Li v. Renaud et al
Plaintiff: Wen Li
Defendant: Mark Hazuda, Monty Wilkinson and Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 1:2021cv01666
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The application is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 18, 2021. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 22, 2021, (Dkt. No. 7) is ADJOURNED to June 24, 2021, at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code: 5583333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/13/2021) ( Initial Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (ks)
April 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mark Hazuda answer due 6/18/2021; Tracy Renaud answer due 6/18/2021; Monty Wilkinson answer due 6/18/2021. (ks)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the government to respond to the complaint (from May 4 to June 18, 2021) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated April 12, 2021., CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently scheduled for April 22, 2021 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated April 12, 2021. Document filed by Mark Hazuda, Tracy Renaud, Monty Wilkinson..(Byars, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at April 22, 2021 at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter on ECF at least seven calendar days prior to the initial pre-trial conference, not to exceed 5 pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (i) to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules forthwith, and (ii) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: April 22,2021 at 10:40 a.m., to be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. ( Initial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/11/21) (yv) Modified on 3/11/2021 (yv).
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Mark Hazuda, Tracy Renaud, Monty Wilkinson..(Byars, Michael)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Mark Hazuda served on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Monty Wilkinson served on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wen Li..(Zheng, Taobo)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Hazuda, Tracy Renaud, Monty Wilkinson..(pc)
February 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Taobo Zheng. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mark Hazuda, Tracy Renaud, Monty Wilkinson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tracy Renaud, Mark Hazuda, Monty Wilkinson, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Wen Li..(Zheng, Taobo)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zheng, Taobo)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Mark Hazuda, Tracy Renaud, Monty Wilkinson (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24092491).Document filed by Wen Li..(Zheng, Taobo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Renaud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wen Li
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?