Palumbo v. Fashion Institute of Technology et al
Plaintiff: angela palumbo
Defendant: Dr. Joyce Brown and Fashion Institute of Technology
Case Number: 1:2021cv01726
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: WHEREAS, an initial pretrial and pre-motion conference is scheduled for April 29, 2021, at 10:40 a.m. Dkt. No. 21. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial and pre-motion conference is ADJOURNED to April 29, 2021, at 11:05 a.m. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code: 5583333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/26/2021) ( Initial Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 11:05 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (ks)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: WHEREAS, an initial pretrial and pre-motion conference is scheduled for April 22, 2021. Dkt. No. 11. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial and pre-motion conference is ADJOURNED to April 29, 2021, at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code: 5583333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. Initial Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/21/2021) (cf)
April 20, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christopher Carcich dated 4/20/21 re: #16 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David A. Tauster, Esq. dated April 8, 2021. . Document filed by Angela Palumbo..(Carcich, Christopher)
April 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: WHEREAS, Defendants filed a pre-motion letter in anticipation of a motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 16), but Plaintiff did not file a responsive letter. It is hereby ORDERED that, by April 20, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter. (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Responses due by 4/20/2021) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/16/2021) (cf)
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David A. Tauster, Esq. dated April 15, 2021 re: Information Requested in Advance of Initial Conference. Document filed by Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David A. Tauster, Esq. dated April 8, 2021. Document filed by Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fashion Institute of Technology with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Angela Palumbo..(Carcich, Christopher)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Angela Palumbo. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by April 1, 2021. Defendants shall file any pre-motion letter in anticipation of a motion to dismiss the amended complaint by April 8, 2021, and Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter by April 15, 2021. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/12/2021) (jca)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Carcich on behalf of Angela Palumbo..(Carcich, Christopher)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Plainitff dated 3/11/21 re: Pre-Motion Response. Document filed by Angela Palumbo..(Carcich, Christopher)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER : It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at April 22, 2021 at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter on ECF at least seven calendar days prior to the initial pre-trial conference, not to exceed 5 pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (i) to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules forthwith, and (ii) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: April 22,2021 at 10:40 a.m., to be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. ( Initial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/11/21) (yv)
March 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/11/2021 (jca)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER with respect to #9 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. By March 11, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/4/2021) (jca)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David A. Tauster, Esq. dated March 3, 2021. Document filed by Joyce F. Brown, Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Moro on behalf of Joyce F. Brown, Fashion Institute of Technology..(Moro, Christopher)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Linette Eyer Daub on behalf of Joyce F. Brown, Fashion Institute of Technology..(Eyer Daub, Tara)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Adam Tauster on behalf of Joyce F. Brown, Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tauster, David)
March 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Adam Tauster. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dr. Joyce Brown. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
March 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Adam Tauster. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Declaration of David A. Tauster, Esq. served on Plaintiff's Counsel on Feb. 26, 2021. Document filed by Joyce Brown, Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 159627/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24123213).Document filed by Joyce Brown, Fashion Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint).(Tauster, David)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 DECLARATION of David A. Tauster in Support of Notice of Removal. Document filed by Joyce Brown, Fashion Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Personnel Action Form).(Tauster, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palumbo v. Fashion Institute of Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joyce Brown
Represented By: David Adam Tauster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Institute of Technology
Represented By: David Adam Tauster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: angela palumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?