Prosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nicole M. Prosa
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv01313
Filed: February 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Referring Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER from Howard D. Olinsky, Esq. dated 3/22/2021 re: Party in the above-mentioned matter does not consent to magistrate jurisdiction. Document filed by Nicole M. Prosa.(ama)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Colleen Branagan on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Branagan, Susan)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Nicole M. Prosa. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 6/7/2021..(Olinsky, Howard)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #8 Order. (sjo)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security..(dnh)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: By separate Order being entered today, this case is being referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/16/2021) (kv)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/16/2021) (cf)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER:WHEREAS Plaintiff has filed a request to proceed in forma pauperis, see Dkt. 3; and WHEREAS Plaintiff is represented by counsel,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. Should this action lead to a monetary settlement or award in an amount equal to or greater than the filing fee, however, Plaintiffs must reimburse the $400.00 filing fee to the Clerk of Court within 15 days of the receipt of the settlement or award. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . filed by Nicole M. Prosa. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/16/2021) (cf)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on April 20, 2016) (sj)
February 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 13, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicole M. Prosa..(Olinsky, Howard)
February 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Nicole M. Prosa..(Olinsky, Howard)
February 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Olinsky, Howard)
February 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Nicole M. Prosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action).(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole M. Prosa
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susan Colleen Branagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?