Sahybi et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Aziz A Al Sahybi and Shining Star Deli Grocery Corp.
Defendant: Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 1:2021cv01767
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties, through their respective counsel, as follows: This action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, expenses, or attorney's fees. In lieu of Plaintiffs' temporary six-month disqualification from SNAP, Plaintiffs agree to pay FNS a civil money penalty totaling $4,698.00 payable within six months of the date that Plaintiffs sign this Stipulation. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/02/2021) (ama)
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America..(Kahane, Joshua)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PLAINTIFFS' DISQUALIFICATION FROM THE SUPPLEMENTAL NUTRITION ASSISTANCE PROGRAM PENDING FINAL DISPOSITION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED, AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs and the USDA, by their respective undersigned attorneys, that: 1. The USDA agrees to stay its February 3, 2021 decision disqualifying Plaintiffs from participating in SNAP during the pendency of this action (the "Stay"), without prejudice to USDA's right to move to vacate the Stay upon further case developments or changed circumstances. The Stay will be in effect until the Court issues a final decision in this action; however, the Stay will not remain in effect during the duration of any appeals. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/5/2021) (cf)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America..(Kahane, Joshua)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Evan Kahane on behalf of Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America..(Kahane, Joshua)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,, served. Food and Nutrition Service served on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021; United States Department of Agriculture served on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021; United States of America served on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Aziz A Al Sahybi; Shining Star Deli Grocery Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berkowitz, Jess)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (sj)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Aziz A Al Sahybi, Shining Star Deli Grocery Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction staying disqualification from SNAP. Document filed by Aziz A Al Sahybi, Shining Star Deli Grocery Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration by Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit FNS letter 3/27/18, #5 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 3/28/18, #7 Exhibit FNS letter 11/12/20, #8 Exhibit Request for Administrative Review, #9 Exhibit Final Agency Decision, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Berkowitz, Jess)
March 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
March 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code (none); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
March 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24142734)Document filed by Aziz A Al Sahybi, Shining Star Deli Grocery Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration by Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 3/27/2018, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 3/28/18, #5 Exhibit 11/12/20 FNS letter, #6 Exhibit Request for Admin Review, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahybi et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Nutrition Service
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz A Al Sahybi
Represented By: Jess Martin Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shining Star Deli Grocery Corp.
Represented By: Jess Martin Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?