroad, The Metropolitan Transit Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Angela Reynolds..(Brewington, Frederick)
February 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Frederick Kevin Brewington to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frederick Kevin Brewington. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (pc)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frederick Kevin Brewington. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AMTRAK A/K/A NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION D/B/A AMTRAK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brewington, Frederick)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brewington, Frederick)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMTRAK A/K/A NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION D/B/A AMTRAK, Long Island Railroad, Metropolitan Transit Authority. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23863584)Document filed by Angela Reynolds..(Brewington, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Amtrak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Reynolds
Represented By: Frederick Kevin Brewington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMTRAK A/K/A NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION D/B/A AMTRAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Represented By: Patricia Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit Authority
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Represented By: Patricia Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Represented By: Patricia Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Represented By: Patricia Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?