People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York v. Beatty et al
Plaintiff: New York State Attorney General and People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York
Defendant: Bevelyn Beatty and Edmee Chavannes
Case Number: 1:2021cv01159
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court orders as follows: Discovery due by 5/24/2021. Further briefing, including Defendants' obligation to respond to the Complaint, is STAYED pending the completion of discovery. Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/8/21) (yv)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #16 Letter filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall appear for a conference on April 8, 2021 at 9:15 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by teleconference in accordance with Rule 2(A) of the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. (Members of the public and press may also attend using the same dial-in information; they will not be allowed to speak during the conference.) As stated in Rule 2(C)(ii) of the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, no later than 24 hours before the conference, the parties shall send a joint email to the Court with a list of counsel who may speak during the teleconference and the telephone numbers from which counsel expect to join the call. More broadly, counsel should review and comply with the rules and guidance regarding teleconferences set forth in the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 09:15 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/06/2021) (ama)
April 3, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Sandra Pullman dated 4/2/21 re: parties' meet and confer. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Pullman, Sandra)
March 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher A. Ferrara, Off on behalf of Bevelyn Beatty..(Ferrara, Christopher)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order served on Edmee Chavannes and Bevelyn Beatty on 3/25/21. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Defendants Enclosing Court's Order).(Pullman, Sandra)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Edmee Chavannes served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was accepted by Bevelyn Beatty, Defendant. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit re additional service by mail).(Pullman, Sandra)
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bevelyn Beatty served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was accepted by Bevelyn Beatty, Defendant. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Pullman, Sandra)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Sandra E. Pullman dated 2/11/21 re: Manual filing of CD-ROM. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit letter to clerk's office).(Pullman, Sandra)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Plaintiff is ORDERED to confer with Defendants, and, no later than two weeks following service, the parties shall file a joint letter proposing several dates on which both sides could appear for a conference. At that conference, the parties should be prepared to discuss the following: (1) whether any hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction should be consolidated with trial on the merits pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; (2) whether any discovery is needed in connection with the motion and, if so, a schedule; (3) whether an evidentiary hearing is necessary; and (4) a briefing schedule. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants either with the summons and Complaint or, if such service has already been completed, within two business days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/11/21) (yv)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pullman, Sandra)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edmee Chavannes..(pc)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bevelyn Beatty..(pc)
February 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sandra Elizabeth Pullman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Foreign Deposition;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331;. (pc)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sandra Elizabeth Pullman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Second page is missing;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sandra Elizabeth Pullman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York State Attorney General. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
February 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Elizabeth Pullman on behalf of New York State Attorney General..(Pullman, Sandra)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edmee Chavannes, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York State Attorney General..(Pullman, Sandra)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bevelyn Beatty, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York State Attorney General..(Pullman, Sandra)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pullman, Sandra) Modified on 2/10/2021 (pc).
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by New York State Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PI Memo of Law, #2 Affidavit Barnett Declaration with exhibits, #3 Affidavit Betters Declaration with exhibits, #4 Affidavit Verrilli Declaration with exhibits, #5 Affidavit Lyman Declaration with exhibits, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Pullman, Sandra)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York State Attorney General. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-23874934)Document filed by New York State Attorney General..(Pullman, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York v. Beatty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bevelyn Beatty
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferrara, Off
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmee Chavannes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York State Attorney General
Represented By: Sandra Elizabeth Pullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York
Represented By: Sandra Elizabeth Pullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?