Curava Corporation v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Curava Corporation
Defendant: Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd and Savino Del Bene SPA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01457
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrew R. Spector, Esq. dated April 7, 2021.. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/9/2021) Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc. answer due 4/27/2021 (ks)
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrew R. Spector, Esq. dated April 7, 2021. Document filed by Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc...(Spector, Andrew)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc. served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service was accepted by Derrick Davis, Legal Support Associate. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was accepted by Allison Rocco, Managing Agent. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 MOTION for Daniel Warren Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/24/2021) (jca)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel Warren Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Curava Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court of Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Raab, Daniel)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel W. Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24050694. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Curava Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit Ceritificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORder).(Raab, Daniel) Modified on 2/23/2021 (wb).
February 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Daniel Warren Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Daniel W. Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24050694. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/22/2021) (jca)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc...(pc)
February 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, and Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fennell, William)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23991687)Document filed by Curava Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 (MSC Sea Waybill), #2 Exhibit #2 (Savino Freight Bill)).(Fennell, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curava Corporation v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Robert Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Represented By: Mark A. Beckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savino Del Bene SPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curava Corporation
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Daniel W Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?