Catania et al v. United Federation of Teachers et al
Plaintiff: Scott Murphy and patricia catania
Defendant: Abdul Aqeel williams, William Woodruff, Paul Egan, United Federation of Teachers and Janella Hinds
Case Number: 1:2021cv01257
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 21 EX PARTE LETTER MOTION for Leave to File COMPLAINT -- NUNC PRO TUNC (already efiled) - meaning to have already filed Complaint deemed efiled on Feb. 10, 2021, addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Anthony V. Gentile dated February 18, 2021. Document filed by Patricia Catania, Scott Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Gentile Dec. with internal exs. A-E, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Murphy Dec. with internal ex. A).(Gentile, Anthony)
February 16, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Federation of Teachers..(dnh)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abdul Aqeel Williams(in his official capacity as a labor union representative)..(dnh)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/16/2021) (mro)
February 12, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Federation of Teachers, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Patricia Catania, Scott Murphy..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 12, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abdul Aqeel Williams, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Patricia Catania, Scott Murphy..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Woodruff(in his official capacity as a labor union representative), William Woodruff(in his individual capacity)..(jgo)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Egan(in his individual capacity), Paul Egan(in his official capacity as a labor union representative)..(jgo)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janella Hinds(in her official capacity as a labor union representative), Janella Hinds (in her individual capacity)..(jgo)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Federation ot Teachers and Abdul Aqeel Williams, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Patricia Catania, Scott Murphy..(Gentile, Anthony) Modified on 2/12/2021 (jgo).
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Discrepancies with Request to Correct re: #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. Document filed by Scott Murphy, patricia catania..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anthony Vincent Gentile to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed separately OR one summons may be filed including both party names and information on the PDF 'To' section or attaching a 'rider';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony Vincent Gentile. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 360 (P.I.: Other); Dollar Demand $20,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 440 (Civil Rights: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (jgo)
February 12, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Paul Egan, Janella Hinds, United Federation of Teachers, Abdul Aqeel Williams, William Woodruff, William Woodruff, Paul Egan, Janella Hinds, Abdul Aqeel Williams added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Patricia Catania, Scott Murphy. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Scott Murphy, patricia catania..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Janella Hinds, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Scott Murphy, patricia catania..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Egan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Scott Murphy, patricia catania..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Woodruff, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Scott Murphy, patricia catania..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Scott Murphy, patricia catania..(Gentile, Anthony) Modified on 2/12/2021 (jgo).
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gentile, Anthony) Modified on 2/12/2021 (jgo).
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Notice of Technical Failure and Request for Nunc Pro Tunc Relief re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Scott Murphy, patricia catania..(Gentile, Anthony)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gentile, Anthony) Modified on 2/12/2021 (jgo).
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Egan, Janella Hinds, United Federation of Teachers, William Woodruff, Abdul Aqeel williams. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23904401)Document filed by patricia catania, Scott Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Front Page Newspaper, #2 Exhibit B - - Daily News Print Article, #3 Exhibit C - - Daily News On-Line Article, #4 Exhibit D - - WPIX On-Line Article).(Gentile, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catania et al v. United Federation of Teachers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Aqeel williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Federation of Teachers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janella Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Murphy
Represented By: Anthony Vincent Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: patricia catania
Represented By: Anthony Vincent Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?