Stewart et al v. Nurture, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shannon Fitzgerald, Summer Apicella, Nicole Stewart, Nita Jain and Amy Westin
Defendant: Nurture, Inc.
Interested Party: Jodi Smith
Case Number: 1:2021cv01217
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Angela C Agrura to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Angela C. Agrusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24363989. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nurture, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - A. Agrusa Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - A. Agrusa Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Proposed Order).(Agrusa, Angela)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Angela C. Agrusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24363989. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart. Related Document Number: [DE 8]..(Feldman, Lori) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Lori G. Feldman in Support re: #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 .. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 true and correct copy of the Consolidation Order entered on March 15, 2021 in Keeter v. Gerber Products Co., 1:21-cv-00269-LO-TCB (E.D. Va.),, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 true and correct copy of the Plaintiffs Stipulation [and Proposed Order] to Consolidate Actions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and Order entered on March 19, 2021 in Thomas et al. v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Co., 1:21-cv-0133-TJM-CFH (N.D.N.Y.), ECF No. 55, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 true and correct copy of the Order Consolidating Cases entered on March 9, 2021 in Gulkarov v. Plum PBC, No. 21-cv-00913-YGR (N.D. Cal.), ECF No. 14., #4 Exhibit Ex 4 true and correct copy of the Related Case Order entered on March 18, 2021 in Gulkarov v. Plum PBC, No. 21-cv-00913-YGR (N.D. Cal.), ECF No. 22.).(Feldman, Lori)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . . Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Feldman, Lori)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #21 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . . Document filed by Jodi Smith..(LaDuca, Charles)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . To Stewart Plaintiffs' Request To Schedule Motions To Appoint Interim Lead Counsel By Westin and Jain Plaintiffs. Document filed by Nita Jain, Amy Westin..(Mason, Gary)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . . Document filed by Nurture, Inc...(Hadaghian, Negin)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #15 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart. Related Document Number: #13 ..(Feldman, Lori) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . . Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Feldman, Lori)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Feldman, Lori)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lori Gwen Feldman to RE-FILE Document #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Negin Hadaghian dated March 8, 2021., #2 Complaint. Nurture, Inc. answer due 5/21/2021. GRANTED. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from March 22, 2021, to May 21, 2021. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/9/2021) (nb) Modified on 3/15/2021 (nb).
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Negin Hadaghian dated March 8, 2021. Document filed by Nurture, Inc...(Hadaghian, Negin)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Danone S.A. for Nurture, Inc.. Document filed by Nurture, Inc...(Hadaghian, Negin)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Negin Hadaghian on behalf of Nurture, Inc...(Hadaghian, Negin)
March 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order).(Feldman, Lori) Modified on 3/18/2021 (ldi).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nurture, Inc...(jgo)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Milton Liskow on behalf of Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Liskow, Michael)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nurture, Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Pollack, Janine)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nurture, Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Pollack, Janine) Modified on 2/11/2021 (sj).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pollack, Janine)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nurture, Inc.. Document filed by Nicole Stewart, Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald..(Pollack, Janine)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Janine Lee Pollack. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Plaintiffs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Janine Lee Pollack to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Filing court is omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Nicole Stewart, Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23894561)Document filed by Nicole Stewart, Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald..(Pollack, Janine) Modified on 2/11/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Nurture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Fitzgerald
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Represented By: Lori Gwen Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Apicella
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Represented By: Lori Gwen Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Stewart
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Represented By: Lori Gwen Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nita Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Westin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurture, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Agrusa
Represented By: Negin Hadaghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jodi Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?