Rhoden v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Hugh M Rhoden, Sr.
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv01677
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Case Stayed (ama)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: granting #16 Letter Motion to Stay re: #16 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Case for 90 Days addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Timothy E. Di Domenico dated March 31, 2021. Application GRANTED. This case is STAYED. A joint update on the status of this case is due by June 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/31/2021) (ama)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Case for 90 Days addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Timothy E. Di Domenico dated March 31, 2021. Document filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated..(Di Domenico, Timothy)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated; Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated. Document filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated..(Di Domenico, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Timothy Edward Di Domenico to RE-FILE Document #13 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firm of Greenberg Traurig, LLP is hereby substituted in place of the law firm of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC as counsel of record for Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. in this action. (As further set forth in this Order.) Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/5/2021) (cf)
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. Document filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated..(Di Domenico, Timothy) Modified on 3/11/2021 (lb).
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit).(Di Domenico, Timothy)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Edward Di Domenico on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated..(Di Domenico, Timothy)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on April 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 1677. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 4/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/26/2021) (cf)
February 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
February 25, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
February 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
February 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Arizona; Case Number: 2:19-cv-00593. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *AMENDED By Doc. #8 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *VACATED By Doc. #6 *SECOND AMENDED ORDER granting Second Amended Stipulation (doc. 21388 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiff Pamela M. Smith (CV-17-00916), which were erroneously dismissed in the prior amended stipulation, are reinstated in case MDL-15-2641. All other cases listed are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/23/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 *AMENDED By Doc. #5 *AMENDED ORDER granting Amended Stipulation (doc. 21108 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/10/19. (MAP) *Modified on 1/29/2020 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED by #4 * ORDER granting 20901 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Listed Plaintiffs and Member Cases. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. See Document for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/19. (MAP) Modified on 12/18/2019 (SLQ). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-593-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16474527 filed by Hugh M Rhoden, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhoden v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Edward Di Domenico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Edward Di Domenico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh M Rhoden, Sr.
Represented By: Richard Arthur Freese
Represented By: David P Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?